HERNANDEZ-KING et al v. The Secretary of Health and Human Services
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-01156-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HENRY R. KING, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis McHugh +1 212 483 0875 +1 212 483 0876 jfmchughpc@aol.com
No Logo JESSE JEREMIAH KING, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis McHugh +1 212 483 0875 +1 212 483 0876 jfmchughpc@aol.com
No Logo JESSICA HERNANDEZ-KING, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis McHugh +1 212 483 0875 +1 212 483 0876 jfmchughpc@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Sara Renzi +1 202 616 4133 linda.renzi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/7/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 notice of filing
NOTICE OF FILING ONSET STATEMENT by JESSICA HERNANDEZ-KING, HENRY R. KING, JESSE JEREMIAH KING. Service: 5/7/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order
    ORDER: This case in now in stage one. Accordingly, to facilitate the handling of this petition, it is is ORDERED as follows: Petitioner shall file within 90 days, by no later than July 14, 2008, all medical records from the period of the vaccine's birth through either, whichever date is later,(1)the date of petition filing, or (2) the date of the vaccinee's initial diagnosis of autism, autism spectrum disorder, a speech or language delay related to an autism diagnosis, or any similar neurological disorder related to an autism diagnosis. In so doing, petitioner shall comply with theprovisions regarding the filing of medical records, set forth below at part D of this Order. To assist respondent and the Court,once petitioner has filed all of the medical records required by this Order, Petitioner shall file with the Court a signed "Statement of Compliance with Phase One Medical Records Production." Respondent shall file within 45 days, subsequent to petitioner's filing of a "Statement of Compliance," a Statement Regarding whether the Claim should proceed in OAP. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Special Master George L. Hastings no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (dlb, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 2/1/2004 Order Suspending Case 180 Days
        ORDER re: the 240-day period for issuance of the special master's decision in this case has expired. Upon petitioner's motion, proceedings in this case are hereby formally suspended pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 300aa-12(d)(3)(C) for up to 180 days, and, thus, the final due date for the special master's decision in this case is formally suspended - for an indefinite period of time, but for no longer then 180 days. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Respondent's Report
          Respondent's Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 8/8/2003. (mlp, )
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/29/2003 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sara Renzi for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 06/18/03.(jmm, )
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding
              Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding. Case Reassigned to Special Master George L. Hastings. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, ) Modified on 4/7/2006 (tjk, ).
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                Case Assigned to Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Petition
                  PETITION against The Secretary of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 057411) [Vaccination date: September 7, 2000], filed by JESSICA HERNANDEZ-KING, HENRY R. KING, JEREMIAH KING.Respondents Report Due by 8/5/2003.(jmm, )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 134 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?