ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02625-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 3:13 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Arthur Edward Pazicky +1 202 305 1709 +1 202 514 8624 luke.a.pazicky@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Peter Bruskin +1 202 307 5958 +1 202 514 8264 eric.bruskin@usdoj.gov
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Space Sharon Ann Snyder +1 202 616 0347 +1 202 514 7969 sharon.snyder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (237) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
    RESPONSE to 221 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Expert Testimony Of Jesse L. Funches , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 5/14/2015. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      NOTICE Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (rk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/01/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 223 Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/30/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION For Authorization Of Service Of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From Place Of Trial And Request For Expedited Consideration , filed by USA.Response due by 5/18/2015.(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2015 03:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Site Visit set for 7/15/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/24/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
              MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Expert Testimony Of Jesse L. Funches, filed by USA.Response due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                STIPULATION JOINT, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                  Exhibit List JOINT, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                    Objection to Exhibit List, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: 211 Exhibit List filed by USA.(Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                      Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: 200 Exhibit List filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 215 Motion to Admit Prior Trial Testimony of David Zabransky Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION to Admit Prior Trial Testimony of David Zabransky, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 4/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Prior Trial Testimony of David Zabransky, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's Response to Interrogatory No. 25)(Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 213 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 200 Exhibit List , filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 4/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Amended Exhibit List)(Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                Witness List, filed by USA. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                  Exhibit List , filed by USA. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 208 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 198 Witness List , filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 4/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Amended Witness List)(Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference to be held on 3/10/2015 at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (rk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: 203 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 1/5/2015.(Tomaszczuk, Alexander) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 202 Motion to Suspend Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION To Suspend Implementation Of The Courts Current Pretrial Scheduling Order , filed by USA.Response due by 12/12/2014.(Wimbush, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Exhibit List - Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tomaszczuk, Alexander) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tomaszczuk, Alexander) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Witness List, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tomaszczuk, Alexander) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Joint Certification of Counsel (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER denying 192 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (aj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA. (Rose, Shari) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 8/18/2014. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA.Response due by 8/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability , filed by USA.Reply due by 7/21/2014. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re 185 Motion to Strike 185 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Or, In The Alternative, To Amend The Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 185 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Or, In The Alternative, To Amend The Scheduling Order , filed by USA. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 185 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Or, In The Alternative, To Amend The Scheduling Order , filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Reply due by 3/3/2014. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Or, In The Alternative, To Amend The Scheduling Order, filed by USA.Response due by 2/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 179 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (td) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay In Light Of Lapse Of Appropriations , filed by USA.Response due by 10/21/2013.(Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Peter Bruskin for USA . (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      EXPERT REPORT of Jesse L. Funches filed by All Plaintiffs, COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cavaliero, Clare) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Defendant's ANSWER to 175 Amended Complaint, and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 8/19/2013.(Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Amendment to 1 Complaint,, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Answer due by 7/8/2013. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..(ac7) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Claim for Cost of Capital (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Notice of Compliance due by 6/21/2013, Expert Report due by 7/30/2013, Status Report due by 10/11/2013, Discovery due by 12/2/2013, Status Report due by 12/6/2013. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiff's second amended and supplemental complaint. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ml) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER, Status Conference set for 6/12/2013 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ml) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA re 170 Notice (Other) Notice Of Mandate Issued By The Court Of Appeals For The Federal Circuit (Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA re 150 Order Staying Case, Defendant's Notice Of Ruling (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 166 Motion Comply with Court's Order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ml) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 165 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ml) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 166 MOTION For Order Directing Defendant To Respond To Plaintiffs' NRC Fees Discovery Requests, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/17/2012. (Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION For Order Directing Defendant To Respond To Plaintiffs' NRC Fees Discovery Requests, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 8/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supporting Exhibits to Motion)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re 161 Order on Motion to Compel, Unpublished Opinion, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 163 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ml) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion For Reconsideration Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 6/11/2012.(Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Arthur Edward Pazicky for USA. (Pazicky, Luke) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting 127 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 151 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 151 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by USA.Reply due by 2/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Response)(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA re 150 Order Staying Case, Notifying The Court of the Ruling By The United States Court of Appeals For The Federal Circuit Granting The Government's Interlocutory Appeal (Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 7, 2011 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Total No. of Pages: 1-77. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2012. (dw1) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on December 7, 2011 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 151 Plaintiff's motion to temporarily lift stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 24, 2011 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Total No. of Pages: 1-40. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2012. (dw1) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on October 24, 2011 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 151 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/20/2012. (Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2011.12.21 EGS Motion to Compel, # 2 Appendix Appendix to EGS Motion to Compel)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER STAYING CASE pending a decision by the Federal Circuit on whether it will consider the interlocutory appeal in Entergy Nuclear Fitzpatrick, LLC v. United States, No. 03-2625C. Defendant is ordered to notify this Court in the event the Federal Circuit acts on the request for interlocutory appeal in Entergy Nuclear Fitzpatrick. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION to Strike the Government's Legally Insufficient Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 146 MOTION to Strike the Government's Legally Insufficient Affirmative Defense, filed by USA.Reply due by 11/28/2011. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA of Petition for Interlocutory Appeal in Entergy Nuclear Fitzpatrick, LLC, v. United States (Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike the Government's Legally Insufficient Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 11/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER for Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and corresponding oral argument. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Supplemental ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 12/5/2011.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 134 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2621 with this case for Litigation of the Unavoidable Delays Affirmative Defense, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER For Defendant to File Third Answer. Notice of Compliance due by 10/14/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 140 Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until October 24, 2011 to To Produce Expert Reports Re Unavoidable Delays, filed by USA.Response due by 10/20/2011.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 134 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2621 with this case for Litigation of the Unavoidable Delays Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Reply due by 10/11/2011. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 125 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' claim for interest, filed by USA. (Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Requests, filed by USA. (Luongo, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Scheduling Oral Argument on October 24, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 130 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2621 with this case for Litigation of the Unavoidable Delays Affirmative Defense, filed by USA.Response due by 9/29/2011.(Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 126 PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 125 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' claim for interest, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Reply due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit 1 - Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Appendix Exhibit 2 - Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Wesser, Evan) Modified on 9/19/2011 (ac7). Edit reply due date. (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 127 MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Requests, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2011. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Attached Joint Status Report Out of Time Due to Inaccessbility of Electronic Filing System, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time Status Report due by 9/9/2011 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk2) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2011 to Submit Joint Status Report Per This Court's August 2 Scheduling Order, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 9/23/2011.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Responses To Discovery Requests, filed by USA.Response due by 9/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix To Motion To Compel)(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: 125 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' claim for interest, filed by USA. (Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' claim for interest, filed by USA.Response due by 9/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 122 Motion to Amend Schedule. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 8/18/2011.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-2011.07.22 Order in No. 04-09C (Fed. Cl.))(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 119 Motion to Strike Defendant's Renewed Unavoidable Delays Defense, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Defendant's Renewed "Unavoidable Delays" Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 6/27/2011.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA. (Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended & Supplemental Complaint. Defendant shall respond by 5/23/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 115 Motion to Amend Schedule Defendant's expert reports due 8/3/2011. Discovery closes 9/16/2011. Exchange of witness and exhibit lists by 10/3/2011. Plaintiff's memorandum of contentions of fact and law and final witness and exhibit lists due 10/18/2011. Defendant's memorandum of contentions of fact and law and final witness and exhibit lists due 11/17/2011. /b> Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 5/26/2011.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint & Supplemental Complaint, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 5/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint & Supplemental Complaint)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 112 Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION For An Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 5/9/2011.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 104 Supplemental Brief, In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Strike Reply due by 4/6/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/06/2011 to File Reply Brief to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Strike, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 4/18/2011.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 104 Supplemental Brief,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Southern Nuclear Decision)(Connor, James) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 105 , 106 Defendant's unopposed motion for enlargement of time. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' supplemental brief by 3/18/2011. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by 4/1/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2011 to File Response as to 104 Supplemental Brief,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/31/2011.(Connor, James) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2011 to File Response as to 104 Supplemental Brief,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/28/2011.(Connor, James) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-Northern States Power-Appellant's Brief, # 2 Appendix 2-Northern States Power-Appellee's Response Brief, # 3 Appendix 3-Northern States Power-Appellant's Reply Brief, # 4 Appendix 4-Northern States Power-Amicus Brief)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-115) held on January 25, 2011 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2011. (dw1) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on January 25, 2011 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall file its supplemental brief by 2/18/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to the United States' Supplemental Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Entergy Gulf States Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Entergy Gulf States Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Entergy Gulf States Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Strike)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 92 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense (Renewed), filed by USA.Reply due by 12/20/2010. (Connor, James) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-33) held on November 8, 2010 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2011. (dw1) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on November 8, 2010 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file its supplemental brief by 12/8/2010. Plaintiff shall file its response by 1/7/2011. The Court will conduct oral argument on Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant's affirmative defense at 10:00 AM EST on 1/25/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense (Renewed), filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2:00 PM on 11/8/2010. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tlw) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion To Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense (Renewed), filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 10/21/2010.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (cc2) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., USA. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER continuing stay until July 15, 2010. Status Report due by 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (cc2) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Briefing On Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense, filed by USA.Response due by 3/29/2010.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Lift Stay Temporarily to Permit Filing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense)(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 3/29/2010.(Snyder, Sharon) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Supplemental), filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT & SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT (FIRST) against.Answer due by 2/1/2010. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TEMPORARILY LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (cc2) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/13/2010 to File Joint Status Report, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 1/25/2010.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CONTINUING STAY Status Report due by 1/6/2010 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [69] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Chu, Jack) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated ORDER Governing Review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" Database. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re [67] Joint Status Report filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2009. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 69 Defendant's Motion to Coordiante Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan; and directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 7/6/09. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Modified on 12/17/2008 to edit docket text. (dls). (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-87) held on November 12, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER STAYING CASE Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 12, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [56] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 1/7/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [61] Motion for Extension of Time Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/07 to File Joint Status Report, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 6/18/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 5/31/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [57] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response until 12/22/2006 as to [56] MOTION to Stay , Out Of Time Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [56] MOTION to Stay, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/5/2007. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [56] MOTION to Stay , Out Of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 12/18/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [54] Motion for Extension of Time Supplemental Brief due by 11/30/2006 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2006 to File Supplemental Briefs, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 11/16/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [52] Joint Motion to Defer Supplemental Briefing Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006, Terminated: 5/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Supplemental Briefing Pending Federal Circuit Decision, filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Response due by 5/25/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER requesting supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Supplemental Briefs due by 5/10/2006. Responses due by 5/31/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 2/14/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Reply Brief# (2) Exhibit 1 & 2)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [44] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Response In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint And Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 & 2)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [46] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005, Terminated: 1/19/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File A Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Reply by USA. Response due by 1/27/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Correspondence)(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [44] Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record December 29, 2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 12/29/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Response In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint And Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter from Zabransky to Rives received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part [29] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [29] Motion for E-mail Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [40] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004, Terminated: 11/2/2004 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint And To Dismiss Count III Of Plaintiff's Complaint by 14 pages , And Attached Copy Of Defendant's Reply by USA. Response due by 11/15/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/29/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [38]Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [33] Reply to Response to Dispositive Motion (until 10/29/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 10/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004, Terminated: 10/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [33] Response to [27] Cross-motion,until 10/29/04, by USA. Response due by 11/8/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/26/2004 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [36]Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Cross Motion (until 10/20/2004) Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 9/22/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/20/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004, Terminated: 9/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response [27] Cross Motion, (until 10/20/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/7/2004 (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 9/21/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 9/2/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 9/20/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [28] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [30] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. . Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 9/3/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [29] MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004, Terminated: 9/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [27] CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exh 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION to [12] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC. by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31) # (32) # (33) # (34) # (35) # (36) # (37) # (38) # (39) # (40) # (41) # (42))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [13] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, [13] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004). Response due by 7/28/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Response due by 7/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, [13] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004) by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 7/26/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Ann Snyder for USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/26/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 7/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/26/04) by USA. Response due by 8/2/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report to 7/8/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/16/2004, Response due by 7/16/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 6/30/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2004 to file Status Report by USA. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/16/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/28/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Parties' Motion for Extension of Time Until 6/28/04. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion(s)due by 5/28/2004. Defendant's Response due by 6/25/2004. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/14/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [5]Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 5/20/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams : Status Conference. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/18/2004 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [6] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties case Discovery Reports due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Order for parties to submit case discovery reports by April 23 and to appear before J. Sypolt for pre-discovery conference on April 30.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ra1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 5/20/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059084), filed by ENTERGY GULF STATES, INC..Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?