SYSTEM FUELS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02624-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo SYSTEM FUELS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Ann Snyder +1 202 616 0347 +1 202 514 7969 sharon.snyder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status PstTrlBrf
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (222) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
CAFC Case Number 2010-5116 for 192 Notice of Appeal, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC. (hw1, ) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. Copy to opposing party, CAFC and the presiding Judge. (hw1, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2010: # 1 Supplement) (hw1, ). (Entered: 05/10/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC., SYSTEM FUELS, INC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 070918. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2010: # 1 Supplement) (hw1, ). (Entered: 05/10/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (bre, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 163 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
          RESPONSE to [159] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $9,735,634.00. (lld) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-19) held on August 19, 2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2008. (dw1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 189 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION ON RECONSIDERATION AND FINAL ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $9,735,634. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gl) (lld). (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                  Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on August 19, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                    POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael D. Withrow)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 160 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER STAYING CASE until November 3, 2008. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Entry of Judgment in Sum Certain and Motion for Additional Offset to Plaintiffs' Damages Claim, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                          MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER re post-hearing supplemental briefs. Briefs due by 9/16/2009. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
                              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington DC (telephonic) on 8/19/2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jw)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-255) held on July 20, 2009 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 158 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                    Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on July 20, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [156] Motion for Leave to File Status ReportStatus Report due by 7/11/2008 Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION of Fact, filed by all parties. (Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 156 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Status Report Out Of Time, On July 7, 2008, filed by USA.Response due by 7/21/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 179 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Testimony Of Defendant's Witnesses Christine Gelles And David Zabransky, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (May 18, 2009 ENIP order), # 2 Exhibit B (10 CFR 961.11), # 3 Exhibit C (Zabransky deposition excerpt), # 4 Exhibit D (APSC trial transcript excerpt))(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 155 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                              STATUS REPORT Regarding Further Proceedings, filed by all plaintiffs. (Chu, Jack)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/20/2009 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 10, 2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2008. (dw1)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE to 179 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Testimony Of Defendant's Witnesses Christine Gelles And David Zabransky, filed by USA.Reply due by 7/16/2009. (Damelin, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 153 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on June 10, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Testimony Of Defendant's Witnesses Christine Gelles And David Zabransky, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC..Response due by 7/6/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (April 15, 2009 DOJ letter), # 2 Exhibit B (Gelles deposition excerpt), # 3 Exhibit C (Zabransky trial excerpt))(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for 6/10/08 proceeding: Transcript due from Heritage by 6/23/2008. (lld)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-21) held on May 11, 2009 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                                                              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington DC on 6/10/2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jw)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on May 11, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 152 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
                                                                  REPLY to Response to [149] Supplemental Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Claim For Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-36) held on April 7, 2009 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 151 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [150] Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Reply due by 5/16/08. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 7, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 150 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Claim for Pre-Judgment Interest in Response to the Court's March 2008 Scheduling Order, filed by USA.Response due by 5/27/2008.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) And Entry Of Judgment In Sum Certain , filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Chu, Jack) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 149 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF In Support Of Plaintiffs' Claim For Recovery Of The Cost Of Borrowed Funds, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 171 MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) And Entry Of Judgment In Sum Certain , filed by USA. Reply due by 4/3/2009 (per court order). (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 3/29/2009 to edit reply due date. (dls). (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 148 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Claim For Pre-Judgment Interest In Response To The Court's Order, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER re Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Reconsideration. Government's Response due by 3/27/09. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 4/3/09. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Opening brief regarding cost of borrowed funds due 4/11/08; Response due 4/25/08. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) And Entry Of Judgment In Sum Certain And Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Metcalfe third supplemental direct testimony), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Supko supplemental report))(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC. Of Supplemental Expert Testimony (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Metcalfe second supplemental testimony)# (2) Exhibit B (Appendix Tabs 1 to 7)# (3) Exhibit C (Appendix Tabs 8 to 10)# (4) Exhibit D (Appendix Tabs 11 to 13)# (5) Exhibit Tab E (Appendix Tab 14)# (6) Exhibit F (Appendix Tabs 15 to 20))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-10) held on January 23, 2009 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-98) held on January 23, 2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on January 23, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 144 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC. re [143] Order Requesting Supplemental Expert Testimony (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Metcalfe supplemental testimony)# (2) Exhibit B (Appendix Tabs 1 to 6)# (3) Exhibit C (Appendix Tabs 7 to 9)# (4) Exhibit D (Appendix Tab 10))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER EXTENDING STAY until 12/15/08. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 143 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Requesting Supplemental Expert Testimony Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-12) held on November 4, 2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 142 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION determining damage award, in part. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 4, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 141 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Regarding Final Evidentiary Exhibits Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF CASE. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dd) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 140 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-22) held on October 17, 2006 before Judge Sudan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [130] MOTION to Strike [127] Notice (Other) Of Supplemental Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF Reply, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 137 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [130] MOTION to Strike [127] Notice (Other) Of Supplemental Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC..Reply due by 6/4/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1 (Pollog excerpt))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [135] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [134] Post Trial Brief. Reply due by 5/22/2007. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 135 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [134] Post Trial Brief, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. Response due by 5/31/2007.(Chu, Jack) Modified on 5/16/2007 to edit response due date. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 134 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF Corrected Copy, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 133 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [132] Motion to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Post-Trial Brief. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    MOTION For Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 131 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                                                                                                                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [127] Notice (Other) Of Supplemental Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine, filed by USA.Response due by 5/18/2007.(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [128] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Post Trial Brief due 5/1/2007. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 128 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007, Terminated: 4/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2007 to To File Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs of Supplemental Trial Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1))(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 126 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., SOUTH MISSISSIPPI ELECTRIC POWER ASSOCIATION, SYSTEM ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 1/31/2007 to remove JPSR due date. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief due 3/23/2007. Defendant's Post Trial Brief due 4/27/2007. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/18/2007. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1 )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1726-2720) held on January 16-18, 2007 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 122 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for the admission into evidence of counter-designations of deposition and trial testimony , filed by USA. Service: 1/16/07 by hand.Response due by 1/30/2007.(dls )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT And Supplemental Complaint against. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [119] Motion for the Admission of Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION For The Admission of Deposition Testimony As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2), filed by USA.Response due by 1/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7))(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [115] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [116] Motion for Leave to File Motion for the Admission of Deposition Testimony As Substantive Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2) Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007, Terminated: 1/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for the Admission of Deposition Testimony Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 1/29/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 1/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 114 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [110] Motion to Consolidate Cases and Conduct Joint Trial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 113 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [111] Motion to Designate Prior Trial Testimony of Mr. Robert L. Morgan. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 112 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [109] MOTION to Apply the Proper Burden of Proof filed by USA, Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to designate Prior Trial Testimony of Mr. Robert L. Morgan, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 1/9/2007 to clarify text. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Case 03-2623C with this case To Conduct Joint Trial Proceedings For The Testimony of Three Government Witnesses, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 1/9/2007 to edit text.(dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 109 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Apply the Proper Burden of Proof, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon) DEEMED TO BE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF PER ORDER OF JANUARY 5, 2007; No response to this filing is necessary. Modified on 1/9/2007 (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 108 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 107 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF On Causation, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. of Supplemental Testimony of Frank B. Rives on Agency and Rates Issues (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 500 (SFI Articles of Incorporation)# (2) Exhibit 501 (SFI Nuclear Fuel Purchase Agreement)# (3) Exhibit 502 (SERI Rate Schedule FERC No. 2)# (4) Exhibit 503 (MSE 7/22/86 Board Minutes)# (5) Exhibit 504 (Grand Gulf Construction Agreement Part 1)# (6) Exhibit 504 (Grand Gulf Construction Agreement Part 2)# (7) Exhibit 504 (Grand Gulf Construction Agreement Part 3)# (8) Exhibit 504 (Grand Gulf Construction Agreement Part 4)# (9) Exhibit 505 (Grand Gulf Operating Agreement)# (10) Exhibit 506 (1990 Grand Gulf Operating Agreement)# (11) Exhibit 507 (MSE Service Agreement)# (12) Exhibit 508 (ESI/EOI Service Agreement))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [94] MOTION to Strike [78] Notice (Other) Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, And Defendant's Motion, In The Alternative, In Limine To Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) And Federal, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [101] MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude the Re-Opening of the Deposition of Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Reply due by 10/30/2006. (Chu, Jack) Modified on 10/18/2006 to correct reply due date. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting defendant's [102] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to plaintiff's [99] Response. Reply due by 10/18/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, ) Modified on 10/17/2006 to edit text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/23/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 102 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/18/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [94] MOTION to Strike [78] Notice (Other) Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, And Defendant's Motion, In The Alternative, In Limine To Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) And Federal, [99] Response to Motion,,, filed by USA.Response due by 10/27/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude the Re-Opening of the Deposition of Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by USA.Response due by 10/20/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Although designated as an electronic case, any filing in excess of 100 pages (inclusive of appendices/exhibits) will be filed in traditional, hard-copy form, and not in electronic form. The parties will make such filings in accordance with the requirements set forth in the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [94] MOTION to Strike [78] Notice (Other) Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, And Defendant's Motion, In The Alternative, In Limine To Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) And Federal, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Reply due by 10/10/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Defendant's Responses to Interrogatories 36, 43, 45, 50)# (2) Exhibit B (9-21-04 Yankee Order)# (3) Exhibit C (Defendant's Response to Interrogatory 7)# (4) Exhibit D (Defendant's Response to Interrogatories 77, 78, 79, 80, 81))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1725) held on September 18-22, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. The September 22, 2006 transcript (pages 1441-1725) is FILED UNDER SEAL. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/12/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-51) held on September 12, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to [81] Exhibit List, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2006 to properly link document. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [82] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 94 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [78] Notice (Other) Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, And Defendant's Motion, In The Alternative, In Limine To Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) And Federal Rule Of Evidence 801(d)(2), filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct [89] MOTION in Limine In Opposition to Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [84] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until September 11, 2006 to file its objections to Defendant's Exhibit List, granting [87] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to September 8, 2006, granting [88] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, ) Modified on 9/8/2006 to add due dates for filings. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony From Defendant's Expert Witnesses Asserting That Certain Elements Of Plaintiff's Damages Claim Are Not "Incremental" To The Government's Breach, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 9/25/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Defendant's Motion in Opposition to Testimony by Plaintiff's Witness, Charles B. Franklin, filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents and Table of Authorities# (2) Appendix Part 1# (3) Appendix Part 2# (4) Appendix Part 3# (5))(Finn, Stephen) Modified on 9/8/2006 to correct description of attachment. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine In Opposition to Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents and Table of Authorities# (2) Appendix Part 1# (3) Appendix Part 2# (4) Appendix Part 3# (5) Appendix Part 4# (6) Certificate of Service)(Finn, Stephen) Modified on 9/8/2006 to correct description of attachment. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Direct Expert Testimony, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Metcalfe Direct Testimony)# (2) Exhibit B (Appendices to Metcalfe Testimony)# (3) Exhibit C (Supko direct testimony))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/8/2006 to To File Any Motions Relating To, Or To Respond To, Plaintiff's August 18, 2006 Notice Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Trial Documents Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by USA.Response due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [64] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/11/2006 to File Objections To Defendant's Exhibit List, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC..Response due by 9/25/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [79] Defendant's Sept. 1, 2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [77] Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/11/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006, Terminated: 9/6/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until September 5, 2006 to File Response or Reply as to [77] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA.Response due by 9/18/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [72] Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Defendant will present its case-in-chief Jan. 16, 2007 thru Jan. 22, 2007. Discovery due by 8/31/2006. The remaining dates in the February 27, 2006 order are not affected. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, ) Modified on 8/18/2006 to add text re: remaining dates in 2/27/06 order. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [71] Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., USA.Response due by 8/14/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION For An Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 8/7/2006.(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [69] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 6/2/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until June 2, 2006 to To Produce Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [66] MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [64] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [66] MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [64] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Reply due by 5/8/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [64] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, filed by USA. Response due by 4/24/2006.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 4/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (First Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [63] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Deadlines: submission of defendant's expert reports - 5/26/06; submission of plaintiff's rebuttal expert reports - 6/16/06; close of fact and expert discovery - 7/28/06; exchange of witness and exhibit Lists - 8/11/2006; plaintiff's contentions of law - 8/18/06; defendant's contentions of law - 9/1/06; objections to witness and exhibit lists and all remaining pretrial motions - 9/6/06; plaintiff's reply to defendant's contentions of law - 9/8/2006; and pretrial conference set for 9/12/2006 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying in part [61] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; and directing parties to submit a proposed schedule by February 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, ) Modified on 1/30/2006 to edit text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 1/30/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [48] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA. Response due by 1/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [58] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Government's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines: Responses toInterrogatories and Request for Production of Documents due by 1/20/2006. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** NOTICE of Filing Expert Reports, filed by SYSTEMS FUELS, INC. Service: 12/20/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 12/28/2005 to correct filer (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 1/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/20/2006 to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 1/5/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [55] Motion for Leave to physically file expert reports UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [55] MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal, filed by USA. Reply due by 11/30/2005. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal, filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 11/28/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Ann Snyder for USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *** Attorney Heide Lynn Herrmann terminated. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [52] Unopposed Motion to Amend the Court's Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's submission of its expert reports to the Government now due on or before 11/18/2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (js1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule for filing expert reports (to November 18, 2005) filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Chu, Jack) Modified on 10/31/2005 to edit text to include what is being amended. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Erratum on page one of published decision. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter partial summary judgment for plaintiff on the issue of liability. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial set for 9/11/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's expert reports due by 11/4/2005; Defendant's expert reports due by 3/17/2006; any expert rebuttal report(s) due by 4/7/06; Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/7/2006; Defendant's responsive Memorandum and responses to any motions filed by plaintiff due by 8/4/2006; Plaintiff's responses to any motions filed by Defendant 8/18/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [46] Notice (Other) filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. re [44] Scheduling Order, (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Charles B. ("Ben") Franklin)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/15/05 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/15/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/15/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff will submit an affidavit summarizing storage costs incurred to date on March 4, 2005. The Government will file a response to the affidavit on March 21, 2005. A status conference will be conducted, by telephone, on March 17, 2005, at 2:00 p.m., e.s.t. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' affidavit due by 3/4/2005; Defendant's response to the affidavit due by 3/21/2005; telephonic status conference set for 3/17/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [35] CROSS MOTION to [24] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix)(Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply to Response to Cross Motion due by 2/10/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time. The Government's reply to plaintiff's response to the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment on liability is due February 10, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005, Terminated: 2/7/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION to Amend Schedule re: Set Deadlines/Hearings by USA. Response due by 2/24/2005 (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: Set Deadlines/Hearings by USA. Response due by 2/22/2005 (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [32] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [24] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability And Response To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Zabransky letter to Rives received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. Plaintiff's reply to the Government's response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability and response to the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment on liability is due 1/5/05. The Government's reply to plaintiff's response to the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment on liability is due February 3, 2005. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: USA Reply to Response to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/3/2005. Plaintiff's Reply to Response to USA's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability due by 1/5/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 12/23/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [30] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 1/6/2005 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION to [24] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., by USA. Response due by 1/20/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8) Appendix # (9) Appendix # (10) Appendix # (11) Appendix # (12) Appendix # (13) Appendix # (14) Appendix # (15) Appendix # (16) Appendix # (17) Appendix # (18) Appendix # (19) Appendix # (20) Appendix # (21) Appendix)(Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. Defendant is ordered to re-file its motion for summary judgment on liability and accompanying exhibits as a cross-motion for summary judgment on liability.(cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004, Terminated: 12/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [24] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by USA. Response due by 12/21/2004. Reply due by 1/18/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix # (8) Appendix # (9) Appendix # (10) Appendix # (11) Appendix # (12) Appendix # (13) Appendix # (14) Appendix # (15) Appendix # (16) Appendix # (17) Appendix # (18) Appendix # (19) Appendix # (20) Appendix # (21) Appendix)(Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 12/7/2004 to add in response deadline for cross motion (12/21/2004) and to correct reply deadline (1/18/2005) (jcp, ). Modified on 12/17/2004 (dw1). [Stricken pursuant to the order dated December 16, 2004]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [25] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/21/2004. Reply due by 1/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response and any cross-motion to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability due 12/6/04. Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability, and response to any cross-motion, is due 12/21/04. Defendant's reply to any-cross motion for summary judgment on liability is due 1/18/04. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 12/6/2004. Response due by 12/21/2004. Reply due by 1/18/2005. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004, Terminated: 12/2/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [23] Scheduling Order of 10/21/2004 [Dft's response (and any cross motions) to pltf's motion for summary judgment on liability: 12/6/2004; Pltf's reply in support and its response to any cross motion for summary judgment: 12/21/2004; and Dft's reply to any cross motion for summary judgment: 1/18/2005] by USA. Response due by 12/17/2004 (Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 12/1/2004 to add requested dates (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER:Plaintiff's October 29, 2004 memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability is hereby filed by leave. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 11/15/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 (pp. 1-49)# (2) Appendix Part 2 (pp. 50-99)# (3) Appendix Part 3 (pp. 100-149))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 11/29/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Consistent with the parties' agreement submitted in the October 13, 2004 joint status report, the Court enters the following scheduling order:1. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability for its partial breach of contract claim is due October 29, 2004.2. Defendant's response (and any cross-motion) to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability is due November 30, 2004.3. Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability and its response to any cross-motion for summary judgment on liability is due December 15, 2004.4. Defendant's reply to any cross-motion for summary judgment on liability is due January 11, 2005.5. The Court will entertain oral argument on the liability issue on February 15, 2005, in Washington, D.C.6. In the event of a favorable ruling for plaintiff on the liability issue, damages discovery will commence in March 2005 at a date to be determined by the Court. In the event the Court has not yet reached a decision on liability by March 2005, discovery shall commence upon submission of a damages claim by plaintiff, within 15 days of the Court's ruling upon liability.7. Trial will begin 12 months after the commencement of damages discovery, on a date convenient to the Court's schedule.Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 10/29/04; defendant's cross-motion due by 11/30/2004; plaintiff's response to cross-motion due by12/15/2004; defendant's reply due by 1/11/2005. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER concerning the treatment of confidential material. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (Attachments: # (1) Confidentiality Declaration)(cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER adopting the salient provisions of the email plan utilized in the coordinated discovery proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Heide Lynn Herrmann for USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [17] MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004, Terminated: 10/5/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. Response due by 9/3/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Joint Status Report in Detroit Edison Co. v. United States)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 6/24/2004 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 6/3/2004 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 6/24/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 6/3/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Chief Judge Damich Order)# (2) Exhibit B (Entergy Nuclear Fitzpatrick Report))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: JPSR due by 5/7/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: Status Conference held on 4/30/2004. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 5/4/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/07/04 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by SYSTEM FUELS, INC., USA. Response due by 5/20/2004 (Tomaszczuk, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [10] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by SYSTEM FUELS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (Attachments: # (1)).(cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion for Leave to File Answer. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by USA. Response due by 4/1/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: [5] Dft's Motion to Stay, is, in the interest of justice, DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 2/23/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference in this matter on 2/23/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Susan G. Braden. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059085), filed by SYSTEM FUELS, INC. Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?