AMMEX, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00778-RWG
District Judge Reginald W. Gibson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ammex, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph William Koegel, Jr. +1 202 429 6408 +1 202 429 3902 wkoegel@steptoe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Kenneth Drew william.k.drew@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/23/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Remark
See case number 99-338 for Mandate Affirming-in-Part and Reversing-in-Part. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
    Remark: See 99-338 T for Notice of Appeal. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaints are dismissed. [See 99-338T] (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Court Filing
        PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. [See 99-338T] Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by AMMEX, INC. (Service : 3/11/02 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Steven Fink for AMMEX, INC. Added Joseph William Koegel Jr. Response due: (HW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            CASE reassigned to Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson . (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [6-1] joint motion to Consolidate this case with case No. 99-338 T. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Set/Clear Flags
                Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 99-cv-338 for further proceedings. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999, Terminated: 12/2/1999 Terminated:
                  JOINT MOTION by AMMEX, INC., USA to Consolidate this case with case No. 99-338 T. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/5/99 ( JPSR due 12/23/99 ) (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Kenneth Drew. Service : 10/4/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                        Notice of assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush . Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                          NOTICE by AMMEX, INC. of related case: (99-338 T). (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through BB), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048333. Answer due on 11/22/99. (FE)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 234 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?