USIBELLI COAL MINE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00267-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/30/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 8/18/2008
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '06-5068'[], '06-5068'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, REOPEN
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 77 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 CAFC Mandate Reversing
MANDATE of CAFC reversing [71] Order Dismissing Case and Remanding back to the U. S. Court of Federal Claims. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Terminated:
    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 06-5068 for [74] Notice of Appeal filed by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Notice of Appeal
        NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. Filing fee $ 255.00, receipt number 064642. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated February 3, 2006, forwarded to Steven Harlan Becker, also certified copy of judgment, forwarded to the Tax Division of the Department of Justice. See letter in file. (bre,)
            LREF
            Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $1,229,331.00, no interest. The parties shall each bear their own costs. (lld, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment and to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006
                STATUS REPORT per Court's Jan. 10, 2006 Order, filed by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC.. (Becker, Steven)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006
                  STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2006 and every 30-days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC.. (Becker, Steven)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Offerman, Suzanne)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC.. (Becker, Steven)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005
                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 63 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 62 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. Status Report due by 6/7/2005.Service: 3/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 61 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Joint Status Report
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 60 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Joint Status Report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 9/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 59 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Joint Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 6/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 10/12/2004 and every 90 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Joint Status Report
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 3/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 57 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Status Report
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. Service: 12/11/03.(jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: . Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2004 (every 90 days). (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 56 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA, USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER:In lieu of all other status report orders, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 9/15/03, and every 90 days thereafter, discussing the progress of the stipulation for judgment process elected by pltfs. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2003. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Service: 12/17/02. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [43-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, denying [43-2] motion for partial Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 27, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Status Conference
                                                          Status Conference held (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiff's status reports due 12/20/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/15/02) to [47-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to protective motion for partial dismissal or for partial summary judgment. (FILED WITH STATUS REPORT, SUGGESTED AGENDA FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR INSTRUCTIONS ABOUT POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST). Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to protective motion for partial dismissal or for partial summary judgment Response to [43-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for partial summary judgment due 1/3/03 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ERRATA ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002, Terminated: 11/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USIBELLI COAL MINE (Service: 11/12/02) to Extend Time to file response to protective motion for partial dismissal or for partial summary judgment , (until January 3, 2003). (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00a.m. 11/27/02 ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [43-2] motion for partial Summary Judgment, denying [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                            MOTION, with brief and appendices, by USA (Service: 10/29/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE Service: 10/24/02 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Service: 9/4/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by USIBELLI COAL MINE re: U.S. Shoe COrp. v. United States. Service: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA re: [38-2] order. Service: 9/3/02 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Parties shall file a short memorandum not to exceed five pages in length by 9/3/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/02) for Leave to alert the court to new authority . Response due: 8/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Correct the transcript (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USIBELLI COAL MINE (Service : 6/27/02 ) to Correct the transcript Response due: 7/15/02 (HW)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                              SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on May 20, 2002 (in this, 99-516T and 00-551T). Notice to parties. (DS) Modified on 06/19/2002
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 9/3/02 and every 90 days thereafter (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 06/06/2002
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                      Oral Argument re: [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by USIBELLI COAL MINE ( Transcript due 6/19/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Service: 4/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. 5/20/02 for [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 5/20/02 for [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Service: 2/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Joint Status Report due 2/5/02 , and Telephonic Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 2/13/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USIBELLI COAL MINE to [22-2] order. Service: 1/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF by USA re: [20-2] order. Service: 1/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [21-1] motion For reconsideration of [20-2] order under Rule 83.2; and permitting plaintiff to file a sur-reply by 1/22/02 . ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by USIBELLI COAL MINE (Service : 12/27/01 ) For reconsideration of [20-2] order under Rule 83.2 (AB)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to bring recent developments to the Court's attention and to file a short reply brief Defendant's reply brief due 1/4/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/14/01) for Leave to bring recent developments to the Court's attention and to file a short reply brief . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Service: 12/7/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USIBELLI COAL MINE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USIBELLI COAL MINE to response to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USIBELLI COAL MINE, et al. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USIBELLI COAL MINE, et al. (Service: 10/22/01) for Partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 10/10/01 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file the attached letter (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001, Terminated: 9/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/27/01) for Leave to file the attached letter . Response due: 10/15/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [7-1] motion for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and granting [7-2] motion to stay further proceedings (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USIBELLI COAL MINE (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by USA re: the basis for its eventual motion to dismiss. Service: 5/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set preliminary status conference for 2:00 p.m., 6/9/99 ; set Defendant's memorandum re: factual and/legal bases upon which it plans to file a dispositive motion deadline to 5/28/99 ; and set Plaintiff's response deadline, if it wishes, to 6/3/99. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047417. Answer due on 6/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?