ALVIN, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-01011-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALVIN SWANSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo DAVID WILLIAMSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo DONALD SPOONER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo JERRY WRIGHT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo JOHN MILLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo John Tilton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo RONALD ALVIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 12/22/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County
Terminated 12/28/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLASS, CLOSED
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 74 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 15, 2004 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
    LREF
    Blank 73 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004
    Certified transcript of judgment, dated December 28, 2004, forwarded to Barry Paul Steinberg. See letter in file. (bre,)
      LREF
      Blank 72 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $7,210,000.00. (dls)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/18/2005. (vp1, )
          LREF
          Blank 71 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Stipulation
          STIPULATION for entry of judgment filed by all parties. (dls)
            LREF
            Blank 70 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Memorandum
            PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in suppport of final approval of settlement agreement by all plaintiffs. Service: 12/6/2004.(lg1, )
              LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Supplemental Brief
              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Final Approval of Settlement by USA. Service: 12/6/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 11/29/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 12/1/2004, class counsel shall file a status report. On or before 12/8/2004, each party may submit a supplemental brief in support of the settlement agreement. A Hearing shall be held Wednesday, 12/15/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. If a class member wishes to appear and personally present his or her views at the 12/15/2004 hearing, the memember shall submit to the court on or before 11/24/2004, a Notice or Objection and Request to Appear and Present Views. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Terminated:
                    JOINT MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, Approval of Notice of Class Settlement and Scheduling of Hearing, by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, USA, DAVID WILLIAMSON, JERRY WRIGHT.Service: 9/10/2004. Response due by 9/27/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 65 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [64] Motion for Extension of Time. Secretary Report by 10/20/2004. Signed by Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 64 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004, Terminated: 6/23/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time until October 20, 2004 to file Secretary's Report by USA.Service: 6/17/04. Response due by 7/6/2004 (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 2/19/04. (jwg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order Remanding to AgencyCourt Filing
                            ORDER REMANDING case to the Secretary of the Air Force, directing defendant to file the Secretary's report by 8/20/04; and staying proceedings during the period of remand. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. Certified copy forwarded to the Secretary of the Air Force.(dls)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Joint Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT and Notice of Additional Plaintiffs by all parties. Service: 2/13/2004.(hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [60] Pltfs' Motion to Modify the Definition of the Class Set Forth in the Court's 10/10/2003. The time within which a representational person may exercise the option to opt-in as a pltf in this proceeding is extended to and including 2/2/2004. The time within which the parties shall file a joint status report is extended to and including 2/17/2004. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 2/2/2004. Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2004. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 60 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003, Terminated: 12/22/2003 Terminated:
                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION to Modify the Class Definition by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON, JERRY WRIGHT.Service: 12/16/03. Response due by 1/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 59 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 9, 2003 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/10/2003. (vp1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 58 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER:On or before 1/16/2004, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report proposing an order of remand directing the return on this case to the Secretary of the Air Force. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 57 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [3] Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 56 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/9/2003 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 9/24/03. (jwg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 9/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER AND ORDER STAYING CASE:Based upon the reivew of the parties' 8/4/03, status report, the suspension of proceedings is continued. On or before 9/18/2003, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washiington, D.C., for date of September 5, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER suspending proceedings pending decision from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in Christian v. United States (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT. Service: 8/24/02. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Status Report
                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to file status report Defendant's Status Report due 8/23/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002, Terminated: 8/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/02) to Extend Time to file status report until 8/23/02. Response due: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Transcript
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 9, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [24-1] cross motion for summary judgment. Defendant directed to file a memorandum outlining the procedural mechanism the Air Force proposes to adopt as a remedy by Brief deadline of 8/15/02 . The status conference scheduled for 10/15/02, is cancelled ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT. Service: 7/23/02. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Status Report
                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Reid Prouty. Service: 7/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER resetting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 10/15/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Defendant's memorandum of law due 9/20/02 , and Status Conference set for 10:30 a.m. on 10/8/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 7/9/02 . Further proceedings in this action shall remain suspended pending the 7/9/02 status conference (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by RONALD ALVIN, et al. (Service: 4/26/02) for a scheduling order and opposition to defendant's status report. Response due: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed by USA. Service: 4/26/02 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [33-1] motion for a scheduling order and mooting [32-1] motion response (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001, Terminated: 10/18/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                              MOTION by RONALD ALVIN (Service: 10/15/01) for a scheduling order . Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                RESPONSE by RONALD ALVIN (Service: 10/15/01) to [30-1] motion to Stay. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001, Terminated: 10/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) to Stay . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION denying [24-1] cross motion, denying [20-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (74 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 16, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. 8/16/01 for [24-1] cross motion and [20-1] motion for Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., NW, Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001
                                                                                                            REPLY by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON, JERRY WRIGHT to response to [24-1] cross motion. Service: 1/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/26/00 ) to [24-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/12/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000, Terminated: 7/26/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT (Service: 11/20/00) and RESPONSE to [20-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA, by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/20/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT, by leave of the Court. Service: 11/20/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [24-1] cross motion reset to 12/21/00 . (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Response due: 11/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 20, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER set Defendant's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 10/17/00 ; set Plaintiffs' cross-motion filing deadline to 11/22/00 ; set Defendant's response deadline to 12/20/00; and set Plaintiffs' reply deadline to 2/1/01. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/21/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to stay. Service: 6/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT (Service: 6/8/00) to [13-1] motion to stay. Reply due: 6/22/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY by RONALD ALVIN, JOHN MILLER, DONALD SPOONER, ALVIN SWANSON, JOHN TILTON, DAVID WILLIAMSON and JERRY WRIGHT to response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class. Service: 6/8/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 7/20/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA re: intent to proceed by dispositive motion in lieu of an answer. Service: 5/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/25/00 ) to [3-1] motion to Certify Class. Reply due: 6/12/00 (motion to stay included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/25/00 ) to stay. Response due: 6/12/00 (response to motion for class certification included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by RONALD ALVIN (Service: 4/6/00 ) to [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and plaintiffs' motion to certify class. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and plaintiffs' motion to certify class reset Answer deadline to 5/25/00 , and Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 5/25/00 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/3/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and plaintiffs' motion to certify class (to May 25, 2000). Response due: 4/20/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to certify, granting [8-2] motion to Extend Time to file the response to the complaint. Defendant's response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 4/18/00 and reset Answer deadline to 4/18/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000, Terminated: 1/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/24/00) to Extend Time to file response to motion to certify , (until April 18, 2000) and to Extend Time to file the response to the complaint , (until April 18, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to certify a class Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 2/9/00 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee Joshua Freedman Service : 1/4/00 (JT) Modified on 01/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000, Terminated: 1/4/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to certify a class [until February 9, 2000]. Response due: 1/21/00 (JT) Modified on 01/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference; and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (AB) Modified on 01/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 1/5/2000, Terminated: 10/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by RONALD ALVIN, et al. to Certify Class . Copies to defendant. Response due: 1/5/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048847. Answer due on 2/22/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?