JONES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00196-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK JONES, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Opher Shweiki +1 202 353 8822 opher.shweiki@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/5/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/20/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999
        CASE assigned to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Opher Shweiki. Service: 5/5/99. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; why the instant complaint should not be dismissed (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 5/10/99 for FREDERICK JONES. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Terminated:
              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047271. Answer due on 6/4/99. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 163 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?