VASQUEZ v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-vv-00888-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA VASQUEZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
No Logo STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/25/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $53,137.30, was mailed on September 9, 2002 to Curtis Webb, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $125,000.00, was mailed on September 13, 2002 to Curtis Webb, Esquire, attorney for the petitoners. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 47 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002
      Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002
        Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs, in addition to the judgment of compensation dated July 15, 2002,in the amount of $53,137.30 ($38,640.00 for fees and $14,497.30 for other costs). Mr. Curtis Webb shall be reimbursed $53,137.30 for attorney's fees and costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Notice Not to Seek Review
            JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Petitioner's Election
              PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 7/23/02. Election(y/n): y (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 42 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
                Decision of Special Master E. L. French re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002
                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $125,000.00, in the form of a check made payable to petitioner. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Notice Not to Seek Review
                      JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
                        MOTION by ANGELA VASQUEZ and STEPHANIE VASQUEZ (Service: 6/17/02) for Attorney Fees and Costs . Response due: 7/5/02. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 notice of filing
                          "STAEMENT CONCERNING COSTS" by ANGELA VASQUEZ and STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 6/17/02. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 DECISION of Special Master
                            Decision of Special Master E. L. French . Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002
                              Stipulation by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ and HHS of compensation. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Order
                                ORDER re: Joint Stipulation (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM and WITNESS LIST by ANGELA VASQUEZ. Service: 12/4/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Prehearing Submissions
                                    Prehearing Submissions by HHS. Service: 11/30/01. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 notice of filing
                                      Notice of filing Exhibits 23-28: medical literature by ANGELA VASQUEZ. Service: 11/7/01 (AB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Transcript
                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: hearing (one volume) taken at Boston, Massachusetts, on October 5, 2001. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Scheduling Order
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) setting Prehearing Submissions due: 12/3/01 for HHS, for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ; and (2) Evidentiary Hearing set for: 10:30 a.m., 12/12/01 (signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Order
                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 12:00 p.m. on 11/1/01 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 10/25/2001
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Order
                                              ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 12:00 p.m., 10/17/01 ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 10/25/2001
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 notice of filing
                                                Notice of filing Exhibit 23 by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 10/2/01 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Memorandum
                                                  PREHEARING MEMORANDUM by HHS. Service: 9/24/01. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Prehearing Submissions
                                                    Prehearing Submissions by ANGELA VASQUEZ Service: 9/20/01 (AB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Exhibit
                                                      Exhibit list by ANGELA VASQUEZ Service: 9/20/01 (AB)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Witness List
                                                        Witness list by ANGELA VASQUEZ Service: 9/20/01 (AB)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Order
                                                          ORDER Evidentiary Hearing: 9:30 a.m. 10/5/01 , in Boston, MA., and Prehearing Submissions due: 9/20/01 for for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Order
                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 6/13/01 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Order
                                                              ORDER Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 5/8/01 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                Expert Report of Robert S. Daum, M.D. (Exhibit A) and Dr. Daum's CV (Exhibit B) by HHS. Service: 4/23/01 (AB)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS REPORT by HHS Service: 2/7/01 (AB)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 notice of filing
                                                                    Notice of choice to have petition remain before the Special Master by ANGELA VASQUEZ and STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 12/14/00. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 notice of filing
                                                                      Notice of filing Exhibits 12-16 by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 12/5/00 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 notice of filing
                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibit 11 by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 12/5/00 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order
                                                                          ORDER re: Petitioner has 30 days after the filing of this notice to file notice choosing to continue or withdraw the petition (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                            Expert Report (& Curriculum Vitae) of F. Edward Yazbak, MD., by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. Service: 11/21/00. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Order
                                                                              ORDER reset Expert Report due: 11/27/00 for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Order
                                                                                ORDER reset Expert Report due: 10/31/00 for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Order
                                                                                  ORDER reset Expert Report due: 10/2/00 for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/6/2000 Order
                                                                                    ORDER suspending this matter for 180 days. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Expert Report due: 8/21/00 for STEPHANIE VASQUEZ, for ANGELA VASQUEZ. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by ANGELA VASQUEZ, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ Service: 5/1/00 (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000
                                                                                          RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 1/21/00 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Order
                                                                                            ORDER set Status Conference for 12:00 p.m., 12/15/99. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Vincent James Matanoski. Service : 10/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/30/1999 Order
                                                                                                ORDER re: Petitioner shall confer with Respondent and contact the Court by 11/29/99 re: the initial conference call. ( signed by Special Master E. L. French ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/30/1999
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master E.L. French. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                                                                                    PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 8), by ANGELA VASQUEZ, as the legal representative of her deceased daughter, STEPHANIE VASQUEZ. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048504, Vac. Date: 6/16/98 (Respondent's report due 1/24/00). (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?