SIRLS v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00011-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA SIRLS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
No Logo NICHOLAS JOHNSON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Daniel Pyles +1 202 616 9847 +1 202 353 2988 ryan.pyles@usdoj.gov
Space Mark Curtis Raby +1 202 616 4111 mark.raby@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/7/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
SCHEDULING ORDER:( Status Report due by 9/16/2008, Motion(s) due by 9/2/2008., Response due by 9/16/2008., Reply due by 9/30/2008., Status Conference set for 9/19/2008 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell.) Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
    ORDER By the next status conference, the parties shall state their position on the accuracy of transcription from the recent hearing, moving the Court for emendations, where appropriate. (Notice of Compliance due by 8/26/2008.) Also at the next status conference, the parties shall inform the Court on their position regarding additional proceedings: whether they should be convened live or telephonic. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
      ORDER The Court reminded Petitioners that fact witnesses must testify live, even though expert witnesses customarily may testify telephonically. The Court announced that proceedings would commence each day of the hearing at 9:00 AM (EDT), unless other arrangements are soon made with the Court via my law clerk. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
        ORDER (Notice of Compliance due by 5/13/2008.) The Court enumerated a number of details regarding the upcoming causation hearing in this group of cases. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
          Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Conference set for 5/13/2008 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell.) (tjk, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
            ORDER The previously-mentioned article of medical literature that Petitioners have sought to file as supplemental support of their medical theory of causation, has eluded their search yet again. Apparently, it is a published article from the Food and Drug Administration. The difficulty and delay in its filing could present a problem of unfair surprise. The Court addressed this problem by ordering Petitioner to inform Respondent and the Court regarding the citation and other information surrounding the study. Once that is done, the Court expects the parties to work in tandem to acquire the article if possible, and to do all in an expeditious manner. Notice of Compliance due by 4/29/2008. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Daniel Pyles for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Pyles, Ryan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                  HEARING ORDER: Entitlement (Causation) Hearing in re: Kolakowski (test case) in Court of Federal Claims Main Court Building, set for 6/9/2008 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell, and to continue on 10, 11, 23, 24, 25, and 26 June 2008. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's last filing of Medical literature due by 2/29/2008. Status Conference set for 3/4/2008 09:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/31/2008 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Additional medical literature due from Petitioners by 25 January 2008. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/17/2007 at 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. In Kolakowski only: Petitioner to file additional expert report from neurologist by 9 November 2007. Respondent then to file responsive/supplemental expert report(s) on or before 10 December 2007. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference held on 20 August 2007. Next Status Conference set for 9/24/2007 at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/20/2007 09:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Supplemental Expert Report and/or Status Report due by 8/17/2007 from Petitioner. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/3/2007 at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell, for the purpose of preparing for a hearing on entitlement in the Kolakowski case, which is a stipulated "test" case for this group of cases. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell: A Status Conference in this case was held on 17 January 2007, in conjunction with several other cases that are similar in nature. Counsel stated that the Paseka/Haynes case is caught up to the rest of the cases, and both agreed that the Kolakowski case will proceed forward as the test case in this group. Respondent moved the Court for an enlargement of time in which to file its medical expert opinion reports, which had previously been due on 17 January 2007. Hearing no objection from the Petitioners, the Court granted Respondent's motion, and extended the deadline until 17 April 2007. (irk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's Expert Report in Kolakowski (test) case, previously due by 1/17/2007, is now due by 4/17/2007. Next Status Conference is set for 4/23/2007 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard B. Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell. (dlm, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mij, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                      ORDER directing the CLERK to designate case an electronic case in the CM/ECF system. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mij, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION to designate the case electronic , filed by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 10/27/06.Response due by 11/13/2006. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 82 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Scheduling Order
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file all expert reports, along with CVs and any Medical literature prior to the Status Conference set for 1/17/07. Status Conference set for 1/17/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 81 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Status Conference Order
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Respondent is ordered to respond to the Court if they will be contesting KOLAKOWSKI by 8/02/06. Status Conference set for 9/15/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 80 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 7/26/2006 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 79 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Description not available
                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/28/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/12/2006 02:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mij, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the Cardiovascular Expert Report due by 5/26/2006. Status Conference set for 5/30/2006 01:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 4/28/06.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Cardiovascular Expert Report due by 4/28/2006. Status Conference reset for 5/1/2006 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by Petitioners Service: 2/28/06.(tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Expert Report
                                                            EXPERT REPORT of Dr. George Lucier (Ex. no. 21) filed by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 1/31/06.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 notice of filing
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit #20 [Bibliography of medical literature cited by Dr. George Lucier in his medical expert report dated 1/12/06- Ex. 18, with medical articles] by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 1/26/06.(tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners indicated they shall submit the medical literture mentioned in the toxicology report, which was filed in the test cases Johnson and Kolakowski by 1/27/06. The reports from the cardiovascular specialist and from Dr. Shane will be filed by 2/28/06. Status Conference set for 3/9/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Expert Report
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING: EXPERT REPORT of Dr. George Lucier (Ex. no. 18) and CURRICULUM VITAE (Ex. no. 19) filed by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 1/17/06.(tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' request for an extention of time to file the toxicological expert report is granted. The report is now due 1/16/06. Reports from the cardiovascular specialist and from Dr. Shane remain due by 2/28/06 Status Conference set for 1/19/2006 12:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners have requested an extention of time to file the toxicologist report. Petitioner shall file said report with a CV and any attendant documentation by close of business 12/30/05. Reports from the cardiovascular specialist and from Dr. Shane are now due 2/28/06. The status conference scheduled for 12/05/05 was cancelled. Therefore, parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk to reset that conference call. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reports from the cardiovascular specialist and from Dr. Shane are now due 2/28/06. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file the toxicologist report, cv and any pertinent medical literature by the close of business 11/30/05. Reports from the cardiovascular specialist and from Dr. Shane shall be filed by the close of business 1/31/06. A follow up Status Conference is set for 12/5/2005 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Status Report
                                                                            STATUS REPORT filed by PETITIONER. Service: 10/14/05.(tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Report due by 1/31/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a Status Report due by 10/14/2005. Status Conference set for 10/17/2005 01:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Status Report
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by PETITIONER. Service: 8/15/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a Status Report due by 8/15/2005. Status Conference set for 8/24/2005 10:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Status Report
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by PETITIONER.Service: 6/22/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING: Exhibit #16 [Letter dated 6/18/03 addressed to the Honorable Dave Weldon from Amit K. Sachdev] and Exhibit #17 [Literature -Immunization Safety Review] by PETITIONER. Service: 6/03/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Prehearing Order
                                                                                          PREHEARING ORDER: Prehearing Submissions due by 6/22/2005. Status Conference set for 6/24/2005 09:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Medical Literature
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING: MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #15] filed by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 4/28/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/9/2005 12:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file any additional information regarding Thimerosal content by the close-of-business 4/13/05. Status Conference set for 4/14/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/23/2005 01:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the Medical Expert Report due by 5/2/2005. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/15/2005 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 1/28/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Richard Abell for all further proceedings. Special Master E. LaVon French no longer assigned to case. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                          RESCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 1/31/2005 01:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by NICHOLAS JOHNSON, ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 12/03/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/06/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                ORDER: Respondents will submit an informal report to the Court and to Petitioners due by 12/06/04. Petitioners shall file a Status Report due by 12/6/2004. Status Conference set for 12/8/2004 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, ) Modified on 11/18/2004 (tjk, ).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/5/2004 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by NICHOLAS JOHNSON, ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 10/1/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 ERRATA
                                                                                                                      ERRATA correcting 8/17/04 Order. (jat, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                        ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/8/2004 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/18/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER: This Order is a supplement to the 6/15/04 Order. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners are to fax a detailed Status Report to the parties due by 7/30/2004. Respondents shall construct a list regarding thimerosal vaccines due by 6/18/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/13/2004 10:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit #14 (Santa Ana Fire Department Incident Report dated January 10, 1996) by NICHOLAS JOHNSON, ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 5/14/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/14/2004 02:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Petitioners are to fax a status of the items tasked as a result of the 5/7/04 hearing to Respondent and the Court by 6/7/2004. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner's counsel shall file items as discussed in the March 4, 2004 telephonic conference by 4/30/2004. Status Conference set for 5/7/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Curtis Raby for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/01/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/4/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit #13 [Police reports] by NICHOLAS JOHNSON, ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 2/10/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/6/2004 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER The Court held a joint status conference on 21 November 2003. As a follow-up to that status conference, Respondent provided the Court with a list of medical records and other filings still outstanding. Accordingly the Court has attached Repondent's list to this order and Petitioners shall file the outstanding records and other filings enumerated on such poste haste. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/19/2003 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re The Court held a joint status conference for these cases on 20 October 2003. The first order of business addressed during the status conference was the cases that are to be included in this grouping. The Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan firm had provided the Court with a listing of fourteen cases just prior to the status conference, however, the Court had questions concerning the exclusion and inclusion of certain Shoemaker and Associates cases. Accordingly, the Court expects Shoemaker and Associates to provide the Court with a comprehensive list of their cases that are to be included in this grouping. Accordingly, the Court expects Shoemaker and Associates to provide the Court with a comprehensive list of their cases that are to be included in this grouping. Joint Status Conference set for 21 November 2003 10:30 a.m., E.S.T. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT filed by ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 5/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Medical Expert Report due: 5/7/02 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 2/5/01 ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 11:00 a.m., 11/19/01 ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master E. L. French Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ANGELA SIRLS and NICHOLAS JOHNSON to [23-1] Report Respondent's. Service: 5/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing Exhibit 12: clarification of vaccination record dates by ANGELA SIRLS. Service: 3/30/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Ronald Craig Homer (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 11/17/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER date Respondent's Report due to 11/17/00 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The Court grants petitioner's attorney's request for issuance of a subpoena (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 7/7/00. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 4/29/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing "Petitioner's Election To Remain In The Program" by ANGELA SIRLS and NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 3/16/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/11/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/7/00 for Petitioner to file a notice of intent. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/11/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/13/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set Additional Documents (supporting documentation) due: 4/3/00 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS or set Petitioners' Status Report deadline to 4/3/00. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Stay Proceedings ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999, Terminated: 9/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ANGELA SIRLS and NICHOLAS JOHNSON (Service: 9/14/99) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 10/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: the proceedings are suspended for 180 days. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 98-121V FOR ORDER reassigning this case to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER reset Expert Report due: 9/9/99 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER reset Expert Report due: 7/6/99 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re-assigning this case to Special Master E. L. French Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Michael Patrick Milmoe. Service : 3/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing Exhibit 10 and 11 by ANGELA SIRLS, NICHOLAS JOHNSON. Service: 3/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Additional Documents (coroner's report, microscopic slides of the autopsy (to Respondent)) due: 3/9/99 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS and set Expert Report due: 5/5/99 for NICHOLAS JOHNSON, for ANGELA SIRLS. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 1:00 p.m., 2/4/99. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Eleanor Ann Barry. Service : 1/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: parties shall confer and contact the special mater's office with sugested dates for the initial status conferene by 2/1/99 ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 9), by ANGELA SIRLS, as Mother and Legal Representative of NICHOLAS JOHNSON, deceased. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046816, Vac. Date: 1/9/96 (Respondent's report due 4/7/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?