VISARRAGA v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00212-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHILD DOE, 11, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gage +1 307 433 8864 +1 307 635 1511 vaccinelaw@aol.com
No Logo JANE DOE, 11, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gage +1 307 433 8864 +1 307 635 1511 vaccinelaw@aol.com
No Logo JOHN DOE 11, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gage +1 307 433 8864 +1 307 635 1511 vaccinelaw@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/8/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status remand
  Entries (151) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Court Filing
**SEALED**OPINION and ORDER REMANDING case to Special Master (Remand Proceedings to be completed within 90 days [10/29/2008.]). Signed by Judge Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
    **SEALED**TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-105) held on July 10, 2008 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. (dw1)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
      **SEALED**Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on July 10, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
        Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 7/10/2008, ended on 7/10/2008, before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Oral Argument. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(dph)
          LREF
          Blank 131 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re: issues to be addressed during oral argument. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
            LREF
            Blank 132 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 notice of filing
            NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS' CITATION TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/2/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 130 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
              ORDER Setting Oral Argument on [121] MOTION for Review of [116] DECISION of Special Master : Oral Argument set for 7/10/2008 at 1:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank 129 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's 4/30/08 Motion for Leave to respond to Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. Respondent shall file its response on or before 7/02/08. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 128 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 notice of filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND TO PETITIONERS' CITATION TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/30/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank 127 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                    CITATION to SUPPLEMTENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by JOHN DOE, 11, JANE DOE, 11, CHILD DOE, 11. (Filed by Leave of Judge Mary Ellen Coster-Williams, Nunc Pro Tunc 4/14/08) Service: 4/10/08.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 126 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION to redact personal information, filed by JOHN DOE, 11, JANE DOE, 11, CHILD DOE, 11. Service: 4/10/08.Response due by 4/28/2008. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 125 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MOTION TO REDACT NAMES, filed by JOHN DOE, 11, JANE DOE, 11, CHILD DOE, 11. Service: 4/10/08.Response due by 5/1/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 124 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Response to Motion For Review
                          RESPONSE to [121] MOTION for Review of [116] DECISION of Special Master, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/2/08. (dls)
                            LREF
                            Blank 123 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order
                            ORDER re A telephonic status conference was held on 2/27/08 regarding petitioner's counsel's Motion Not to Publish the Decision. Petitioner's motion was deemed to a motion to redact identities, that motion is GRANTED. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephone Status Conference was held on 2/27/2008 from 2:00 until 2:25 to discuss petitioners' counsel's motion not to publish. Mr. Richard Gage represented petitioners and Mr. Glenn MacLeod represented respondent. (cc2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 122 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/8/2008 Order
                                Reissuance of Decision on Entitlement. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 121 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Review of [116] DECISION of Special Master by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA filed nunc pro tunc, March 3, 2008. Service: 2/29/08.Response to Motion for Review due by 4/2/2008. (dls)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 120 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER sua sponte granting petitioner leave to exceed the page limit for its memorandum of objections, and directing the Clerk to file petioner's motion for review as of March 3, 2008, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Remark
                                      Remark. The Reissued Decision filed on 3/05/08 was sent to Petitioner's counsel via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery by the Clerk on 3/05/08. Tracking no. 8651 8314 8407 (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 119 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          Case assigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 118 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            PETITIONERS' MOTION TO NOT PUBLISH DECISION, filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 2/18/08.Response due by 3/10/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 117 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Status Conference Order
                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/27/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 116 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 DECISION of Special Master
                                                DECISION Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                                                  Remark. A copy of the Decision dated 1/31/08 was sent to Petitioner's Counsel on 1/31/08, by the Clerk of Court, via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery. Tracking no. 8651-8314-8576 (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Gage. Service: 11/29/07.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Post-Hearing Brief
                                                      POST HEARING REPLY BRIEF by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 8/17/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Notice of Compliance due by 9/3/2007. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Memorandum
                                                          MEMORANDUM: RESPONDENT POST-HEARING SUBMISSION, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/3/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                            ORDER granting [110] Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's counsel shall file his responsive brief by 8/03/07. Petitioner's counsel shall file his reply brief or a statement declining the opportunity to do so by 8/17/07. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007, Terminated: 7/6/2007 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/03/07 to file the Post Hearing Brief, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/29/07.Response due by 7/16/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Post-Hearing Brief
                                                                POST HEARING BRIEF by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 6/8/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Expert Report
                                                                  EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Shane (Ex. no. 29) filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 5/29/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file his post-hearing brief due by 6/08/07. Respondent's counsel shall file his responsive brief due by 7/06/07. Petitioner's counsel shall file his reply brief or a statement declining the opportunity to do so by 7/20/07. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/18/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's counsel shall file his post-hearing brief due by 5/11/07. Respondent's counsel shall file his responsive brief by 6/08/07. Petitioner's counsel shall file his reply brief or a statement declining the opportunity to do so by 6/22/07. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic status conference was held on 3/13/2007 from 2:00 until 2:10 PM, and the parties' post-hearing briefing was scheduled. Mr. Richard Gage represented petitioner and Mr. Glenn MacLeod represented respondent. (cc2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/13/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. The court will contact the parties to initiate the call. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/19/2007 Expert Report
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING: REPORT of Dr.Gilbert-Barness (Ex. no. OO) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/15/07.(tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                              ORDER granting [102] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [102] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [101] Scheduling Order. Respondent shall file the rebuttal expert report from Dr. Gilbert-Barness by 2/15/07. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [101] Scheduling Order , filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 1/08/07.Response due by 1/25/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/10/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's oral request to file the rebuttal expert report from Dr. Gilbert-Barness is granted. Expert Report due by 1/12/2007. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit(s) #27- Affidavit and Exhibit #28 Medical Literature by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 11/16/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-327) held on October 12, 2006 before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit #26 (Medical Literature) by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 11/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit HH- Updated CV for Enid Gilbert-Barness, M.D. by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/07/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                            MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #II, JJ, KK, LL, MM, NN] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/07/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING Medical Literature (Exhibits #21-24) and Affidavit (Exhibit #25) by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 11/30/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's counsel's oral request for a two-day extension of time to file the Post Hearing Brief is granted. Post Hearing Brief due by 11/7/2006. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: At respondent's request, the undersigned also grants the oral unopposed motion for an enlargement of time for all filings in paragraph 2 of the 10/17/06 Order. The filings are now due by 11/03/06. On or before 11/03/06, respondent shall file support for Dr. Gilbert-Barness's statement in her opinion letter dated 5/11/06. On or before 11/03/06, petitioner shall file a supplemental affidavit. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic Status Conference was held on 10/23/2006 from 3:30 until 4:00 PM (ET). Mr. Richard Gage represented petitioner and Mr. Glenn MacLeod represented respondent. (cc2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/23/2006 03:30 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/13/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 10/20/06, the parties shall provide copies of their court filings to the court reporter. On or before 10/27/06: Petitioner's counsel shall file a clear copy of the PDR; Petitioner's counsel shall file a complete copy of Exhibit #17; Dr. Gilbert-Barnes shall file a current CV; andthe parties shall file Medical Literature. On or before 12/22/06, petitioner's counsel shall file his post-hearing brief. On or before 1/19/07, respondent's counsel shall file his responsive brief. On or before 2/09/07, petitioner's counsel shall file his reply brief or a statement declining the opportunity to reply. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : Hearing was held on 10/12/2006 in Eugene, Oregon. Mr. Richard Gage represented petitioner and Mr. Glenn MacLeod represented respondent. (cc2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Order
                                                                                                              ORDER re Testimony at the October 12, 2006 Hearing. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #19-20] filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 10/06/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                  MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #18 - Medical Article by Couillin, et al.] filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 10/02/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Gage. Service: 10/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION of UNCONTESTED FACT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Joint Statement of Facts/Issues to be resolved by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit GG] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/03/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file their joint stipulations of fact on or before 10/04/06. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #EEE-FFF] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/29/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING (Pretrial Exhibits #14-17) by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 9/28/06.(tjk, ) Modified on 10/2/2006 (tjk, ).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Prehearing Order
                                                                                                                                  PREHEARING ORDER:Prehearing Memoranda due by 9/29/2006. Hearing set for 10/12/2006 09:00 AM in Out of Town Location before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file all factual stipulations and a statement identifying all factual issues to be addressed through witness testimony due by 9/29/06. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic Status Conference was held on 9/25/2006 from 1:30 until 1:55 PM (ET). Mr. Richard Gage represented petitioner and Mr. Glenn MacLeod represented Respondent. (cc2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                        EXPERT REPORT of Christine McCusker, M.D. (Ex. no. E) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/25/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING: MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit DD] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/25/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/25/2006 01:30 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                                              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #F-CC] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/21/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 9/15/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The hearing in this case will take place in Eugene, Oregon on Thursday, 10/12/06. Respondent shall file the outstanding Medical Literature due by 9/25/06. The respective counsel shall also file telephone information for Dr. Shane and Dr. Gilbert-Barness due by 9/15/06. Petitioner shall file a Status Report due by 9/15/06. Petitioner shall file a Status Report and indicate whether or not Dr. Levin intends to file any documentation in support of his expert opinion; if so counsel shall file that documentation due by 9/25/06. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                    Prehearing Witness List, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/15/06.(dls )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/10/2006 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Special Master Patricia Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing counsel to contact the court to schedule a hearing date. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re The parties shall contact the court to finalize a date for the hearing. The Hearing shall be held on September 25, 26, or October 3-13. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING: EXPERT REPORT of Christine McCusker, M.D. (Ex. C) and Medical Literature (Ex. D) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/21/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file the Expert Report due by 7/21/2006. Status Conference set for 7/25/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                                                Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/12/06. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 5/22/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Respondent's Expert Report and Rule 4(c) report should be filed prior to that date. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/1/2006 01:30 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [61] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Richard Gage for LAMAR VISARRAGA and KIM VISARRAGA. Attorney Kirk Allan Morgan terminated. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The status conference set for 3/03/06 was cancelled. Respondent shall file a medical expert report and, if such has not been previously filed, a Rule 4(c) Report, by the close of business 4/21/06. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/10/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Attorney Richard Gage in place of Kirk Morgan , filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 2/27/06. Response due by 3/16/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                            EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Alan S. Levin, M.D., J.D. (Ex. no. 12) and Curriculum Vitae of Expert (Ex. no. 13) filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 2/21/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/3/2006 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file their Expert Report along with any attendant documentation, including a CV and any literature utilized by the expert is due by 2/21/06. Respondent's Expert Report is due by 3/31/2006. Status Conference set for 2/24/2006 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 12/29/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Expert Report, along with a CV and any medical literature due by 1/3/2006. Status Conference set for 1/18/2006 01:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on December 2, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/2/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall submit a Status Report by close of business 10/26/2005. Petitioner shall file a supplemental medical report by close of business 11/30/05. The Order to Show Cause is held in abeyance until that time. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on October 11, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/11/2005 at 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUBPOENA ORDER. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on September 8, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file an Expert Report due by 9/6/2005. Status Conference set for 9/8/2005 11:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on July 26, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 7/15/2005. Status Conference reset for 7/26/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners Expert Report due by 7/8/2005. Telephonic Status Conference reset for 7/21/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's supplemental report (along with any other evidence)due by 6/6/2005. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/9/2005 11:00 AM (AM) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on March 28, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/28/2005 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/11/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kirk A. Morgan in place of Richard Gage by KIM VISARRAGA, LAMAR VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA.Service: 09/16/03. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO DEFER PROCEEDINGS IN HEPATITIS B. CASE by KIM VISARRAGA, LAMAR VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 08/29/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Petitioners' Status Report deadline to 9/3/02 and every 30 days thereafter. ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 5/16/02 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 4/18/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA and MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 3/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA and MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 1/25/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 10/25/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA. Service: 12/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA and MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 9/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA Service: 8/29/01 (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 7/23/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 7/3/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 5/3/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 4/3/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA Service: 1/11/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 9/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due: 9/15/00 ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 7/14/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to Remain in the Program by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 6/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/10/00 for Petitioner to file a notice of intent. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Supplemental Expert Report due: 6/6/00 for petitioners, with respondent's Rule 4 report and medical expert report due within 45 days from filing of petitioners' report. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set date Respondent's Report due to 5/12/00 and set Expert Report due: 5/12/00 for HHS. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 11 "Expert Report of Dr. John Shane" by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA and MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 4/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 1/19/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing Exhibit 9 "Medical Records of Dr. Carl Hsu" by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA and MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 1/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER staying proceedings for 180 days. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 11/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Additional Documents (pediatric records and pathologist's report) due: 11/15/99 for MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA, for KIM VISARRAGA, for LAMAR VISARRAGA. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by HHS (Service : 8/27/99 ) for production of records. Response due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibit 8 by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 98-121V FOR ORDER reassigning this case to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER canceling the status conference scheduled for 9/28/99. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Petitioners shall file as soon as practicable: affidavit from Mrs. Visarraga, supplemental affidavit from Mr. or Mrs. Visarraga and a pathology report from Dr. Shane; Respondent shall file a Rule 4(b) report and medical expert report 30 days after Petitioenrs file a pathology report; and set status conference for 2:30 p.m., 9/28/99. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing Exhibit 7 by LAMAR VISARRAGA, KIM VISARRAGA, MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA. Service: 7/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: the parties are given permission to subpoena the slides from Monica's autopsy; as soon as practicable, Petitioners shall refile Ex. 2, p. 9, affidavit from Mrs. Visarraga, supplemental affidavit from Mr. or Mrs. Visarraga and a pathology report from Dr. Shane; and set status conference for 3:30 p.m., 7/14/99. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Rule 4(a) Status Conference set for: 2:30 p.m. 5/17/99 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Glenn Alexander MacLeod. Service: 5/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/14/99 for Respondent to enter a notice of appearance. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 6), by LAMAR VISARRAGA and KIM VISARRAGA, as Representatives of the Estate of MONICA MARIE VISARRAGA, Deceased. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047291, Vac. Date: 12/21/94 (Respondent's report due 7/7/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 364 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?