SYSTEM FUELS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02621-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SYSTEM FUELS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [67] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER re [65] Joint Status Report filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2009. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
          LREF
          Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER STAYING CASE Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
              LREF
              Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER Granting Continuance of Stay Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [59] Motion for Extension of Time Supplemental briefing due by 6/29/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/07 to File Joint Status Report, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 6/18/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [54] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 5/31/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response until 12/22/2006 as to [54] MOTION to Stay , Out Of Time Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                          RESPONSE to [54] MOTION to Stay, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/5/2007. (Lester, Harold)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [54] MOTION to Stay , Out Of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Stay
                              MOTION to Stay, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 12/18/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [52] Motion for Extension of Time Supplemental Brief due by 11/30/2006 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2006 to File Supplemental Briefs, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 11/16/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [50] Joint Motion to Defer Supplemental Briefing Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006, Terminated: 5/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Supplemental Briefing Pending Federal Circuit Decision, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 5/25/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER requesting supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                          Set Deadlines: Supplemental Briefs due by 5/10/2006. Responses due by 5/31/2006.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [43] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Response In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint And Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 & 2)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [45] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File A Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005, Terminated: 1/19/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File A Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Reply by USA. Response due by 1/27/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Correspondence)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [43] Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record filed December 29, 2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 12/29/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Response In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint And Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter from Zabransky to Rives received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting in part [28] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting in part [28] Motion for E-mail Preservation Order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [39] Motion for Leave to File Reply brief exceeding page limitation. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004, Terminated: 11/2/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint and To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint , With Proposed Attached Copy Of Defendant's Reply by USA. Response due by 11/15/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/29/2004. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [32] Reply to Response to Dispositive Motion (until 10/29/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 10/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004, Terminated: 10/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [32] Response to [27] Cross Motion,until 10/29/04, by USA. Response due by 11/8/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/26/2004 to clarify text. (dls).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [35]Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Cross Motion (until 10/20/2004). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 9/22/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/20/2004. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004, Terminated: 9/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., (until 10/20/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/7/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 9/21/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 9/2/2004. (dw1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 9/20/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                RESPONSE to [26] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. . Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on for clarity 9/3/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [28] MOTION for Protective Order and E-mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004, Terminated: 9/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order and E-mail Preservation Order by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exh 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                            CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31) # (32) # (33) # (34) # (35) # (36) # (37) # (38) # (39))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II Of Plaintiff's Complaint by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                              RESPONSE to [13] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, [13] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004). Response due by 7/28/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/28/2004 for clarity(dw1).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Response due by 7/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                    Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, [13] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004) by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 7/26/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/26/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004
                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 7/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/26/04) by USA. Response due by 8/2/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report to 7/8/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/16/2004, Response due by 7/16/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 6/30/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2004 to file Status report by USA. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/16/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/28/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Parties' Motion for Extension of Time Until 6/28/04. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion(s)due by 5/28/2004. Defendant's Response due by 6/25/2004. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/14/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [5] Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 5/20/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams : Status Conference. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 5/18/2004 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [6] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties case Discovery Reports due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Order for parties to submit case discovery reports by April 23 and to appear before J. Sypolt for pre-discovery conference on April 30.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ra1)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 5/20/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059088), filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, ) Modified on 11/7/2003 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?