HOUSING AUTHORITY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00280-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HOUSING AUTHORITY FOR THE CITY OF ALEXANDRIA, LA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C. Downs +1 318 448 3439
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/6/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/26/2001
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 98-1542[W. District of Louisiana]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated April 26, 2001, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $15,000.00, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $15,000.00, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001, Terminated: 4/10/2001 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/9/01) to Extend Time to complete discovery , (until April 23, 2001). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery Discovery deadline to 4/9/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2001 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/26/01) to Extend Time to complete discovery (to April 9, 2001). (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery Discovery deadline to 3/26/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/22/01) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 3/24/01. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to complete Discovery reset Discovery deadline to 2/23/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/23/01) to Extend Time to complete Discovery until 02/22/01. Response due: 2/9/01. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery Discovery deadline to 1/23/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 01/24/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/16/00) to Extend Time to complete discovery , (until January 23, 20001). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 11/24/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000, Terminated: 10/13/2000 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/00) to Extend Time to complete discovery , (until November 24, 2000). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 10/10/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000, Terminated: 8/11/2000 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/10/00 ) to Extend Time to complete discovery [until October 9, 2000]. Response due: 8/28/00 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: The status conference scheduled for August 10, 2000, is canceled and will be rescheduled at a later date ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests. Reset Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests to 6/16/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to Parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000, Terminated: 6/9/2000 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/8/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests (to June 16, 2000). (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests by 6/8/00 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 5/10/2000 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/9/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests (to June 8, 2000) (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000
                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 4, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER establishing discovery schedule (discovery is to be on an informal basis and confined to a documentary exchange supplemented by depositions (as required)); directing meeting between counsel (upon conclusion of discovery and prior to status conference); and scheduling a post-discovery status conference at 2:30 p.m. on 8/10/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Status Conference
                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/4/00 ) (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 4/4/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 Status Conference
                                                        Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 4/4/00 (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. Reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/13/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 1/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/00) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report , (until January 13, 2000). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. Reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/6/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999, Terminated: 12/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/16/99) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report , (until January 6, 2000). (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/5/99 ( JPSR due 12/23/99 ) (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the complaint Answer deadline to 11/5/99 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999, Terminated: 9/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/21/99) to Extend Time to file response to the complaint , (until November 5, 1999). (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 8/5/99 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER (i) DIRECTING PARTIES TO CONFER AND ARRANGE FOR PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE; (ii) IDENTIFYING FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE; and (iii) PRECLUDING FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS UNTIL AFTER CONFERENCE HAS BEEN HELD ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Court Filing
                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999
                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by HOUSING AUTHORITY (Answer due 9/21/99) Copies (5) to defendant. (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: The attached Amended and Supplemental Complaint is to be returned to plaintiff for correction of the folowing defect: Proof of Service, required pursuant to RCFC 5(e) is missing (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties.(FE) Modified on 06/16/1999
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                    Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana (Alexandria), case number 98-cv-1542, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 6/3/99). (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?