SPIESS et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01347-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAROL SPIESS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Guariglia +1 973 622 4444
No Logo DALE SPIESS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Guariglia +1 973 622 4444
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin C. King, Jr. +1 202 307 6506 benjamin.c.king@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/4/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $532000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 11/9/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all plaintiffs.. (King, Benjamin)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (jat, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Court Filing
      ORDER LIFTING STAY. Joint Status Report due 10/21/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2005. (jat, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005
          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Court Filing
            ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. King for USA. Service: 11/17/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Francis M. Allegra for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Robert J. Yock no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                      ORDER allowing [5] Pltf's Motion for Suspension of Proceedings Until 30 Days After the Final Resolution, Including Appeals of Yocum v. United States, No. 03-84T. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Suspension of Proceedings Pending Final Resolution, Including Appeals, of Yocum v. US, Case No. 03-84T by CAROL SPIESS, DALE SPIESS.Service: 7/29/03. Response due by 8/15/2003.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Answer
                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 7/24/03. JPSR due by 9/15/2003.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl Beth Flum for USA. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Robert J. Yock. (dw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 057669), filed by CAROL SPIESS and DALE SPIESS.Answer Due by 8/4/2003.(dw1, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?