POHANIC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00852-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PHILLIP M. POHANIC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison Lee Ruttenberg +1 303 554 9043 eddiephilatelic@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Neel, Hooper & Banes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryant Steven Banes +1 713 629 1800 +1 713 629 1812 bbanes@neelhooper.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/25/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint, with prejudice. No costs. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Memorandum
        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA. Service: 6/30/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 5/17/00 order. Reset Defendant's Brief deadline to 6/30/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000, Terminated: 6/27/2000 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/23/00) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 5/17/00 order until 6/30/00. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Terminated:
              (Supplemental) RESPONSE by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service: 3/8/00) to [10-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 3/27/00. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to file briefs regarding jurisdictional issues by 6/23/00 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000, Terminated: 6/7/2000 Terminated:
                  MOTION by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service : 6/1/00 ) to Extend Time to file briefs regarding jurisdictional issues [until June 23, 2000]. Response due: 6/19/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000, Terminated: 6/7/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                    NOTICE of change of address by Alison Lee Ruttenberg (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER set deadline of 6/9/00 for the parties to brief the issues re: the court's purported jurisdiction under 37 USC Sec. 204. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/18/2000
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 4/3/00. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 4/3/00 for [10-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000, Terminated: 3/28/2000 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [until April 3, 2000]. Response due: 4/13/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/11/2000 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service: 3/8/00 ) to [10-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 3/27/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [10-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 3/9/00 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000, Terminated: 2/22/2000 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service : 2/16/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [until March 9, 2000]. Response due: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response to [10-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 2/17/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000, Terminated: 2/14/2000 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service: 2/9/00) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss , (until February 17, 2000). (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response to [10-1] motion to dismiss reset to 2/10/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000, Terminated: 1/18/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION by PHILLIP M. POHANIC (Service : 1/11/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until February 10, 2000]. Response due: 1/28/00 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/16/99) to Dismiss . Response due: 1/18/00. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Administrative Record
                                              Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 12/16/99. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999, Terminated: 12/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/99 ) for Leave to File the administrative record. Response due: 12/27/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to file a motion for leave to file the administrative record and a motion for judgment on the basis of the administrative record. Reset Answer deadline to 1/31/00 and reset Defendant's motions for leave to file the administrative record and for judgment on the administrative record filing deadline to 1/31/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999, Terminated: 11/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/19/99 ) to Extend Time to file a motion for leave to file the administrative record and a motion for judgment on the basis of the administrative record [until January 31, 2000]. Response due: 12/6/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                        SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, directing parties to confer with each other and establishing the court's policies and procedures including, but not limited to, mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements of time, the content of the joint preliminary status report, and scheduling of an initial status conference. A typical schedule is provided. JPSR is due 45 days after answer is filed; and 15 days after the close of discovery, the parties shall file a JSR or dispositive motion. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Bryant Steven Banes Service : 10/28/99 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048378. Answer due on 11/30/99. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?