SCHNEIDER v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00160-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, Petitioner
No Logo JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Althea Walker Davis +1 202 616 0515 +1 202 353 2988 althea.davis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/23/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Court
County
Terminated 1/14/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 89 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $17,664.68. Mr. Tsarouhas may collect $15,016.44 from Ms. Schneider. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 88 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/17/2005 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 87 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT (Response to [85]AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING FOR ATTORNEY EXPENSES)by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/08/05.(tjk, ).
        LREF
        Blank 86 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action
        Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action re: [77] Judgment. Service: 3/09/05.(tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 85 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 notice of filing
          AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING FOR ATTORNEY EXPENSES PER ORDER by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. [Filed by leave of the Special Master] (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 84 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION [Reissuance of the 1/12/05 Decision]. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 83 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Terminated:
              MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER.Service: 3/01/05. Response due by 3/18/2005 (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 82 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Order
                ORDER: Petitioner may file, if at all, by no later than 3/11/05, an amended Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 81 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Petitioner's Costs by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER.Service: 2/02/05. Response due by 2/22/2005 (tjk, ). [Filed by leave of the Special Master]
                    LREF
                    Blank 80 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Published Decision of Special Master
                    PUBLISHED DECISION of Special Master John F. Edwards Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 79 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Order
                      ORDER: Respondent's motion for publication of the special master's 9/30/04 decision is granted. The special master reissues for publication in a separate document his 9/3/04 decision. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/20/04 before Judge John P. Wiese. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 77 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Appendix B, Rule 30, that the petition is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 76 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER AFFIRMING SPECIAL MASTER'S DECISION denying [70] MOTION for Review of [68] DECISION of Special Master filed by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/20/2005. (vp1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 75 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon the request of petitioner, the Oral Argument currently scheduled for 12/14/04, has been rescheduled and will be held on Monday, 12/20/04 at 2:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 74 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon the request of petitioner, the Oral Argument currently scheduled for 12/7/2004, has been rescheduled and will be held on Tuesday, 12/14/2004 at 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Special Master John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 73 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral argumenet on petitioner's motion for review of the special master's 9/3/2004, decision shall be held on Tuesday, 12/7/2004 at 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Special Master John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 72 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to [70] Petitioner's MOTION for Review of [68] DECISION of Special Master by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 10/29/2004. Reply due by 11/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 71 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dls)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 70 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 1/12/2005 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Review of [68] DECISION of Special Master filed by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER.Service: 9/28/04.Response due: 10/29/2004. (dls)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                            Case assigned to Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 69 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Terminated:
                                              MOTION to Publish by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 9/10/04. Response due by 9/27/2004 (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 7/20/2004 before Special Master John Edwards. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/20/2004. (vp1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 notice of filing
                                                      Petitioner's Statement with Volume 3 (Miscellaneous documents, Exhibits 1-14) by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 7/19/04.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Medical Records
                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #1-5] filed by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 7/02/04.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Hearing Order
                                                          HEARING ORDER: Hearing set for 7/20/2004 10:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master John F. Edwards. The hearing will held in the General Services Administration Conference Room #769 at the Federal Building, 1240 East 9th Street, Cleveland, Ohio. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/07/04.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Status Report
                                                              STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/16/04.(jat, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 6/8/04.(jat, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 7/20/2004 10:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards in Cleveland Ohio. Parties will be informed of the exact location by later order. Status Reports due by 6/11/2004. Petitioner shall file all neurology records generated after March 2003 by 7/2/2004. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, ) Modified on 5/20/2004 (tjk, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT (copy to Respondent) by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Status Report/Order
                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDERPetitioners' time to file a Status Report is enlarged to 4/30/2004. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jat, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Status Report
                                                                        STATUS REPORT by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 3/25/04.(tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Status Report/Order
                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDERPetitioner shall file a Status Report regarding hearing dates due by 3/26/2004 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Description not available
                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/8/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Response
                                                                              RESPONSE to Order Filed October 27, 2003 by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER.Service: 1/15/04. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Expert Report due by 1/15/2004 that supports Ms. Schneider's case or the special master will dismiss the petition. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                  ORDER denying [44] Motion to Issue Subpoena. In National Vaccine Injury Compensation Program practice, "there may be no discovery in a proceeding on a petition other than the discovery required by the special master." A party seeking formal discovery must state "with particularity" the purpose of the discovery. In addition, a party seeking formal discovery must establish that "informal techniques" of discovery "have not been sufficient." Respondent's Opposition highlights the very real, significant deficiencies in petitioner's Motion. Based upon respondent's opposition, the special master concludes that petitioner lacks appropriate good grounds for the Motion. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : Status Conference held on 10/20/03. (abb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/18/2003 Description not available
                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/20/2003 12:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 notice of filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Addition to Petition by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 10/05/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) A-E] filed by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 8/8/2003.(mlp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS filed by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 8/4/2003.(mlp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Response
                                                                                              RESPONSE to order of May 19, 2003 by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. (mlp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner may reply to Respondent's opposition to Petitioner's motion for subpoena by 8/11/2003. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jat, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [44] MOTION to Issue Subpoena, [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER.Service: 07/09/03. Reply due by 8/5/2003. (jmm, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003, Terminated: 10/24/2003 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                    MOTION to Issue Subpoena by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER.Service: 06/30/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (jmm, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/25/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner shall comply completely with the special master's 1/23/03 order by 7/30/2003. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jat, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                        *** Attorney Antonios Panagiotis Tsarouhas terminated. (jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Antonios Panagiotis Tsarouhas and MOTION to Continue all set dates by ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, JOHN R. SCHNEIDER.Service: 04/25/03. Response due by 5/12/2003 (jmm, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Order
                                                                                                            ORDER Petitioner's medical records and expert opinion due 4/25/03 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                              ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 1/23/03 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER Service: 12/23/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER Petitioner's shall comply with the Special Master;s 9/12/02 order by 12/20/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00a.m. 11/26/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 10/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER Preliminary Medical Opinion due: 10/25/02 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 6/11/02 (AB)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Expert Report due: 6/10/02 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. Service: 8/7/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [29-1] report Expert Report due: 7/30/01 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER and JOHN R. SCHNEIDER (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER Service: 4/4/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER reset Expert Report due: 4/30/01 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER , and set Status Report deadline to 3/23/01 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER Service: 1/8/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Expert Report due: 1/31/01 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and Status Report deadline to 12/29/00 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 10/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Expert Report due: 11/10/00 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER Service: 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 5/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: petitioners shall file notice of intent to withdraw petition or remain in the program by 6/23/00 ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 4/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibit 23 by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 2/4/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set supplemental Expert Report due: 6/5/00 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and set Petitioners' Status Report deadline to 4/7/00. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Petitioner shall contact the Court by 1/21/00 re: dates and times for the status conference. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 01/04/2000
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 12/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/21/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER suspending the proceedings for 180 days. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set date Respondent's Report due to 12/10/99. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing medical records by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 10/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file Rule 4 Report. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 11/4/99 for Petitioners to file the requested factual affidavits and medical records. Respondent's Rule 4 Report shall be due within 45 days after the filing of Petitoners' documents. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth O. Schneider's by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service 9/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999, Terminated: 10/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by HHS (Service : 9/22/99 ) to Extend Time to file Rule 4 Report. Response due: 10/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing "Curriculum Vitae of John A. Tilelli, M.D." by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 8/10/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing and Expert Report by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 7/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED PETITION by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. (Service: 6/17/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER and ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. Service: 6/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Petitioners' amended petition deadline to 6/4/99 ; set additional documents (complete petition to HHS, fact witness affidavits and medical records) due: 6/4/99 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER ; set expert report due: 6/4/99 for ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER, for JOHN R. SCHNEIDER. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Althea Walker Davis Service: 4/16/99 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Status Conference for 5/7/99 . Parties shall confer and agree upon a date for the status conference ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION (Filed with 1 very large bound volume of Exhibits), by JOHN R. SCHNEIDER, a minor by and through his natural mother and guardian, ELIZABETH O. SCHNEIDER. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047206, Vac. Date: 9/25/93 (Respondent's report due 6/21/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?