ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02622-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [93] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Court Filing
    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/15/2008 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
      RESPONSE to [93] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Robertson, Cynthia)
        LREF
        Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 6/1/2009-6/26/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
          Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 9/4/2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.) (lb)
            LREF
            Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION. Granting Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb) (lld).
              LREF
              Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
              PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                Minute Entry for oral argument held in Washington, DC on 8/22/2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(pn)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 93 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                  MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 92 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER directing Plaintiff Consolidated Edison Company of New York to provide a redacted version of Defendant's August 19, 2008 motion and attachments by 6:00 PM today so that it may be served immediately upon counsel for Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Court Filing
                      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER setting oral argument in Case No. 04-33C on Defendant's motion for joinder of Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2 on 8/22/2008 at 08:00 AM at the National Courts Building. Counsel for Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2 are invited to appear. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's June 2, 2008 sealed motion for joinder in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/06/08 to response to plaintiff's damages schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 7/28/2008.(Averbach, Andrew)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [86] Motion to adjust discovery deadlines and extend the damages period. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008
                                Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 9/2/2008 (8/31/08 falls on a Sunday and 9/1/08 is a federal holiday); defendant's expert reports due by 10/6/08; Discovery to be completed by 2/16/2009. (dls)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 6/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Damages Period, filed by USA. Response due by 7/14/2008.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/29/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                      *** Attorney Joshua Edward Gardner terminated. (dls)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                        NOTICE, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC Of Service Of Expert Reports And Initial Compliance With Pretrial Order On Damages (Chu, Jack)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs Expert Report due by 2/8/2008. Defendants Expert Report due by 7/8/2008. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                            ORDER granting [83] Unopposed Motion for Enlargment of Time. Plaintiff shall submit its expert reports and its initial response to Defendant detailing damages on or before February 8, 2008. Defendant shall submit its expert reports on or before July 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 83 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/08/2008 to Submit Expert Reports, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 82 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [81] Joint Motion requesting that the Court limit the parties' obligation to produce expert reports. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007, Terminated: 12/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Joint MOTION Order Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Order on Damages due from ENIP on or before February 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006
                                                      Proposed Pretrial Order On Damages, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 26, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Proposed Pretrial Order on Damages due March 7, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/27/2006. (vp1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC, USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties Joint Proposed Schedule due by 1/19/2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 1/26/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler regarding the proposed schedule. (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. (dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2005 (dw1, ).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER to transfer case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rs1,)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying [65] defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate this case with Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., v. United States, No. 04-0033C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [65] Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0033 with this case, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005
                                                                            RESPONSE to [65] Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0033 with this case, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Reply due by 11/4/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (ConEd Complaint))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [68] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to [65] Defendant's Second Motion to Consolidate this Case with Case No. 04-33C. Plaintiff's Response now due by 10/21/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/21/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005, Terminated: 10/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/21/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [65] Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0033 with this case filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 10/24/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [66] Motion for Leave to File a corrected copy of defendant's Renewed Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy Of Defendant's Renewed Motion To Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. Response due by 10/13/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Motion# (2) Exhibit 1)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                        Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0033 with this case filed by USA. Response due by 10/11/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005
                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [62] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 05/23/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005
                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/23/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005, Terminated: 5/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/23/2005 to To File Joint Status Report filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 6/3/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 05/17/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005, Terminated: 5/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/17/2005 to To File The Parties' Joint Status Report, As Required By The Court's March 9, 2005 Order filed by USA. Response due by 5/26/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment and denying government's cross-motion for partial summary judgment. Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/24/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/9/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [53] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [53] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by USA. Reply due by 1/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Cover page, table of contents & table of authorities# (2) Appendix Attachments 1-4)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 1/28/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter from Zabransky to Rives received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2005, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [49] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page, Table of Contents & Table of Authorities# (2) Appendix Appendix Cover Page# (3) Appendix Appendix 1# (4) Appendix App. vol. 2# (5) Appendix App. 3# (6) Appendix App. 4# (7) Appendix Appendix Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004, Terminated: 11/24/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [39] Reply to Response to Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Liability by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [26] Motion to Reassign Case and to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Order granting in part [28] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part [28] Motion for E-Mail Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on liability. Defendant must file its reply on or before 11/18/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 11/18/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 10/4/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [39] Response to Motion (until 10/29/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/18/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/1/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Appendix to Pltf's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Response in Opposition to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC Pursuant to [42] Order on Motion for Leave to File Appendix (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I - Pages 1-52# (2) Appendix Part II - Pages 53-95# (3) Appendix Part III - Pages 96-147# (4) Appendix Part IV - Pages 148-167)(Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 9/23/2004 to add clarifying text and to add docket entry relationship to reply (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004, Terminated: 9/22/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 10/7/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 - Pages 1-52# (2) Appendix Part II - Pages 53-95# (3) Appendix Part III - 96-147# (4) Appendix Part IV - 148-167)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [23] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability and Response in Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response and reply due by 9/20/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004, Terminated: 9/15/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [21] Response to Motion,,, [23] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 9/30/2004. (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 9/14/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [26] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw) Modified on 9/10/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 9/8/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 9/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [30] Response to Motion, (until 9/8/04), and Reply to Consolidated Edison's and Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2's Response To Defendant's Motion To Reassign And Consolidate by USA. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold) Modified on 9/9/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [28] MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [31] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 9/13/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004, Terminated: 8/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [21] Response to Motion by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 9/13/2004. (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 8/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [26] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Reply due by 9/7/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Mar. 18, 2004 Excerpt of Status Conference Transcript from Entergy Nuclear Generation Co. v. United States)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [26] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. Reply due by 9/7/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004, Terminated: 10/28/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Joint Status Report from Detroit Edison Co. v. United States)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [24] Motion to Amend/Correct. Government's corrected response brief is filed at [25]; appendiced to the brief remain at [21]. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 11/4/2004 Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of directly related cases, MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, And Motion To Consolidate by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Cover Page, Table of Contents and Table of Authorities# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 1 (continued)# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 4)(Gardner, Joshua) Docket text Modified on 8/6/2004 to add Notice of directly related cases. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                    [CORRECTED] RESPONSE to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by USA. Reply due by 8/17/2004. (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 8/9/2004 (dw1). [APPENDICES TO THE BRIEF, SEE DOCKET ENTRY #21]
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct [21] Response to Motion, For Summary Judgment On Liability, And Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by USA. Response due by 8/20/2004 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [15] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by USA. Reply due by 8/16/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8) Appendix # (9) Appendix # (10) Appendix # (11) Appendix # (12) Appendix # (13) Appendix # (14) Appendix # (15) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 7/30/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1). Modified on 8/9/2004 (dw1). [CORRECTED RESPONSE FILED, SEE DOCKET ENTRY #25]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 8/16/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability. Response due by 7/29/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/29/04) by USA. Response due by 8/5/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [16] defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [14] plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability. Defendant's Response to [14] plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 7/19/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 6/30/2004 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/19/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/28/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Chief Judge Damich Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [8] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 4/20/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004, Terminated: 4/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/07/2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC, USA. Response due by 5/3/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for pre-discovery conference in new SNF cases. Pre-discovery conference scheduled for April 30, 2004. Reports to be submitted as set forth in Order on or before April 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 4/15/2004.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [5] Motion to Stay. Answer to be filed on or before February 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 1/30/2004 to remove "Response to" that was before "Answer" in the text (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 2/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 1/30/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Proceeedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059087), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 2, LLC.Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?