SHULTZ, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00156-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEB SHULTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
No Logo LYNN SHULTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
No Logo TAMARIN SHULTZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Kathleen Donohue +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 ann.donohue@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/23/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $3500000
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/31/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002
Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $37,830.28. This amount consists of $29,225.00 for fees and $8,605.28 for other costs. Mr. Curtis Webb shall be reimbursed $37,830.28 for attorney's fees and costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Notice Not to Seek Review
      JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
        Decision of Special Master E. L. French re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 notice of filing
          Notice of filing of statement concerning costs by TAMARIN SHULTZ. Service: 8/13/02. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
            MOTION by TAMARIN SHULTZ (Service: 8/13/02) for Attorney Fees and Costs . Response due: 8/30/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) that the petition is dismissed with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 DECISION of Special Master
                  Decision of Special Master E. L. French . Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: evidentiary hearing, 1 volume, at Minneapolis, MN, for date of January 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Order
                      ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Amend caption. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ (Service: 1/15/02) to Amend caption to read "JEB SHULTZ and LYNN SHULTZ, as legal representatives of their minor daughter, TAMARIN SHULTZ v. HHS". Response due: 2/1/02. (LTD) Modified on 01/25/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
                          Evidentiary Hearing held ( Transcript due 2/19/02 ) (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Prehearing Submissions
                            Prehearing Submissions by HHS Service: 1/4/02 (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 notice of filing
                              Notice of filing Exhibits 31 through 38 by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ, TAMARIN SCHULTZ Service: 1/2/02 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Prehearing Submissions
                                Prehearing Submissions by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ, TAMARIN SCHULTZ Service: 1/2/02 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Ann Kathleen Donohue. Service : 12/4/01 (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Order
                                    ORDER setting Evidentiary Hearing for 9:00 a.m. on 1/18/02 , and Parties' Prehearing Submissions due 1/4/02 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                      Expert Report of Jerome O. Klein,M.D. (Exhibit A) and Dr. Klein's CV (Exhibit B) by HHS. Service: 6/15/01 (AB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001
                                        ORDER re: reminder ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Order
                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 6/13/01 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001
                                            ORDER Medical Expert Report due: 4/9/01 for HHS (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 notice of filing
                                              Notice of filing Exhibits 15-30: medical journal articles by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. Service: 2/20/01 (AB)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                Expert Report of Rlph Scott Shapiro, MD (Exhibit 13) and Dr. Shapiro's CV (Exhibit 14) by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. Service: 2/20/01 (AB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Order
                                                  ORDER reset Expert Report due: 2/1/01 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Order
                                                    ORDER reset Expert Report due: 12/1/00 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Order
                                                      ORDER reset Expert Report due: 10/2/00 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of Choice to have Petition remain before the Special Master by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ, TAMARIN SCHULTZ. Service: 5/11/00 (JT) Modified on 05/17/2000
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Expert Report due: 8/21/00 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ, TAMARIN SCHULTZ Service: 5/1/00 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Order
                                                              ORDER re: the Petitioner has 30 days to file a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 Scheduling Order
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Expert Report due: 1/5/00 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Order
                                                                  ORDER suspending the matter for 180 days. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Order
                                                                    ORDER Expert Report due: 11/5/99 for TAMARIN SCHULTZ, for WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ and Expert Report due: 12/20/99 for HHS (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Linda Sara Renzi. Service: 7/28/99. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Respondent's Report
                                                                        RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Order
                                                                          ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 7/23/99. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 Order
                                                                            ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 7/16/99. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Order
                                                                              ORDER set date Respondent's Report due to 7/6/99 and set status conference for 12:00 p.m., 8/5/99. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Order
                                                                                ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master E. L. French Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Order
                                                                                  INITIAL ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/8/99 for Respondent to file an appearance of an attorney. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Petition
                                                                                      PETITION (Filed with 1 large bound volume containing Exhibits 1 through 12), by WHITNEY RICH SCHULTZ, as the legal representative of her minor daughter, TAMARIN SCHULTZ. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047200, Vac. Date: 6/6/91 (Respondent's report due 6/21/99). (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?