SACCO et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00685-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GERALDINE SACCO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
No Logo KAREN VESTERBY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Mark Alexander +1 202 307 0361 +1 202 514 7965 gerald.alexander@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/1/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $64000
Nature of Suit 300 - Civilian Pay - Back Pay
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 12/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5066'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [28] Published Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005, Terminated: 8/14/2006 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 05-5066 for [30] Notice of Appeal filed by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005, Terminated: 8/14/2006 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 062388. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. (dls )
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/12/2004 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Oral Argument. (teg, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/14/2004. (vp1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [18] CROSS MOTION to [10] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(4), Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA: Oral Argument set for 5/12/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [18] Pltf's CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment, and [10] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument is scheduled for 4/21/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Description not available
                      REPLY in Support of [18] Pltfs' CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [22] Pltf's Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of [18] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, until 11/28/2003. Reply due by 11/28/2003. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003, Terminated: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                          UNCONTESTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of [18] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, until 11/28/2003, by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY.Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                            RESPONSE to [17] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 10/24/03.(jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [18] CROSS MOTION to [10] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(4), Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA filed by USA. Reply due by 11/10/2003. Service: 10/24/03.(jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [15] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment,until 9/24/03, Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (vro, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Terminated:
                                  CROSS MOTION to [10] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(4), Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA by GERALDINE SACCO and KAREN VESTERBY.Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/27/2003. (dw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GERALDINE SACCO and KAREN VESTERBY. Service: 9/24/03.(dw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                      RESPONSE to [9] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GERALDINE SACCO and KAREN VESTERBY. Service: 9/24/03.(dw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Terminated:
                                        UNCONTESTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Cross Motion to [10] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment, until 9/24/03, by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY.Service: 9/22/03. Response due by 10/9/2003. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [13] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [10] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment, and CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment, until 9/19/03. Response due by 9/19/2003. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003, Terminated: 9/16/2003 Terminated:
                                            UNCONTESTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion and Opposition to [10] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment, until 9/19/03, by GERALDINE SACCO, KAREN VESTERBY.Service: 9/10/03. Response due by 9/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Judge John P. Wiese no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003, Terminated: 12/30/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(4), or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by USA.Service: 7/24/03. Response due by 9/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 27, 2003 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 7/25/2003. Plaintiff's Response/Cross Motions due by 9/12/2003. Defendant's Response/Reply due by 10/24/2003. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/21/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Preliminary Status Conference held on 5/27/03. (jwg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/26/2003. (vp1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Memorandum
                                                              MEMORANDUM by USA. Service: 5/12/03.(vro, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/27/2003 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese.Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Mark Alexander for USA. Service: 4/9/03. (lrd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lrd)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003
                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 056829), filed by GERALDINE SACCO and KAREN VESTERBY.Answer Due by 6/2/2003.(dw1, )
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?