JEFFERSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01721-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM R. JEFFERSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/17/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 4/28/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION denying [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and granting MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Description not available
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 2/2/04.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Statement of Facts
        COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by WILLIAM R. JEFFERSON. Service: 1/15/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), and MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by WILLIAM R. JEFFERSON. Reply due by 2/2/2004. Service: 1/15/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
            ORDER RETURNING: Pltf's Response to DFt's Motion to Dismis, and Motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record and Pltf's Cross Motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record was received by the court on 12/16/2003 and has not been filed by the Clerk of the Court because it failed to comply with the court's rules. The court enlarges the time for ptlf to file its response to dft's motion and to file a cross-motion for Review of Decision on the Basis of Administrative Record pursuant to RCFC 56.1. Pltf's response, and cross-motion if any, shall be filed on or before 1/16/2004. The Clerk of the Court shall return pltf's response to pltf unfiled. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pltf shall show cause why the court should not grant dft's motion to dismiss pltf's complaint. Pltf may, by leave of the court, file its response to this order to show cause and to dft's motion on or before 12/17/2003. If such response is filed, dft shall reply on or before 1/5/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/17/2003. Reply due by 1/5/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Administrative Record
                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume by USA. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by USA. Service: 10/14/03.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Terminated:
                      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), and in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 10/14/03. Response due by 11/14/2003 (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Statement of Facts
                        STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 10/14/03.(jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 10/15/2003. (signed by the Clerk) (dls, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003, Terminated: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 10/15/2003 filed by USA.Service: 9/2/03. (dls, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Kent Mickle for U.S.A. Service: 7/31/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003
                                  COMPLAINT against USA (AF) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 058177), filed by WILLIAM R. JEFFERSON.Answer Due by 9/15/2003.(dw1, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?