WILLIAMS v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00261-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelly Clayton Fristoe +1 512 447 9900
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Althea Walker Davis +1 202 616 0515 +1 202 353 2988 althea.davis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/29/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/30/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed for failure to prosecute. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 DECISION of Special Master
      Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS (Service : 4/14/00 ) for Shelly C. Fristoe to Withdraw as Attorney. Response due: 5/1/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 4/14/00 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Order
            ORDER set amended petition deadline to 3/24/00 ; set Additional Documents (records Respondent requested on (7/2/99) due: 3/24/00 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS ; set Expert Report due: 3/24/00 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS ; or set Petitioner's Status Report deadline to 3/24/00. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Order
              ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 2/15/00. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000 Order
                ORDER re: Pursuant to Vaccine Rule 9, the time for filing the Special Master's decision is hereby suspended for 180 days (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. Service: 1/21/00. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by HHS to [11-2] order. Service: 1/27/00. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Order
                      ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 1/25/00. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 Order
                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to produce medical records and an expert opinion. Reset Additional Documents (medical records) due: 1/10/00 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS and reset Expert Report due: 1/10/00 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Terminated:
                          MOTION by JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS (Service : 11/24/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS Added Shelly Clayton Fristoe. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999, Terminated: 12/2/1999 Terminated:
                            MOTION by JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS (Service : 11/24/99 ) to Extend Time to produce medical records and an expert opinion [until January 10, 2000]. Response due: 12/13/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Order
                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to compel production of records, granting [6-2] motion for medical expert opinion. Set Additional Documents (records requested by Respondent) due: 8/30/99 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS and set Expert Report due: 8/30/99 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999, Terminated: 7/7/1999 Terminated:
                                MOTION by HHS (Service : 7/2/99 ) to compel production of records and for medical expert opinion. Response due: 7/19/99 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Scheduling Order
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Additional Documents (medical records or medical expert opinion) due: 7/2/99 for HHS and if respondent does not move for the production of mentioned documents, respondent shell file the Rule 4 report by 7/28/99 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Althea Walker Davis. Service: 6/2/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Order
                                      ORDER set Additional Documents (pre- and post-injury physician or clinic records) due: 7/2/99 for JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999
                                        Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047502 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999
                                          NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999
                                            PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 24), by JESSIE MAE WILLIAMS. Vac. Date: 9/28/90 (Respondent's report due 7/28/99). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999
                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?