ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00869-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELLINGSON LUMBER CO., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $141000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/13/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
DUPLICATE ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL USE ONLY. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
    Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. and USA. Filed by leave of the judge. Original stipulation is located in the file for 99-448C. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
      Case closed (AB)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until June 11, 2000]. Response due: 3/30/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 3/13/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999, Terminated: 12/14/1999 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/10/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until March 13, 2000]. Response due: 12/27/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 10/26/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                NOTICE by ELLINGSON LUMBER CO. of related case (99-448 C). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048461 Answer due on 12/13/99. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?