CHAMBERS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01767-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES S. CHAMBERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Reed +1 302 477 2070 +1 302 477 2257 tjreed@mail.widener.edu
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/24/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $344000
Nature of Suit 344 - Military Pay - Correct Records
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/12/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '04-5134'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [25] Unpublished Order/Opinion.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 04-5134 for [27] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [26] Judgment by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. Copies to Judge Lawrence J. Block, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Court Filing
          UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION on [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, [14] CROSS MOTION to [10] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA filed by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION and REPLY Pltf's Opposition to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 2/19/2004. Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Response
              RESPONSE to [13] Pltf's Proposed Additional Facts filed by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [21] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record.Dft shall file by Wednesday, 2/4/2004, a response to pltf's cross motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004, Terminated: 1/30/2004 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 2/2/2004, by USA.Service: 1/26/2004. Response due by 2/12/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [19] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 1/26/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004, Terminated: 1/15/2004 Terminated:
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 1/26/2004, by USA.Service: 1/12/2004. Response due by 1/29/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Statement of Facts
                        STATEMENT OF FACTS by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. Service: 12/15/2003.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: Having received pltf's statement of facts (which is erroneously entitled "Dft's Statement of Facts,") it is ORDERED that pltf's statement of facts is deemed to be "Pltf's Statement of Facts" and shall be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying [11] Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls) Modified on 12/19/2003 (dls).
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 ~Notice (other)
                              BRIEF in Support of [14] Pltf's CROSS MOTION and OPPOSITION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Terminated:
                                CROSS MOTION to [10] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 12/2/03. Response due by 1/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Proposed Additional Facts
                                  PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS Pursuant to Rule 56.1(b)(2) by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Statement of Facts
                                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by JAMES S. CHAMBERS. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 12/12/2003 Terminated:
                                      MOTION to Amend Caption, by JAMES S. CHAMBERS.Service: 12/2/03. Response due by 12/19/2003.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume, by USA.Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Statement of Facts
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [7] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by Friday, 11/21/2003. No further extension of time will be granted for this purpose. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003, Terminated: 11/6/2003 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 11/21/2003 by USA.Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/7/2003 (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 10/22/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003, Terminated: 9/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 10/22/2003 by USA.Service: 9/22/03. Response due by 10/9/2003. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES L. CHAMBERS. (jat, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES (ARM) , filed by JAMES L. CHAMBERS.Answer Due by 9/22/2003.(jat, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Space Space

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?