MORA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00684-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT P. MORA, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 3/31/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $32000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 12/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case 90-72
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with no costs assessed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION denying [6] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT P. MORA, and granting[11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint with no costs assessed. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Description not available
      REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to Motion re: [11] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 8/11/03.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
        REPLY to Dft's Opposition to Motion re: [6] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and RESPONSE to [11] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT P. MORA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (Styled as "Pltf's Suggestion That The Court Strike Out and Disregard the Government's Claim of Soveriegn Immunity") Reply due by 8/13/2003. Service: 7/27/03.(jcp, ) Modified on 8/5/2003 (jcp, ).
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER: Notwithstanding its format and the lack of a signed original, it is ORDERED that the submission, received on 7/31/03, shall now be filed, by leave of the Court, as comprising pltf's response to dft's motion to dismiss, filed 6/20/03, and pltf's reply to dft's opposition to pltf's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
            ORDER that [9] Defendant's Motion to Waive the Requirements of RCFC 56 to Respond to the "Material Facts" Included in Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
              ORDER that [12] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record is ALLOWED. Any requirements to file more than one copy of the Administrative Record is WAIVED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Terminated:
                MOTION for Leave to File the administrative record by USA.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003. (dw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003, Terminated: 12/23/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/21/2003. (dw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Statement of Facts
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 6/20/03.(dw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Terminated:
                      MOTION to waive the requirement of RCFC 56 to respond to the "Material Facts" included in plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by USA.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003. (dw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 6/20/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ROBERT P. MORA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/2/03.(dls, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT P. MORA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/2/03. Response due by 7/3/2003 (dls, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003, Terminated: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint (until 6/20/2003) by USA.Service: 5/30/03. (dw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Reid Prouty for USA. Service: 4/10/03.(lrd)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                    NOTICE of Related Case [90-72C] by ROBERT P. MORA. Service: 3/31/03.(dw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 056828), filed by ROBERT P. MORA. Answer Due by 5/30/2003.(dw1, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?