MOORE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01499-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID EARL MOORE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/13/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '04-5141'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [20] Published Order/Opinion that directed the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 04-5141 for [22] Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID EARL MOORE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004, Terminated: 4/4/2005 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL (nunc pro tunc, August 13, 2004) by DAVID EARL MOORE. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee waived, filed In Forma Pauperis (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION denying [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)and granting MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Description not available
            REPLY to Response to Motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to plaintiff's deemed response to defendant's motion to dismiss to 2/17/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004, Terminated: 2/13/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [15] Pltf's Response to the Court's Show Cause Order Issued 1/7/2004, until 2/16/2004, by USA.Service: 2/9/2004. Response due by 2/26/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf filed on 1/21/2004 his response to the show cause order. It is ORDERED that pltf's response filed on 1/21/2004 is DEEMED TO BE his response to dft's motion to dismiss. Further, dft shall file by Monday, 2/9/2004 a reply to pltf's deemed response. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Response to Order to Show Cause
                    RESPONSE/MOTION TO [14] SHOW CAUSE Why the Governments Motion Should Not Be Granted filed by DAVID EARL MOORE. Service: 1/17/2004.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On 11/3/2003, the government filed a "Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record." To date, pltf has yet to file either a response to the government's motion, or a request with the Court for an extension of time to file any such response. The Court hereby ORDERS pltf David Earl Moore to SHOW CAUSE why the government's motion should not be granted in light of pltf's failure to prosecute his claim. Pltf shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause NO LATER THAN MONDAY, 1/26/2004, to which the government may submit a reply only by seeking leave of the Court, or if invited to do so by the Court. Pltf's response shall be limited to ten pages. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Remark
                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE,(filed January 7, 2004), was sent by certified mail, with return receipt requested. (bre,)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 11/3/03. Response due by 12/4/2003. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [10] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer Due by 11/3/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Response to Motion
                              MOTION IN OPPOSITION to [10] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 11/3/2003 filed by DAVID EARL MOORE. Reply due by 11/13/2003. Service: 10/30/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003, Terminated: 11/6/2003 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 11/3/2003 by USA.Service: 10/23/03. Response due by 11/10/2003 (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 10/24/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2003 Terminated:
                                    SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint (until 10/24/2003) by USA.Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (dw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [6] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 9/24/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003, Terminated: 9/10/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 9/24/2003 by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 8/13/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for UNITED STATES. Service: 6/26/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003, Terminated: 7/2/2003 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID EARL MOORE. (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Case Assigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES (AF) , filed by DAVID EARL MOORE.Answer Due by 8/12/2003.(jat, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?