ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02627-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Slater +1 202 616 0467 scott.slater@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
Decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. The attached opinion announcing the judgment of the court in your case was filed and judgment was entered on the date indicated above. The mandate will be issued in due course, approximately by 5/28/2013. (hw1) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Shari A. Rose for USA. (Rose, Shari) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 143 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 117 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, certifying decision for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/03/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to 141 Supplemental Brief on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Order Striking Defendant's Unavoidable Delays Defense, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 140 Scheduling Order, Concerning Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion to Strike Unavoidable Delays, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief by Utilities)(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER. Supplemental briefing requested from Defendant on 117 Defendant's motion for reconsideration of order striking unavoidable delays defense: Defendant's brief due on or before September 13, 2011; Plaintiffs' response due on or before September 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/29/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Additional Authority (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Additional Authority Regarding Pending Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rochester Gas Opinion)(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PUBLISHED OPINION granting Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on Defendant's proposed cask loading offset. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    **SEALED**ORDER granting 114 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 18, 2011 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Total No. of Pages: 1-21. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (dw1) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                        Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on May 18, 2011 in Oswego, New York. (dw1) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 17, 2011 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Total No. of Pages: 1-29. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (dw1) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                            Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on May 17, 2011 in Buchanan, New York. (dw1) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 107 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re acceptance rate. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 109 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re interest. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Order on Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to 117 MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Order on Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 5/3/2011. (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 4/27/2011 - corrected reply deadline (jt1). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                          **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claim For Interest Against The Government, filed by USA.(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until April 14, 2011 to To Consider Recent Federal Circuit Precedent in Energy Northwest v. United States, filed by USA.Response due by 4/25/2011.(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file response, on or before April 26, 2011, to 117 Defendant's motion to reconsider (re unavoidable delays defense); Defendant's reply due on or before May 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                  **SEALED**RESPONSE to 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset, filed by USA.Response due by 4/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to 110 PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                      **SEALED**RESPONSE to 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claim For Interest Against The Government, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 4/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Responses To Defendant's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On "Plaintiffs' Claim For Interest Against The Government", filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 4/11/2011.(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Order on Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Keller, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                              **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Proposed Cask Loading Offset, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 4/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Cask Loading Offset, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 3/21/2011.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/14/2011. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claim For Interest Against The Government, filed by USA. (Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claim For Interest Against The Government, filed by USA.Response due by 3/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Motion)(Ashman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Beeler, Nicole) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate and Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 2/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Beeler, Nicole) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: the parties shall file certain motions according to the following schedule: Plaintiff's motion re acceptance rate and GTCC on January 28, 2011; Defendant's motion (if filed) re assignment of Standard Contract on January 28, 2011; Defendant's motion re cost of debt on February 25, 2011; and Plaintiff's motion (if filed) re cask-loading off-set on March 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: telephonic Status Conference set for January 7, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until November 15, 2010, to Complete Discovery, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 10/12/2010.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until 09/24/2010, to Complete Discovery, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 9/7/2010.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 89 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense re "unavoidable delays." Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until September 10, 2010, to Complete Discovery, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 8/2/2010.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Chu, Jack) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 89 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/7/2010. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Regarding Governmental Review of Nebraska Public Power District, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until July 29, 2010, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 5/10/2010.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until 7/2/2010, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 3/8/2010.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 90 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 2/22/2010. (Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defense, filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2010.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 2/1/2010.(Wesser, Evan) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 12/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint & Supplemental Complaint)(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 77 Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court grants judgment for Defendant on Count III (takings). Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dv) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Upon Count III), filed by USA. (Keller, Joseph) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 77 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Upon Count III), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 7/23/2009. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 6, 2009 to File Response as to 77 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Upon Count III), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 7/9/2009.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 22, 2009 to File Response as to 77 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Upon Count III), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 6/25/2009.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as Moot Motion for Joinder or Full Consolidation, filed by USA.Response due by 6/29/2009.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 76 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Order Governing Review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" Database. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dv) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 76 Joint Motion for Email Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dv) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 76 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dv) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Upon Count III), filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2009.(Keller, Joseph) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Orders, filed by USA, ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 5/26/2009.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 74 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dv) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by USA, ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 5/18/2009.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for April 9, 2009, at 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-28) held on March 26, 2009 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on March 26, 2009 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for March 26, 2009 at 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses (Answer to Counterclaim due by 3/17/2009.), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs, filed by USA.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Attached Answer Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 3/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer)(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery shall close on May 3, 2010. Status Conference set for May 10, 2010 at 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-31) held on November 18, 2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 18, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION for Joinder or, Alternatively, Full Consolidation, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER regarding the availability of a discovery judge. Upon the request of a party or parties, or a sua sponte determination, discovery issues may be referred to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for resolution. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1987 ACR excerpt), # 2 Exhibit B (Mission Plan Amendment excerpt))(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Joinder, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 1/26/2009. (Chu, Jack) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Joinder, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2009.(Milberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/9/09 to File Response or Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 1/8/2009.(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [32] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/26/2008. (Slater, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/30/2008 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/09/08 to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability, filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2008.(Slater, Scott) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [36] Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-87) held on November 12, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Lift Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 9/22/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on November 12, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Chu, Jack) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 3, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability And Memorandum In Support Thereof, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 12/8/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rives damages declaration), # 2 Exhibit B (Supko expert report))(Chu, Jack) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/03/2008 to file Joint Status Report, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 9/15/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [33] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report on or before August 27, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER regarding 46 Joint Status Report. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/27/2008 to file Joint Status Report, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 9/11/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT - Joint Discovery Schedule, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/24/2008 to File Discovery Schedule, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 10/31/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2008. (jt1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DISCOVERY CONFERENCE . Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lb) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [31] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 25, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-28) held on September 30, 2008 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (dw1) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/25/2008 to To File An Amended Joint Status Report Concerning Further Proceedings In This Case, filed by USA.Response due by 8/25/2008.(Moses, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Filing Of Official Transcript for proceedings held on September 30, 2008 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2008. (jt1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to the Parties regarding 32 Defendant's Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [30] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 11, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER regarding the status conference on September 30, 2008. The parties shall file an agreed upon discovery schedule by October 14, 2008. Plaintiff shall file its motion for partial summary judgement regarding liability by November 6, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008, Terminated: 8/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 11, 2008 to File Joint Status Reports, filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2008.(Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [29] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 4, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/4/2008 to File Joint Status Report, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 7/24/2008.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [26] Motion to Continue Stay Until 7/7/2008. As per previous minute entry, joint status report is due on or by 7/7/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Slater for USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER:Status Report due by 7/7/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 1/18/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [24] Joint Motion to Continue Stay: the stay in this case is continued indefinitely; the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 7, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007, Terminated: 7/16/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA.Response due by 7/16/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/30/2007. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21] Joint Motion to Continue Stay: Joint Status Report due on or before June 30, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE: this case is stayed indefinitely. On or before 01/02/2007, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report addressing with specificity how they propose the case should proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT And Motion To Continue Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE: the parties' joint status report of 9/26/05 included a motion for an extension of the stay in this case (although the motion should have been separately entered). The court hereby grants a stay until 6/30/06. On or before that date, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing with specificity how the case should proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER STAYING CASE: this case is stayed through 30 days after the date the Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan; the parties shall file a joint status report on 12/15/2005 or within 15 days after the decision in Indiana Michigan, whichever is earlier. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [13] Joint Motion to Stay until the earlier of July 1, 2005, or decision of the Federal Circuit in Indiana Michigan, CFC #98-486C. Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2005 or within 30 days of Indiana Michigan decision. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. Response due by 2/14/2005 (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: pre-Discovery Hearing held on 4/30/04. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered on [5] Defendant's Motion to Stay: staying discovery on rate of acceptance or damages issues, with exceptions, through December 31, 2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's Request At The April 30, 2004 Conference Before Judge Sypolt by all parties. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to NOTICE OF PREDISCOVERY CONFERENCE TO BE CONVENED ON APRIL 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3))(Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the parties to submit discovery report by 4/23/04 and noting pre-discovery conference scheduled for 4/30/04 before Judge Sypolt. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Standard Special Procedures ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alan Miller for USA. (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Assigned to Judge Edward J. Damich. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059082), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR FITZPATRICK, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR INDIAN POINT 3, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC. Answer Due by 1/4/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?