KIM v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00199-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOLVEIGA A. KIM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Stuart Strimling +1 510 654 8220
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Calvin Caine
Office COFC
Filed 4/6/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/8/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [22-1] motion to Dismiss and directing the clerk to dsimiss the complaint with prejudice because plaintiff fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE of change of address by Michael Stuart Strimling. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Transcript
          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 19, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000
            Oral Argument re: [22-1] motion to Dismiss. by USA ( Transcript due 6/19/00 ) (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [22-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 5/9/00 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/9/00 for [22-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000, Terminated: 5/8/2000 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/5/00 ) to Extend Time to file a reply brief (to May 9, 2000). (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 5/5/00 for [22-1] motion to Dismiss and oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 5/19/00 for [22-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000
                      Oral Argument re: [22-1] motion to Dismiss by USA set at 10:00 a.m. on 5/19/00 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Terminated:
                        MOTION by SOLVEIGA A. KIM (Service : 2/25/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Alice Margaret Beasley for SOLVEIGA A. KIM Added Michael Stuart Strimling. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000, Terminated: 3/7/2000 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/2/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [until May 5, 2000]. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Calvin Caine Service : 2/29/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Affidavit
                              DECLARATION of JOHN KIM, filed with an attachment labeled Exhibit D "Audiotapes 7". Service: 2/23/00. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Affidavit
                                DECLARATION of SOLVEIGA A. KIM. Service 2/23/00. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by SOLVEIGA A. KIM (Service: 2/11/00) to [22-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/25/00. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [23-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/16/00 ) to [23-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Reply due: 2/10/00 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000, Terminated: 2/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION by SOLVEIGA A. KIM (Service : 2/11/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/10/00 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 2/10/00 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER set Defendant's motion to dismiss filing deadline to 1/10/00 ; set Plaintiff's response deadline to 2/14/00; set Defendant's reply deadline to 3/6/00 ; and oral argument for 10:00 a.m., 3/14/00. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Status Conference
                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/6/00 ) (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Status Report
                                                STATUS REPORT by SOLVEIGA A. KIM. Service: 12/1/99 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 12/7/99. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by SOLVEIGA A. KIM (Answer due 12/2/99) amending [1-1] complaint, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/19/99. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Administrative Record
                                                      Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 11/8/99. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 7, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of Filing decisions of the Army Board for Correction of Military Records by USA. Service: 9/17/99 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER set deadline for Defendant to file copies of the 4/7/93 and 1/13/99 decisions of the Correction Board to 9/21/99 and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 11/8/99 for Defendant to file a copy of the administrative record pertaining to Plaintiff's petitions for correction. ( signed by Judge Edward Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/09/1999
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              RESPONSE by SOLVEIGA A. KIM to [10-1] notice by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/99 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Status Conference
                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 10/7/99 ) (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER set status conference for 2:00 p.m., 9/7/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/03/1999
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to proceed by filing motion in lieu of answer by USA. Service: 8/27/99 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file notice of intent or answer. Reset answer deadline to 8/30/99. By 9/1/99, the parties shall arrange with Judge Damich's secretary for a status conference to be held by 9/14/99. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt for Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999, Terminated: 6/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/99 ) to Extend Time to file notice of intent required by paragraph 5(a)(i) of the Standard Special Procedures (to August 30, 1999). (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file answer or notice of intent to proceed by motion. Reset answer deadline to 7/1/99. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999, Terminated: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/99) to Extend Time to file notice of intent to proceed by motion , (until July 1, 1999). (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              Standard Special Procedures ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tara Anne Hurley Service : 4/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Edward J. Damich . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999
                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047274. Answer due on 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/7/2000 Transcript
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 7, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?