ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02626-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Entergy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Layton Jager Smith, Jr. +1 601 368 5572 +1 601 368 5816 jsmith83@entergy.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan J. Lo Re +1 202 307 0226 alan.lo.re@usdoj.gov
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Movant
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status PstTrlBrf
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version Of Response Brief, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 9/26/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Corrected version of response brief))(Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE to [145] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
      LREF
      Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 144 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER DENYING [143] Motion for Entry of Judgment under RCFC 54(b). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 143 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
          MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), filed by USA. Response due by 7/14/2008.(Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/29/2008 to correct response due date. (dls).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Reset Deadline: Response to [143] Motion for entry of judgment due by 7/14/2008. (dls)
              LREF
              Legal Document 142 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
              Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on April 25, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 141 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 25, 2008 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2008. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER. The court requests that the parties file a joint status report on or before 10/27/08, and every six months thereafter. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2008 (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Lo Re for USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER:The court will hold a status conference on April 25, 2008, at 2:00 p.m. EDT, at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting plaintiff's [136] motion to seal a previously filed document [135], a notice of proposed redactions. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 2/25/2008 Motion to Seal
                            MOTION to Seal Notice of Proposed Redactions, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 3/10/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                              NOTICE, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY of Proposed Redactions (Herzfeld, Daniel) Placed UNDER SEAL by Clerk's Office on 2/20/2008 (Reyes, Lisa).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 134 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                RESPONSE to Defendant's Response To Court Order, Dated February 15, 2008, Regarding Proposed Redactions, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007
                                  **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [131] Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 131 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                        **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [128] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [124] of June 22, 2007. The court adopts the following revised schedule for post-trial briefing and argument: government's post-trial responsive brief is due 10/10/2007; Entergy's post-trial responsive brief is due 10/23/2007; Boston Edison's post-trial reply is due 11/6/2007; and closing argument will be held on 11/8/2007 at 10 a.m. at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 128 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [124] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 10/18/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 127 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting motion of Boston Edison in Case No. 99-447C for leave to file post-trial brief under seal electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to intervene received 7/24/2007 from William Peterson. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 125 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [123] Application for Access to Protected Material filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER in Case No. 99-447C: Boston Edisons Post Trial Brief due 8/23/2007; the government's Post Trial Response Brief due 10/4/2007; Entergys post-trial responsive brief due 10/17/2007; Boston Edisons Post Trial Reply due 10/31/2007; and Closing Argument set for 11/2/2007, at 10 a.m. at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007, Terminated: 8/1/2007
                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [109] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [117] Motion for Leave to File amended exhibit list; granting [118] Motion for leave to designate prior trial testimony; granting [119] Motion for Leave to File revised exhibit list. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                            STIPULATION, filed by all parties. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/3/2007, Entered: 6/3/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Unopposed MOTION Motion To Submit Revised Exhibit List, filed by USA.Response due by 6/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/3/2007, Entered: 6/3/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Unopposed MOTION Motion For Leave To Designate Prior Trial Testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 6/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA re [109] MOTION to Strike [104] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, [104] Notice (Other) Notice Of Filing Of Defendant's Specific Objections To The Deposition And Prior Trial Testimony That Plaintiffs Seek To Designate And Defendant's Listing Of Counter-Designations (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                                      RESPONSE to [109] MOTION to Strike [104] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 6/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 36, 43, 45, 50)# (2) Exhibit B (Yankee opinion)# (3) Exhibit C (NSP Transcript Excerpt)# (4) Exhibit D (Response to Interrogatory #7)# (5) Exhibit E (Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories Nos. 77, 78, 79, 80, 81))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying [93] Motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of Boston Edisons expert witness, Mr. Robert B. Hevert. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying, in Case No. 99-447C, the government's motion in limine seeking to exclude, in part, the testimony of plaintiff Boston Edison Companys expert witness, Mr. John J. Reed. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying motion in limine, in Case No. 99-447C, to exclude testimony by the governments witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting Boston Edison Company's motion, in Case No. 99-447C, seeking leave to serve a trial subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER in Case No. 99-447C for trial scheduled for June 4-20, 2007, at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                MOTION to Strike [104] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting governments motion, in Case No. 99-447C, for an enlargement of time to file response to Boston Edison Companys motion in limine to exclude the governments testimony regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract. Response due by 5/25/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting governments motion, in Case No. 99-447C, for an enlargement of time to respond to Boston Edisons motion in limine to exclude the governments testimony regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract. Response due by 5/24/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying [92] Motion in Limine; denying [95] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying, in Case No. 99-447C, [283] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF DEPOSITION & TRIAL TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting Boston Edisons motion, in Case No. 99-447C, for leave to file under seal electronically responses to certain of the governments motions in limine. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting motion of Boston Edison, in Case No. 99-447, for leave to file under seal electronically a motion for leave to serve a trial subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington and request for expedited consideration. If the motion for leave to serve a trial subpoena is filed on or before May 22, 2007, the responses of Entergy Nuclear Generation Company and the government to Boston Edisons motion shall be filed on or before May 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting motion of Boston Edison in Case No. 99-447 for Leave to File response to the government's response to Entergy's motion for partial summary judgment. Response due by 5/23/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion of Boston Edison in Case No. 99-447 for leave to file a pre-trial memorandum under seal electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                    Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney L. Jager Smith in place of Alex D. Tomaszczuk, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Appointment of J. Smith# (2) Exhibit 2 - Consent to Substitution of Lead Counsel)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                      ***Attorney Layton Jager Smith, Jr for ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY added. Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [94] Motion to Take Deposition of Mr. Thomas LaGuardia, subject to conditions set forth; granting [96] Motion for Leave to File Response to Governments Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2007 at 02:00 PM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A Response To The Government's Memorandum Of Contentions Of Fact And Law, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 5/24/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, William J. Manion, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition After The Close Of Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Robert B. Hevert, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [90] Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 5/4/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document To Be Filed By The Government, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                            Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                              Exhibit List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                Witness List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing clerk to return submission of applicant for intervention. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [81] Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [81] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/23/2007. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007, Terminated: 4/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 4/23/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [79] Motion for enlargement of discovery to allow for deposition of Mr. David Zabransky. Discovery shall close April 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Take Deposition After The Close Of Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery in No. 99-447C, consolidated for a limited purpose with No. 03-2626, shall close by 3/28/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [76] Motion for Extension of Time. Close of discovery by March 23, 2007. Boston Edison contentions of fact and law and Boston Edison draft exhibit and witness lists due March 30, 2007. Entergy contentions of fact and law and Entergy draft exhibit and witness lists due April 16, 2007. Government draft exhibit and witness lists due April 20, 2007. Government contentions of fact and law and all parties final exhibit and witness lists due April 30, 2007. Meeting of counsel by May 4, 2007. Submission of pre-trial motions by May 4, 2007. Opposition to pre-trial motions due May 23, 2007. Pre-trial conference on May 29, 2007, commencing at 10:00 a.m. in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC. Trial from June 4, 2007 to June 20, 2007, commencing at 9:30 a.m. in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [72] Scheduling Order, filed by USA.Response due by 3/12/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [74] Motion for Extension of Time Government's expert reports due 10/30/2006; Entergy Nuclear's expert reports due 11/9/2006; Rebuttal expert reports due 11/30/2006; Expert depositions from 11/30/2006 to 1/12/2007 Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/2/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [72] Scheduling Order filed by USA.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER for the pre-trial steps in the Boston Edison portion of Boston Edison Co. v. US, No. 99-447C, and Entergy Nuclear Generation Co. v. US, No. 03-2626C, as consolidated for a limited purpose. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/8/2006 at 3:45 PM at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl. NW Washington, DC, before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/20/2005 02:00 PM at National Courts Building in Washington, DC before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Status conference to discuss matters addressed in Joint Status Report filed on Dec. 5, 2005 regarding a plan and schedule for the Boston Edison portion of the Boston Edison (No. 99-447C) and Entergy Nuclear Generation (No. 03-2626C) cases as consolidated for a limited purpose.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [68] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report. The parties shall now file a Joint Status Report on or Before December 2, 2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2005 to Submit Joint Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 12/12/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/26/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER - Joint Status Report reporting a plan and schedule for the Boston Edison portion of the Boston Edison (No. 99-447C) and Entergy Nuclear Generation (No. 03-2626C) cases as consolidated for a limited purpose. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [65] Motion for Enlargement of Time for Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Power Generation to respond to defendant's "First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Admissions" and "First Request for Production of Documents." Extension of fourteen days to September 26, 2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 9/14/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2005 to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 9/29/2005. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion to consolidate this case with Boston Edison Company v. United States, No. 99-447C. Consolidation ordered for a limited purpose. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on [50] MOTION to Consolidate Case 99-447 with this case: Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2005, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [50] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 99-447 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply due by 05/16/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 5/16/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 5/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [56] Response to Motion to Consolidate, (until 5/16/2005) filed by USA. Response due by 5/31/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY re [58] Order on Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Boston Edison's amended complaint)# (2) Exhibit B (Government's 2003 consolidation motion))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [55] Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Using Electronic Files Exceeding 2 Megabytes. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [50] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 99-447 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Reply due by 5/12/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 5/2/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Using Electronic Files Exceeding 2 Megabytes filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 5/16/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Boston Edison's Amended Complaint)# (2) Exhibit B (Government's 2003 consolidation motion))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [52] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 04/29/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [50] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 99-447 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 5/12/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/16/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 4/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2005 to Filing of Joint Status Report filed by USA. Response due by 5/12/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [49] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 04/25/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases 99-447 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. Response due by 4/28/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 25, 2005 to File Joint Status Report filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 4/28/2005 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment and denying defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [42] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/7/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [42] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 & 2)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/24/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [42] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability filed by USA. Reply due by 1/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 1/28/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplement of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Opposition To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter from Zabransky to Rives received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: A Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary judgment will be held on 1/7/2005 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 1/7/2005 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] CROSS MOTION to [17] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part [27] Motion for E-Mail Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part [27] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment regarding liability. Defendant must file reply on or before 11/04/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 11/4/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 10/4/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [31] Response to Dispositive Motion (until 10/29/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/18/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/1/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Appendix to Pltf's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Laibility and Response in Opposition to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Liaibility, by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY Pursuant to [34] Order on Motion for Leave to File Appendix (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I - Pages 1-52# (2) Appendix Part II - Pages 53-95# (3) Appendix Part III - Pages 96-147# (4) Appendix Part IV - Pages 148-153)(Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 9/23/2004 to add clarifying text and to create docket entry relationship to reply (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004, Terminated: 9/15/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Files Exceeding 1 Megabyte by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 9/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I - Pages 1-52# (2) Appendix Part II - Pages 53-95# (3) Appendix Part III - Pages 96-147# (4) Appendix Part IV - Pages 148-153)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [26] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, [25] CROSS MOTION to [17] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [27] MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 9/13/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004, Terminated: 8/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [25] CROSS MOTION to [17] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY, [26] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 9/13/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 8/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004, Terminated: 10/28/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order and E-Mail Preservation Order by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Joint Status Report in Detroit Edison Co. v. United States)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION to [17] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [18] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Striking [22] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Additionally, [21] unopposed motion for enlargement of time is granted. Defendant shall file its respone re [17] motion for summary judgment on or before July 29, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [17] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability. Response due by 7/29/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. [STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 7/21/2004] (lcd, ) Modified on 7/22/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [17] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, (until 7/29/04) by USA. Response due by 8/5/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [19] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [17] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability, until 7/19/2004.Defendant's Response to [17] plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 7/19/2004 Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 6/30/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [17] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability,until 7/19/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment on Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Chief Judge Damich Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [11] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 4/20/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004, Terminated: 4/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/07/2004 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY, USA. Response due by 5/3/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for pre-discovery conference in new SNF cases. Pre-discovery conference scheduled for April 30, 2004. Reports to be submitted as set forth in Order on or before April 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 18, 2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript) (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Status Conference held on 3/18/2004. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/23/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 4/15/2004.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's 2/3/04 order by all parties. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER - The parties are instructed to file a joint status report on or before 2/20/2004; a status conference in this case will be held on 3/18/2004; a status conference in Boston Edison v. United States, No. 99-447-C, will be held on 3/8/2004. The Clerk's Office shall serve a copy of this order on counsel in Boston Edison v. United States, No. 99-447-C. Status Report due by 2/20/2004 Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/18/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [5] Motion to Stay. Response to Complaint to be filed on or before February 23, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 2/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 1/30/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Assigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059083), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 228 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?