GENERAL ATOMICS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02505-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo General Atomics, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Randy Damelin +1 202 305 2312 +1 202 307 2503 scott.damelin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/29/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER continuing stay through December 15, 2009. Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2009. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER regarding the availability of a Discovery Judge to whom any discovery motions involving common issues of fact or law with other spent nuclear fuel cases can be referred. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER continuing stay through 6/30/2009. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2009. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 12, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 12, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                E-MAIL PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING REVIEW OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY'S ELECTRONIC "RECORD INFORMATION SYSTEM" DATABASE. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                    RESPONSE to [31] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by GENERAL ATOMICS.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to the case. (jt1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GENERAL ATOMICS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments A, B and C)(Fagg, Arnold) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE OF DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE TO THE PARTIES re 31 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases filed by USA. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to file 37 Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases by leave of the court. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. (Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 9/25/2008 to indicate filing is by leave of the judge. (dls). (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Court Filing
                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: All proceedings in this case are stayed until December 15, 2008, before or at which time a joint status report shall be filed.Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER Continuing stay of case. Case shall be stayed until March 31, 2008, by which date a joint status report shall be filed by the parties. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER granting continuation of stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed until July 31, 2007. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2007. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2007. (bre,)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT and Stipulation for Extension of Temporary Stay, filed by GENERAL ATOMICS. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER STAYING CASE: Stay is continued until 9/26/06. Paries shall file joint status report on or before that date, apprising Court how parties wish to proceed with this case. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER STAYING CASE: Stay of proceedings shall continue until September 26, 2006. Parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 26, 2006, apprising Court of how parties wish to proceed with case. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                              ORDER: Document No. 23 was filed in error and is hereby stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Extension of Temporary Stay, filed by GENERAL ATOMICS, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting request for extension of stay requested in Joint Status Report; Case is stayed until March 31, 2006. Joint Status Report due on or before March 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2006. (jat, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by GENERAL ATOMICS, USA. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting the request for continuation of the stay. Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jat, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Extension of Temporary Stay by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting Joint Motion for Temporary Stay [16] until March 4, 2005. Either an agreed upon stipulation or a joint status report shall be filed with the Court no later than March 4, 2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Agreed upon stipulation or joint status report due by 3/4/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004, Terminated: 9/7/2004
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT and Joint Motion for Extension of Temporary Stay by all parties. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/3/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 4/30/2004 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [11] Order Pre-Discovery Conference for New SNF Cases filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Randy Damelin for USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [11] Order and Report filed by GENERAL ATOMICS. (Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re Pre-Discovery Conference New SNF Cases Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [9] Motion to Stay; Status Report due by 9/2/2004Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay All proceedings by GENERAL ATOMICS, USA. Response due by 3/12/2004 (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES the [7] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Court GRANTS dft's unopposed request that its response to bhe complaint be due 2/24/2004, 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp) Modified on 2/3/2004 - original entry was created without pdf attachment on 2/3/2004, per request of Judge Wolski, the entry was deleted and this entry takes its place (jcp, ). Modified on 2/4/2004 to add description to entry (jcp, ).
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 2/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003, Terminated: 2/3/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay all proceedings by USA. Response due by 1/15/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003
                                                                                                          NOTICE by GENERAL ATOMICS Corporate Disclosure Statement (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [99-447C, 98-621C, 98-154C, 02-1894, 02-926C, 98-485C, 98-483C, 00-440C, 98-486C, 98-474, 01-116, 98-484C, 01-115C, 01-551C, 00-703C, 98-488C, 98-614C, 01-249C, 02-898C, 00-697C and 98-126C] by GENERAL ATOMICS. Service: 10/29/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059028), filed by GENERAL ATOMICS.Answer Due by 12/29/2003. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dw1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?