92-95-932X CONFIDENT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00154-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo 92-95-932X CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Francis Pace +1 310 227 2900
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/22/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/21/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, SEALED
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 87 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re: The parties filed a Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the RCFC, at the request of the parties, the court directs the Clerk of the Court to maintain the record in this case under seal in perpetuity (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 86 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002
    Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002
      Case closed (AB)
        LREF
        Blank 85 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: initial status conference (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE) Modified on 05/03/2002
          LREF
          Blank 84 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER mooting [82-1] motion for status conference (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 83 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Satisfaction of Judgment
            SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $124,224.70, was forwarded to plaintiff. See letter in file. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 82 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Terminated:
              MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 12/5/00 ) for status conference. Response due: 12/22/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 81 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT to response to [79-1] motion for augmentation of the order filed on August 10, 2000. Service: 11/9/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 80 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/6/00 ) to [79-1] motion for augmentation of the order filed on August 10, 2000. Reply due: 11/20/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 79 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 10/25/00 ) for augmentation of the order filed on August 10, 2000. FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 11/13/00 (AB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 78 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                      UNPUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished decision issued under seal on September 15, 2000] ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 77 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                        MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 9/28/00 ) for deletion from published opinion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/16/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 10/05/2000
                          LREF
                          Blank 76 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000
                          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated September 18, 2000, forwarded to attorney of record, and certified copy of judgment forwarded to the Tax Division, Department of Justice. See letter in file. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 75 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000
                            JUDGMENT entered, as provided for in Rule 54(b), and pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $124,244.70. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 74 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 Court Filing
                              UNPUBLISHED DECISION [FILED UNDER SEAL] denying [41-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by plaintiff on a claim for $250,000, denying the government's [53-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment with respect to that issue, granting [60-1] plaintiff's second motion for partial Summary Judgment in the amoount of $124,244.,70. On or before 9/28/00, each party shall file requests for deletion from the published opinion of any material which the party believes should remain under seal, stating with particularity the reasons therefore. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (see entry of 10/4/00) (LD) Modified on 10/10/2000
                                LREF
                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Terminated:
                                MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service: 9/5/00) for a status conference . Response due: 9/22/00. (FE) Modified on 09/08/2000
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 72 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to return to Plaintiff their reply to Defendant's response to motion to compel. (motion to compel has been resolved) ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 71 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT to response to [60-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 8/14/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 70 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER directing Defendant, consistent with the court's interpretation of the tax administration exception to the statutory prohibition against the disclosure of return information, to reproduce Exhibit F to Plaintiff. Additionally, the court directs Defendant, on or before 9/20/00, to disclose to Plaintiff amounts of recovery and sources of the information leading to the recovery of those amounts. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 69 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER re: the parties shall comply with the terms of Rule 26(e)(2), Fed. R. Civ. P., to the same extent as if such rule were contained within the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims. The court's order of July 28, 2000 shall be amended by deleting from line 5 thereof the words "either by withholding or." ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 08/10/2000
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 68 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/7/00) to [60-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 8/21/00. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 67 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/1/00 ) to [59-1] motion to Compel supplemental response to discovery. Reply due: 8/14/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [64-1] motion for Leave to file response to motion by plaintiff to compel supplemental response to discovery. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 08/07/2000
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/2/00 ) for Clarification of the Court's Order of July 28, 2000. Response due: 8/21/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000, Terminated: 8/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/1/00) for Leave to to file response to motion by plaintiff to compel supplemental response to discovery , out of time. Response due: 8/18/00. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2:00 p.m., 8/9/00 for Defendant to appear for an in camera document inspection. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                      CONTROVERTED ISSUES OF FACT by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT. Service: 7/5/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT. Service: 7/7/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 07/13/2000
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 7/7/00 ) for partial Summary Judgment. Response due: 8/7/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 7/7/00 ) to Compel supplemental response to discovery. Response due: 7/24/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] cross motion FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 7/7/00 (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service: 6/21/00 ) to [53-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 7/10/00 FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER filing plaintiff's opposition to cross-motion by leave of the judge; and directing plaintiff to file a statement of genuine issues by 7/10/00 FILED UNDER SEAL. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 6/5/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 6/5/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 6/5/00 ) and RESPONSE to [41-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT. Response due: 7/6/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [50-1] motion for Leave to File cross-motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment out of time. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Deadline updated; Plaintiff's Response to [53-1] cross motion reset to 7/6/00. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 Memorandum
                                                                              SURREPLY by USA re: [48-1] response by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT. Service: 6/8/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT to response to [35-1] motion for sanctions for failure to comply with order. Service: 6/7/00. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000, Terminated: 6/12/2000 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                  Response to order to show cause by USA. Service: 6/5/00 (motion for leave included) (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000, Terminated: 6/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/5/00 ) for Leave to File cross-motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment out of time. Response due: 6/22/00 (response to order to show cause included) (JT) Modified on 06/08/2000
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                      SUROPPOSITIION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT to [43-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 5/26/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [45-1] motion for Leave to File a suropposition to the reply to the opposition to the motion to dismiss. Set Defendant's surreply, if any, deadline to 6/8/00. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 6/9/00 for USA. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 5/26/00 ) for Leave to File a suropposition to the reply to the opposition to the motion to dismiss. Response due: 6/12/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/26/00 ) to [35-1] motion for sanctions for failure to comply with order. Reply due: 6/12/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/22/00 (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/4/00 (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 4/21/00 ) for Partial Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 5/22/00 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to motion to dismiss, granting [38-2] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion for sanctions. Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/22/00 for [31-1] motion to Dismiss and Defendant's Response to [35-1] motion for sanctions for failure to comply with order reset to 5/26/00. ( signed Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service: 4/14/00) to [31-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 4/28/00. [FILED UNDER SEAL (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000, Terminated: 5/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/1/00) to Extend Time o file reply to opposition to motion to dismiss , (until May 22, 2000) and to Extend Time to file response to motion for sanctions , (until May 26, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER re: the Clerk shall retain Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, unfiled. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/10/00 for Plaintiff to supplement the motion for summary judgment. If Plaintiff fails to supplement the motion, the Clerk of the Court shall return the motion to Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk to retain Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss until the filing defect is corrected. (original affidavit) ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 4/18/00 ) for sanctions for failure to comply with order. Response due: 5/5/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 04/21/2000
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 4/14/00. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000, Terminated: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 3/9/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until April 14, 2000]. Response due: 3/27/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 03/15/2000
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/15/00 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 3/17/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of decision issued under seal on 12/22/99). ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 1/11/00 ) regarding decision . FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 1/28/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [22-1] motion to strike and [22-2] motion to compel. Set deadline of 1/21/00 for each party to file requests for deletion from the published opinion of any material which the party believes should remain under seal. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (See entry of 1/24/00) (JT) Modified on 02/01/2000
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [26-1] motion for a status conference. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/23/1999
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999, Terminated: 12/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 11/23/99 ) for a status conference. Response due: 12/10/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Dean Francis Pace, filed Under Seal. (HW) Modified on 12/06/1999
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT to response to [22-1] motion to strike the 26 U.S.C. 6103 objection by Defendant, [22-2] motion to compel Defendant to answer interrogatories and requests for admissions. Service: 8/31/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/23/99) to [22-1] motion to strike the 26 U.S.C. 6103 objection by Defendant and [22-2] motion to compel Defendant to answer interrogatories and requests for admissions. Reply due: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service : 8/6/99 ) to strike the 26 U.S.C. 6103 objection by Defendant and to compel Defendant to answer interrogatories and requests for admissions. Response due: 8/23/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Plaintiff's nonopposition to change of case caption is filed by leave of the Court, plaintiff shall effect service of process upon the attorney of record for defendant in accordance with Rule 5(e) (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [17-1] motion to change the case caption, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT (Service: 7/23/99) to [17-1] motion to change the case caption, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/20/99) to change the case caption . Response due: 8/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings filed UNDER SEAL, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 28, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER returning documents to Plaintiff for failure to comply with the provisions of Rules 5(d) and (e). ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/6/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/21/99 (JPSR due 8/9/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for admissions and interrogatories, granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 6/21/99 , Interrogatories deadline to 7/6/99 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999, Terminated: 5/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/99) to Extend Time to respond to request for admissions and interrogatories , (until July 13, 1999). Response due: 5/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/99) to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint , (until June 20, 1999). Response due: 5/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 2:00 p.m. 6/28/99, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. ; (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: the Clerk of the Court shall maintain a record of the docket entries in the case in the court's public records, but shall maintain individual filings under seal as ordered hereby and as marked for filing hereafter. Set telephonic status conference for 2:00 p.m., 5/10/99. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: the parties shall confer and propose possible dates during the period of 4/26/99 through 5/13/99 for a telephonic status conference. The parties are instructed to contact the court to make arrangements for the status conference.( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 05/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interest by 92-95-932X CONFIDENT Service: 4/6/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Special Procedures ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [3-1] motion for Leave to place the Complaint and Entire Record UNDER SEAL OF THE COURT until further Order of the Court ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by G. Robson Stewart. Service : 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 3/31/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by 92-95-932X CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT (Service : 3/22/99) for Leave to place the Complaint and Entire Record UNDER SEAL OF THE COURT until further Order of the Court Response due: 4/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047198. Answer due on 5/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?