AMERICA ONLINE, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02383-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo America Online, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Excite Inc.!
Unknown Role, Adforce, Inc.
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tivo, Inc.
Unknown Role, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Datamark Holding Inc
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
Unknown Role, Moviefone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Knot, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tw, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mapquest.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Empower Health Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Duane Webber +1 202 452 7000 a.duane.webber@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/17/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $201000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 4/20/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5138'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT for the plaintiff, principal of $$192,574.00 and interest of $66,357.42, totaling $258,931.42, filed by all defendants. Service: 11/17/2006.(bre )
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
    MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [29] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 05-5138 for [29] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [27] Judgment by USA. Copies to Judge Charles F. Lettow, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference scheduled for 4/20/2005 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $192,574.00, plus interest as provided by law until plaintiff receives payment from the United States. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against the United States in the amount of $192,574.00, plus interest as provided by law until plaintiff receives payment from the United States. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT and STIPULATION, filed by all parties. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/18/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                    PUBLISHED OPINION on [16] CROSS MOTION to [11] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. filed by USA, [11] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC., Status Report due by 4/18/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/20/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/12/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/27/2005. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [11] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, [16] CROSS MOTION to [11] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC.: Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2005 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] CROSS MOTION to [11] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. filed by USA. Service: 10/12/04.(dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                REPLY/RESPONSE to [16] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [11] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof, filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 10/12/2004. Service: 9/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                  RESPONSE to [15] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Response
                                    REPLY to [14] Dft's Response to Pltf's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2005 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                      CROSS MOTION to [11] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 8/24/2004. Response due by 9/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                          RESPONSE to [10] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE (Promotional Discount Agreement) by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. FILED UNDER SEAL (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [9] Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Three (3) Volumes [Three Large White Binders], by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. Service: 7/27/2004 by hand. Response due by 8/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. Service: 7/27/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jane P. Bradshaw Attached as Attachment A to Brief in Support of Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by AMERICA ONLINE, INC. Service: 7/27/2004 by hand. Response due by 8/10/2004. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                      DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: As requested by the parties, a period of two months is provided for Discovery, until 4/6/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 12/16/03. JPSR due by 2/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 10/29/03.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment Judge Charles Lettow. (dw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 24 (recommending that judges recuse themselves from entertaining cases involving their former law firm for at least two years). Judge Susan G. Braden recused. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan Braden. (dw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003
                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 058968), filed by AMERICA ONLINE, INC..Answer Due by 12/16/2003.(dw1, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?