CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00965-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAPITOL HILL BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Symon +1 202 719 8294 +1 202 719 8394 rsymon@bradleyarant.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Alan Miller +1 202 616 0383 +1 202 307 2503 alan.miller@usdoj.gov
No Logo Patriarch, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo WILBURN Company, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Nadler +1 202 420 2200 +1 202 420 5403 nadlerd@dicksteinshapiro.com
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/5/2000
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
199-cv-00965-JFM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 76 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, re: Intervenor's 11/14/01 Motion for Partial Relief from the Court's 12/20/99 Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 75 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 CAFC Mandate Affirming
    MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated July 27, 2001 affirmed [72-1] judgment order. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 74 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER informing the parties that, in light of the judgment dismissing the complaint in this case, the caption of the cases for future filings shall be "Patriarch, Inc.", Nos. 00-48C and 00-119C. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 CAFC Case Number
        CAFC Case Number Re: [78-1] appeal by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN CAFC NUMBER: 00-5117 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 73 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Copy to Senior Judge Merow, defendant and C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 050104. (FE) Modified on 08/31/2000
            LREF
            Blank 72 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 08/31/2000
              LREF
              Blank 71 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Court Filing
              ORDER concluding that portions of the motions submitted by the government and by the defendant-intervenor, The Wilburn Company, Inc., upon the allegations stated in Count I of the complaints are granted; the motions submitted by plaintiffs, Capitol Hill Building Maintenance, Inc. and Patrich, Inc., to the extent they seek summary judgmnet upon the allegations stated in Count I of the Complaints, are denied; as Capitol Hill Building Maintenance, Inc. withdrew all other counts, final judgment shall be entered dismissing its complaint bearing docket number 99-965 C. Each party shall bear its own costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 08/31/2000
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 70 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                  REPLY by PATRIARCH, INC. to [68-1] response by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/30/00 (JT) Modified on 08/31/2000
                    LREF
                    Blank 69 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER re: on or before 7/6/00, Defendant shall file a supplement to its response, filed on 6/29/00; and on or before 7/6/00, counsel shall file supplemental responses to their proposed briefing schedules indicating their plan(s) with respect to obtaining supplementation of the record on which proposed briefing will be based. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/31/2000
                      LREF
                      Blank 68 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                      RESPONSE by USA to [67-1] notice by PATRIARCH, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/27/00 (JT) Modified on 08/31/2000
                        LREF
                        Blank 67 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                        NOTICE of Amended Proposal for a briefing schedule by PATRIARCH, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/23/00 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 66 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 Court Filing
                          "Proposed Briefing Schedule" by PATRIARCH, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/16/00. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 65 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Status Report
                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/9/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 64 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Service: 6/9/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 63 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by WILBURN COMPANY, INC. Service: 6/9/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 62 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by PATRIARCH, INC. Service: 6/9/00 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 61 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 6/9/00 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 60 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting in part [34-1] motion for leave to initiate discovery, denying [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. The request to conduct the deposition of Mr. Wilburn with regard to the extent to which Wilburn itself performed work under each of the contracts listed in its proposal is denied. The parties are granted leave to supplement the record. Paragraph (1) of the Order of 2/3/00 is vacated. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 59 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by WILBURN COMPANY, INC to response to [45-1] cross motion. Service: 4/3/00. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY by PATRIARCH, INC. to response to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 3/16/00 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 57 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 56 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                              REPLY by PATRIARCH, INC. to response to [34-1] motion for leave to initiate discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/15/00 (motion renewing request included) (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 56 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 3/15/00 ) renewing request to initiate discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/3/00 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000, Terminated: 3/16/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 3/15/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment [until March 16, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                    RESPONSE by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service: 3/15/00 ) to [49-1] cross motion, [45-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      RESPONSE by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN to Defendant's proposed additional facts. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Counts II, III, and IV of Complaint by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          RESPONSE by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN to [47-1] statement facts by WILBURN COMPANY, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [44-1] motion to Withdraw [28-1] motion for Leave to Initiate Discovery by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/00 ) to strike Patriarch's motion for judgment upon the administrative record. (cross-motion included) Response due: 4/10/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 3/10/00 ) and RESPONSE to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by PATRIARCH, INC., [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Response due: 4/10/00 (motion to strike included) FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Statement of Facts
                                                                  COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 3/10/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Statement of Facts
                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by WILBURN COMPANY, INC. Service: 3/10/00 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Statement of Facts
                                                                      COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by WILBURN COMPANY, INC. Service: 3/10/00 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                        CROSS MOTION by WILBURN COMPANY, INC ( Service: 3/10/00 ) and RESPONSE to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by PATRIARCH, INC., [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Response due: 4/10/00 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000, Terminated: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service : 3/10/00 ) to Withdraw [28-1] motion for Leave to Initiate Discovery by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Deadline updated; response to [49-1] cross motion reset to 4/10/00. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                              Deadline updated; response to [45-1] cross motion reset to 4/10/00. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Consolidating Case No. 00-119C with this case and No. 00-48C. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 16, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE by WILBURN COMPANY, INC (Service: 3/6/00 ) to [34-1] motion for leave to initiate discovery. Reply due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/6/00 ) to [34-1] motion for leave to initiate discovery. Reply due: 3/20/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                        Administrative Record (Volume 4) filed by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Filing by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                            MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 2/25/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                MOTION by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service : 2/25/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 27, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000, Terminated: 4/13/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 2/22/00 ) for leave to initiate discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER filing by leave Patriarch's motion for reconsideraton and request for discovery by leave and as a motion for leave to initiate the discovery. Any response shall be filed by 3/6/00. Any reply to response shall be filed within 5 dyas after service of the opposition. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER re: Plaintiff CHBM's Motion Filing deadline to 2/25/00 , Defendant's Cross Motions deadline to 3/10/00 , and CHBM shall respond to Proposed Additional Facts by 3/15/00 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Briefing Schedule by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN. Service: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER filing by leave Plaintiff's untimely motion for reconsideration as a motion for leave to initiate discovery. Any response shall be filed by 3/6/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service : 2/18/00 ) for Leave to Initiate Discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER re: the cited documents (the 2/16/00 letter with attachment and affidavit) are attached to the original of this Order, and they shall be considered to supplement the administrative record relevant to the procurement matters at issue. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/22/2000
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [17-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order, denying [17-2] motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying [21-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/22/00 for the parties to submit a briefing schedule. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 2/16/00 (by hand)) for access to materials under protective order by outside counsel. (Kenneth A. Martin) Response due: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 2/16/00 (by hand)) for access to materials under protective order by outside counsel. (Jennifer C. Adams) Response due: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WILBURN COMPANY, INC (Service: 2/15/00 ) to [17-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order, [17-2] motion for Preliminary Injunction. Reply due: 2/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/15/00) to [18-1] motion for access to materials under protective order by outside counsel, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/28/00. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service : 2/16/00 (by hand) ) for Preliminary Injunction. Response due: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/15/00) to [17-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/28/00. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                TRO Hearing held ( Transcript due 3/17/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (JOINDER) by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service: 2/14/00 ) to [17-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order, [17-2] for Preliminary Injunction. (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WILBURN COMPANY, INC (Service : 2/11/00 ) for access to materials under protective order by outside counsel. (Michael J. Slattery) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000, Terminated: 2/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service : 2/11/00 (by hand)) for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction. Response due: 2/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER Hearing: 10:30 a.m. 2/16/00 , on pending applications for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: judgment is reserved upon the Defendant's motion to stay proceedings pending the resolution of criminal proceedings. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Consolidating this case with No. 00-48C. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument re: [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by USA ( Transcript due 2/28/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 1/27/00 for [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/14/00 (DS) Modified on 01/18/2000
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/3/2000, Terminated: 7/5/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CAPITOL HILL BUILDIN (Service: 12/30/99 ) to [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings FILED UNDER SEAL. Reply due: 1/14/00 (DS) Modified on 01/03/2000
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999, Terminated: 12/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/99 ) for Protective Order. Response due: 1/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/99 ) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 1/4/99. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                              Administrative record (three volumes) filed by USA. Service: 12/16/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Administrative Record by USA. Service: 12/16/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller. Service : 12/13/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Intervene by WILBURN COMPANY, INC., defendant shall file the administrative record underlying the procurement decisions by 12/16/99 and any motion to stay proceedings shall be filed by 12/20/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999, Terminated: 12/3/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION (Service : 12/2/99 ) to Intervene by WILBURN COMPANY, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT (For Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment). FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048706, Answer due on 1/31/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?