NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDAT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00197-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by taxlitigator.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Todd Luoma +1 916 971 2440 rtluoma@taxlitigator.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/5/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 94 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION on [75] CROSS MOTION to [65] Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, filed by USA. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005
      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding Standard of Review and Potential Effective Date by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. (Luoma, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 92 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005
        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA. (Rapp, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT(pg 1- 132) of Proceedings held on 6/6/05 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (eph, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2005. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER the parties shall each simultaneously file a single supplementary brief by July 18, 2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 7/18/2005. (jat, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 89 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Court Filing
                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [75] CROSS MOTION to [65] Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION,: Oral Argument set for 6/6/2005 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 87 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Court Filing
                      ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 86 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                        REPLY to RESPONSE to [76] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 3/18/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 85 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [75] CROSS MOTION to [65] Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, filed by USA. Service: 3/18/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 84 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                            RESPONSE and reply to [75] CROSS MOTION to [65] Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Reply due by 3/21/2005. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 83 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                              REPLY to RESPONSE to [66] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 82 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                RESPONSE to [76] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 81 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [80] MOTION for Leave to File Three Pleadings Out of Time. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 80 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Three Pleadings Out of Time by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION.Service: 2/25/2005. Response due by 3/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 79 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [78] Motion for Extension of Time.Plaintiff's reply brief, response to defendant's proposed findings of fact, and reply to defendant's response to plaintiff's proposed findings of fact are due by 2/22/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005, Terminated: 1/28/2005 Terminated:
                                        Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/21/05 to file its reply brief, its response to defendant's proposed findings of fact, and its reply to defendant's response to plaintiff's proposed findings of fact by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION.Service: 01/25/05. Response due by 2/11/2005 (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 77 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                          Defendants RESPONSE to Plaintiff's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by USA filed by USA. Service: 1/5/05.(eph, ). (by leave of the judge)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 76 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                            Defendant's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by USA. Service: 1/5/05.(eph, ).(by leave of the judge) (eph, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 75 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              CROSS MOTION of the United States for Judgement and brief in support thereof and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for judgement ee: [65] Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, by USA.Service: 1/5/05. Response due by 1/27/2005 (eph, ) (by leave of the judge)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 74 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [73] Motion for Extension of Time to file brief. Brief due by 1/5/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004, Terminated: 12/14/2004 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2005 to file brief, proposed findings and response to proposed findings. by USA.Service: 12/8/2004. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [71] Motion for Extension of Time to file its brief and associated documents. Defendants shall file its brief, proposed finding of fact, and responses to plaintiff's proposed findings of facts on or before12/8/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lg1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/8/2004 to file Dft's Brief, Proposed Findings and Responses to Pltf's Proposed Findings by USA.Service: 11/4/2004. Response due by 11/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: Additional Administrative Material by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 9/29/04.(dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Administrative Record
                                                          CORRECTED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, Volume 9 of 10, by USA. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: [67] Dft's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record by including pages AR 3212.1 through 3212.28, and AR 3256.1 through AR 3256.6, is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the attached corrected administrative record, volume 9 of 10. Dft's motion to permit pltf additional time to amend or supplement its brief in support of its motion for declaratory judgment or its proposed findings of fact is GRANTED. Pltf shall amend or supplement its brief or findings on or before 10/4/2004. Dft's time to respond to pltf's brief and findings shall run from that date, and its cross motion for judgment, supporting brief, proposed findings of fact, and response to pltf's proposed findings of fact shall therefore be filed on or before 11/8/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File to File Corrected Volume 9 of the Administrative Record, to Provide Pltf With Additional Time to Supplement, and to Fix Time for Dft to Respond, by USA.Service: 9/2/2004. Response due by 9/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact Supporting Declaratory Judgment, by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 8/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION.Service: 8/11/2004. Response due by 8/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                                    CORRECTED volumes 3 and 7 to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by USA. Service: 7/7/2004.(hw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: On or before 7/7/2004, defendant shall make corrections to the pagination and collation errors in the administrative record identified by plaintiff. Plaintiff's objection to the inclusion of documents it characterized as "third party materials," is denied. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Response
                                                                        RESPONSE to [61] Objection filed by USA. Service: 6/21/04.(jat, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Response
                                                                          OBJECTION to the Inclusion of Certain Materials in the Administrative Record, filed by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 6/5/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Administrative Record
                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in Ten (10) Volumes by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of the Administrative Record in Ten (10) Volumes by USA. Service: 5/17/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER modifying the court's Special Procedures Order and directing defendant to file the Administrative Record by 5/15/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/16/04.(dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Status Report
                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/19/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/20/03.(jat, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION, USA. Service: 8/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/19/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 4/21/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 6/23/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/19/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Joint Status Report due 4/21/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDAT, and USA. Service: 12/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                        Deadline updated; (60 days) Status Report deadline to 2/20/03 (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/28/02 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                            Deadline updated; set Joint Status Report deadline to 12/27/02. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Joint Status Report due 10/28/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 8/27/02, and every 60 days thereafter, unless a joint stipulation of dismissal is filed earlier (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF NOTIFICATION to Plaintiff by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION. Service: 6/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to the order of June 18, 2002 by USA. Service: 6/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [41-1] motion for Leave to file joint status report out of time Telephonic Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 6/27/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002, Terminated: 6/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/12/02) for Leave to file joint status report out of time . Response due: 7/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 4/26/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/25/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 3/25/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002
                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 1/15/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 11/2/01 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/20/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Joint Status Report deadline to 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Richard Todd Luoma (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 6/20/01 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. 3/21/01 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDATION AND, USA Service: 2/27/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 4/12/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; (45 days) Status Report deadline to 2/26/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; (45 days) Status Report deadline to 1/12/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Stay proceedings Joint Status Report deadline to 11/28/00 , and every 45 days thereafter (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000, Terminated: 10/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by NEW DYNAMICS FOUNDAT (Service : 10/11/00 ) to Stay proceedings. Response due: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [20-1] motion to amend the scheduling order and defendant shall file the administrative record by 10/13/00 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000, Terminated: 9/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by USA (Service: 9/12/00) to amend the scheduling order . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Amend the scheduling order. Reset deadline to file the administrative record to 9/13/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/23/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 6/22/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000, Terminated: 6/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/13/00 ) to Amend the scheduling order. Response due: 6/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [15-1] motion to amend the scheduling order. Reset deadline to file the administrative record to 6/15/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000, Terminated: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/8/00 ) to amend the scheduling order. (administrative record due 6/15/00) Response due: 3/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Submission pursuant to the Order of 9/29/99 by USA. Service: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/17/99 for Defendant to file the core cordocuments and set Defendant's deadline to file the administrative record to 3/15/00. ( signed by Judge Francis Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 8/3/99 (JPSR due 9/20/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset answer deadline to 8/3/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999, Terminated: 7/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until August 3, 1999]. Response due: 7/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 7/6/99 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/2/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to July 4, 1999) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra directing parties to confer with chambers and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying timing and filing requirements for conference (with special requirements if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of answer); precluding the filing of dispositive motions until the conference has been held; and establishing special procedures regarding, inter alia,mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements and the content of the joint preliminary status report. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service: 4/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibit A), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047272. Answer due on 6/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?