CAMERLIN, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00615-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
No Logo KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment with Annuity
County
Terminated 8/26/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 104 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $469,575.93, was forwarded to Ronald Homer, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 1/29/2008 Annuity
    Annuity in the amount of $2,320,749.00. Paid this date. (vk1)
      LREF
      Blank 103 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Satisfaction of Judgment
      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $87,168.60, was mailed to Ronald Homer, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (bre,)
        LREF
        Blank 102 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004
        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 43 (Appointment of Guardianship) by ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART. Service: 10/1/04.(jat, )
          LREF
          Blank 101 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $87,168.60, in addition to the August 26, 2004 judgment of compensation. The award shall be in the form of a check made payable to the petitioner and Mr. Ronald Homer. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 100 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Notice Not to Seek Review
            JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review by ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [99] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 99 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
              DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 98 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
                Petitioner's Election to Accept [95] Judgment. Service: 9/07/04.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                  ORDER: Petitioner shall file a response to respondent's objections to petitioner's application for fees and costs one week after petitioner receives respondent's objections. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 96 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Scheduling Order
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's objections to Petitioner's application for fees and costs due by 9/13/2004. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on August 31, 2004. (tlj, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 95 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the form of an annuity, as provided for in the above referred to special master's decision, together with the following lump sum payments:a. A lump sum payment of $469,575.93, representing compensation for pain and suffering ($233,993.93) and life care expenses for Year One ($234,582.00), payable to petitioner as court-appointed guardian/conservator of the Estate of Alexander Camerlin, for the benefit of Alexander Camerlin, as set forth in Appendix A: Items of Compensation for Alexander Camerlin. No payment will be made until proof that petitioner has been appointed guardian/conservator of the Estate of Alexander Camerlin is provided to the Secretary.b. A lump sum payment of $30,581.00, representing compensation for past un-reimbursable expenses, payable to Kimberly Camerlin McTaggert, petitioner, as set forth in Appendix A: Items of Compensation for Alexander Camerlin.c. A lump sum payment of $622,265.37, representing compensation for reimbursement of the state's Medicaid lien, payable jointly to petitioner and the State of Massachusetts, Center for Health Care Financing, Attention Michael Willett, as set forth in Appendix A: Items of Compensation for Alexander Camerlin. (lld, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 94 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
                          ERRATA correcting the 7/22/04 Decision. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 93 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Notice Not to Seek Review
                            JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review by ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [89] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 92 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART.Service: 8/05/04. Response due by 8/23/2004 (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                PETITIONER AND COUNSEL STATEMENT by ALEXANDER M CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN MCTAGGART. Service: 8/05/04.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 90 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004
                                  ORDER granting [87] Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 89 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004
                                    DECISION Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 88 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Proffer on Award of Compensation by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/19/04.(jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 87 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004, Terminated: 7/22/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION to Amend the Caption by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN.Service: 7/15/04. Response due by 8/2/2004 (jat, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 86 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Order
                                          ORDER: Respondent shall file a proffer by 7/19/2004. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 85 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 notice of filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 42 (Out-of-Pocket Expense Report) by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 6/1/04.(jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 84 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Description not available
                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/30/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on June 2, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/2/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Life Care Plan
                                                      LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Dr. Leif Nordstrom (Ex. no. 41) filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN.Life Care Plan due 6/7/2004. Service: 4/21/04.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Description not available
                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2004 11:30 AM, E.D.T. before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on April 22, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Description not available
                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/22/2004 11:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman, prior to next status conference petitioner shall file Dr. Nordstrom's medical expert report. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Description not available
                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/22/2004 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on February 17, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Description not available
                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 2/17/2004 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Watts for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/09/04.(tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Medical Records
                                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #40] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 1/26/04.(tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Description not available
                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/12/2004 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on January 13, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Medical Records
                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #39] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 1/06/04.(tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Description not available
                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2004 02:30 PM. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 1/7/2004 Medical Records
                                                                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #38] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 12/19/03.(tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                  MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #36-37] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 12/10/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order
                                                                                    DAMAGES ORDER Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 DECISION of Special Master
                                                                                      DECISION Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 1, 2003 before Judge Laura Millman. (dw1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Hearing held on July 1, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003
                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/1/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on June 24, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Prehearing Submissions
                                                                                                PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 06/18/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Medical Literature
                                                                                                  MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #33-35] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 06/18/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Prehearing Submissions
                                                                                                    PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 06/17/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit #31-32] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 05/30/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Medical Literature
                                                                                                        MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #P-R] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/28/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                          PREHEARING ORDER:Prehearing Submissions due by 6/17/2003. Prehearing Conference set for 6/24/03 11:00 AM. Telephonic Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/1/2003 09:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit #24-30] filed by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 4/28/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [58] Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION to Issue Subpoena by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN.Service: 4/17/03. Response due by 5/5/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER re: no later than 3/31/03, parties shall contact the Special Master's law clerk with a hearing date. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Exhibit O - Expert Report by HHS. Service: 2/21/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Order
                                                                                                                      ORDER Expert Report due: 2/21/03 for HHS , and Status Conference set for 11:00 a.m. on 2/27/03 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Exhibit N - Expert Report by HHS. Service: 2/7/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 notice of filing
                                                                                                                          Notice of filing of exhibit 23 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN. Service: 1/6/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER Respondent's response to Dr. Shapiro's medical expert report due 2/7/03 , and setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 2/13/03 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER Expert Report due: 1/8/03 for HHS , and Status Conference set for 11:00 a.m. on 1/22/03 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                Expert Report (of Ralph Shapiro, M.D., unsigned) by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN Service: 11/14/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 11/20/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing of exhibits K - M by HHS. Service: 11/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 10:30 a.m., 11/5/02 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Vincent James Matanoski. Service: 7/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 10:30 a.m. 9/16/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                            Expert Report by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 6/5/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 8/12/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 10:30 a.m. 6/6/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER resetting telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 5/7/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER resetting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 4/30/02 , and Medical Expert Report due: 3/22/02 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Petitioner shall file a Supplemental Report from Dr. Dooling by 2/22/02 , Respondent's shall file additional document's by 2/22/02 and Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 3/1/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibts G-J: medical literature by HHS Service: 11/13/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Petitioner's suppplemental report due by 12/7/01 , and Status Conference set for 11:00 a.m. on 12/10/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing Exhibit's C thru F by HHS. Service: 10/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 10/10/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                Expert Report of John Sladky, M.D. (Exhibit A) and CV (Exhibit B) by HHS. Service: 7/31/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Medical Expert Report due: 8/1/01 for HHS and Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 8/15/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:30 p.m. on 7/23/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Expert Report deadline to 8/1/01 for HHS (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibit 18 and Exhibit 19 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN and KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 5/16/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Expert Report due: 7/18/01 for HHS , and setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 7/23/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER expert report due: for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN and ALEXANDER CAMERLIN , and setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 5/16/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 4/13/01 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Medical Expert Report due: 3/20/01 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN (signed by Special Master Laura Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Medical Expert Report due: 2/20/01 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Ronald Craig Homer (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Expert Report due: 1/19/01 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN and set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 1/24/01. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibit 17 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 11/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of filing Exhibit 16 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Petitioner the authority to subpoena the CDC and set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 12/4/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 9/1/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing Exhibit 15 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 7/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set date Respondent's Report due to 9/1/00 ; set Expert Report due: 10/2/00 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN ; and set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 10/16/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing Exhibit 14 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 6/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of filing Exhibit 13A by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 6/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibits 1 thru 13 by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN and KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 5/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 7/18/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER extending the statutory deadline for 180 days. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Additional Documents (medical records) due: 4/27/00 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN and set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 5/8/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 11:00 a.m. 3/14/00 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN. Service: 1/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER reset Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 2/8/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Additional Documents (medical records) due: 1/27/00 for KIMBERLY CAMERLIN, for ALEXANDER CAMERLIN , set date Respondent's Report due to 4/28/00 and set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 2/7/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 11/4/99. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Gerard William Fischer. Service : 10/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN to Stay Proceedings for 120 days. Copy to respondent. Response due: 8/18/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION by ALEXANDER CAMERLIN, KIMBERLY CAMERLIN FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 047992 Vac. Date: 1/16/91 ( Respondent's report due 11/2/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 226 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?