GALLIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00203-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SAMUEL GALLIN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/7/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 112 - Contract - Sale (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/3/2000
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 99-695[S. District of New York]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [12-1] defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The clerk is directed to dismiss plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Memorandum
        SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by SAMUEL GALLIN re: [14-1] motion response by SAMUEL GALLIN. Service: 3/28/00. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to dismiss. Service: 12/22/99 (AB)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by SAMUEL GALLIN (Service: 12/9/99 ) to [12-1] motion to dismiss. Reply due: 12/27/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER filing Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/99 ) to dismiss. Response due: 12/13/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 11/12/99. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until November 12, 1999]. Response due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 10/22/99. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999, Terminated: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/2/99) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until October 22, 1999). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Court Filing
                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES TO FACILITATE DISCOVERY, CONSERVE RESOURCES OF THE PARTIES AND EXPEDITE DISPOSITION OF CASE. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner . Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Court Filing
                              ORDER to assign case (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 8/2/99 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by SAMUEL GALLIN (Answer due 9/7/99 ) Copies (5) to defendant. (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER returning to Plaintiff his filing received by the Court on 6/22/99 for correction of defects. (proof of service, not signed by attorney of record, missing copies, no provision for filing) ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999
                                      Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, case number 99-cv-695, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 5/5/99). (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999
                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Space Space

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?