JENSEN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00714-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHELE N. JENSEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Mager +1 202 616 2377 +1 202 305 7643 steven.mager@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/7/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed as moot. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss case as moot. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Description not available
      REPLY to Pltf's Response in Opposition to [32] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 7/2/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [30] MOTION to Enter Judgment filed by MICHELE N. JENSEN. Service: 6/16/04.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and OPPOSITION to Pltf's Motion to Enter Judgment, by USA.Service: 6/14/2004. Response due by 7/15/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Response to Motion
            OPPOSITION to [30] Pltf's MOTION to Enter Judgment and Dft's Motion to Dismiss, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/15/2004. Service: 6/14/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by MICHELE N. JENSEN. Service: 5/27/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION to Enter Judgment by MICHELE N. JENSEN.Service: 5/27/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Mager for USA Service: 04/22/2004.(lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [27] Joint Motion to Stay. This case is STAYED pending a completion of the administrative review of Pltf's disability complaint. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003, Terminated: 11/12/2003 Terminated:
                      JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings by MICHELE N. JENSEN, USA.Service: 11/4/03. Response due by 11/21/2003. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [23] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to [21] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to Remand and Suspend and OPPOSITION to [12] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Reply due by 11/3/2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [18] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [22] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's Opposition to [12] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and [21] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to Remand and Suspend. Response due by 10/27/2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003, Terminated: 10/29/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [21] Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Judgement on the Administrative Record, and [21] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to Remand and Suspend, until 11/3/2003, by USA.Service: 10/24/03. Response due by 11/10/2003. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003, Terminated: 10/24/2003 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Cross-Motion to Remand and Suspend,until 10/27/03, by USA.Service: 10/10/03. Response due by 10/27/2003 (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE to [18] MOTION for Leave to File (out of time) response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, motion to strike filed by MICHELE N. JENSEN. (Titled as Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration or, in the alternative, to strike) Reply due by 10/14/2003. Service: 9/29/03.(jat, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003, Terminated: 10/24/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File (out of time) response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, motion to strike by USA.Service: 9/26/03. Response due by 10/14/2003 (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Terminated:
                                      CROSS MOTION to remand and suspend re: [12] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA by MICHELE N. JENSEN.Service: 9/25/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (dw1, ) Modified on 10/9/2003 (dls, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE to [12] MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by MICHELE N. JENSEN. Reply due by 10/14/2003. Service: 9/25/03.(dw1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Administrative Record by MICHELE N. JENSEN.Service: 9/25/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (dw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings
                                            Reset Deadline as to response to [21] CROSS MOTION to remand and suspend. Response due by 10/14/2003 (dls, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Filing Original Audio Tape and Copies for the Administrative Record by USA re: [14] Order of August 29, 2003 and Original Audio Tape of the Formal Physical Evaluation Board Hearings as Part of the Administrative Record. [Located in large orange envelope] Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re: [14] Order of August 29, 2003, or, in the Alternative MOTION to Strike the First Unnumberd Page of the [15] Administrative Record by MICHELE N. JENSEN.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Administrative Record
                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by USA. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [11] Dft's Motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record and to Separately File Original Audio Tape and Its Copies When Received. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 8/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 8/25/03. Response due by 9/25/2003. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003, Terminated: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record and Motion for Leave to Separately File Original Audio Tape And Its Copies When Received by USA.Service: 8/25/03. Response due by 9/11/2003.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [9] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer to Pltf's Complaint. Answer Due by 8/25/2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003, Terminated: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer/Response re: [1] Complaint until 8/25/2003 by USA.Service: 7/3/03. Response due by 7/21/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (signed by the Clerk) Answer Due by 7/11/2003. (dls, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003, Terminated: 6/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/11/2003 filed by USA.Service: 6/5/03. (dls, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Garcia Farrier for USA. Service: 4/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Reassignment to Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Loren A. Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                                                                              COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 056875), filed by MICHELE N. JENSEN. Answer Due by 6/6/2003.(dw1, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?