SMALLS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-01862-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EUGENE C. SMALLS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 344 - Military Pay - Correct Records
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint without prejudice. No costs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Terminated:
      NON-HEARING MOTION and Order to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 41(a) Without Prejudice; Affirmation in Support of Motion; Exhibit "A"; and Certificate of Service by EUGENE C. SMALLS.Service: 8/21/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 8/14/03.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 058330), filed by EUGENE C. SMALLS.Answer Due by 10/3/2003.(dw1, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 87 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?