BLOODSWORTH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01227-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Duane Austin +1 202 616 0321 +1 202 305 7644 michael.austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/19/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/17/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(i) this day. Service: 3/12/2005.(mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/10/2004.(lg1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/24/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
      Set Deadlines for partiesice to file joint motion dismissing this case with prejudice, Dispositive Motion(s) due by 1/7/2005. (lg1, )
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Dft shall file its Letter of Position as to Pltf's Settlement Proposal with the Clerk of Court by Friday, 12/12/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/5/04 before Judge Loren A. Smith. (jat, )
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties shall participate in a telephonic Status Conference Tuesday, 10/26/2004 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/20/2004. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [28] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                  ORDER Setting Telephonic Oral Argument on Motion [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 10/5/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 8/10/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION to cite supplemental authorities by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH.Service: 7/29/04. Response due by 8/16/2004 (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                      Minute Entry: On Friday, July 30, 2004 at 4:15 p.m. EDT, Judge Smith conducted a telephone scheduling conference to set a date for oral arguement on the pending dispositive motions. At the request of Plainitff's counsel, the oral arguement will be conducted telephonically. The Judge ORDERED the parties to participate in the telephonic Oral Arguement Tuesday, October 5, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. EST.(gmw)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to participate in a telephonic Status Conference Friday, 7/30/2004 04:00 PM before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Description not available
                          REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [14] Pltf's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Record, filed by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. Service: 5/10/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for judgment due by 5/25/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jat, ) Modified on 5/4/2004 (jat, ).
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004, Terminated: 4/29/2004 Terminated:
                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [23] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [14] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 5/25/2004, by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 4/16/2004. Response due by 5/3/2004. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Terminated:
                                REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss and OPPOSITION to [14] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Alternatively CROSS MOTION to [14] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/18/2004. Response due by 4/19/2004. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Statement of Facts
                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/18/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Statement of Facts
                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/18/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Administrative Record
                                      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [18] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Reply to Pltf's Opposition to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due no later than 3/18/2004. Response due no later than 3/18/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [14] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Reply to [14] Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, until 3/18/2004, by USA.Service: 3/12/2004. Response due by 3/29/2004. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [16] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [14] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Reply to Pltf's Opposition to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 3/12/2004. Response due by 3/12/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004, Terminated: 3/1/2004 Terminated:
                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Reply to [14] Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss, until 3/12/2004, by USA.Service: 2/6/2004. Response due by 2/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [12] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Pltf's filing, received by the Clerk's Office on 1/9/2004, is hereby considered timely. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Response to Motion
                                                  OPPOSITION to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes filed by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (Together with Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment) Reply due by 2/9/2004. Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, ) Modified on 2/10/2004 to correct due date for reply. (dls).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (Together with Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss)Service: 1/8/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, ) Modified on 2/10/2004 to correct response date. (dls).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004, Terminated: 1/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), until 1/10/2004, by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH.Service: 1/7/2004. Response due by 1/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [10] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6),until 12/23/03, however extends the deadline beyond the 60-day request, past the holiday season. Pltf's Response in Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss and Pltf's dispositive motion are now due no later than Friday, 1/8/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003, Terminated: 11/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [9] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), until 12/23/03, by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 10/22/03. Response due by 11/10/2003.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA.Service: 9/16/03. Response due by 10/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [7] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pltf's Complaint. Answer Due by 9/16/2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Senior Judge Loren Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003, Terminated: 8/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 9/15/2003 by USA.Service: 8/12/03. Response due by 8/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [5] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pltf's Complaint. Answer Due by 8/19/2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003, Terminated: 7/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer re: [1] Complaint until 8/18/2003 by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Duane Austin for UNITED STATES Service: 6/4/03.(jat, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                          NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [97-526 C] by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH. Copies to Defendant.Service: 5/20/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Loren A. Smith. (jat, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
                                                                              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 057502), filed by WILLIAM D. BLOODSWORTH.Answer Due by 7/18/2003.(jat, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?