WATLER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00969-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CARLOS M. WATLER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Ames Page
Office COFC
Filed 12/3/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/20/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to RCFC 41(b). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 4/17/00 for CARLOS M. WATLER. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/1/00 ) to dismiss. Response due: 3/3/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re: Plaintiff's letter dated 12/17/99 is being returned to clarify his intentions to the Court (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Allison Ames Page Service : 12/20/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999
                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048733. Answer due on 2/1/00. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 154 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?