WALMSLEY v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-02226-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SUSAN WALMSLEY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis McHugh +1 212 483 0875 +1 212 483 0876 jfmchughpc@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/25/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 2/11/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order
    ORDER re: a status conference was held 1/13/04. On 1/8/04, the undersigned dismissed the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Without subject matter jurisdiction, the undersigned does not have the authority to award attorney's fees and costs. If, as expected, flu vaccine is added to the list of vaccines under the Vaccine Act, petitioner may refile her petition. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on January 13, 2004. (tlj, )
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order
        ORDER re: this petition is dismissed without prejudice. In the absence of a motion for review pursuant to RCFC Appendix B, the clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment in accordance herewith. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Description not available
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2004 10:30 AM Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (lg1, )
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Matanoski for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/09/03.(jmm, )
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
              Case Assigned to Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Petition
                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 058802) [Vaccination date: January 24, 2002], filed by SUSAN WALMSLEY.Respondents Report Due by 12/24/2003.(jmm, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 134 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?