FLYNN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00239-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ADDIE JANE FLYNN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald R. Whitney +1 913 323 3100
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean C. Griffin +1 202 429 8176 sgriffin@steptoe.com
Office COFC
Filed 4/22/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $130000
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/29/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [12-1] motion to Dismiss. Each party to bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 14, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 Oral Argument
          Oral Argument re: [12-1] motion to Dismiss. by USA ( Transcript due 3/20/00 ) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER telephonic oral argument set for 11:00 a.m., 3/14/00 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 12/10/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by ADDIE JANE FLYNN (Service: 11/29/99 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 12/10/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/29/99 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 11/30/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 13, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER set Defendant's motion to dismiss filing deadline to 10/29/99 ; set Plaintiff's response deadline to 11/30/99 and set Defendant's reply deadline to 12/10/99. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Status Conference
                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/20/99 ) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:30 a.m. 9/13/99, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison, Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Memorandum
                            MEMORANDUM by USA re: bases for Defendant's motion to dismiss. Service: 8/18/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and to file memorandum pursuant to Paragraph 2(A) of the Court's 5/12/99 Order. Reset answer deadline to 8/23/99. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999, Terminated: 6/14/1999 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and to file memorandum pursuant to Paragraph 2(A) of the Court's 5/12/99 Order [until August 23, 1999]. Response due: 6/28/99 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER re: Special procedures (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Curtis Griffin. Service: 5/11/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999
                                      NOTICE by ADDIE JANE FLYNN of no related cases. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Court Filing
                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999
                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047366. Answer due on 6/21/99. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 335 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?