MCKENNA et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-02525-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, Petitioner
No Logo DENISE M MCKENNA, Petitioner
No Logo STEVEN MCKENNA, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawls & McNelis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Levon Terzian +1 804 782 0613 dterzian@rawlsmcnelis.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/31/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 6/8/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [19] Judgment. Service: 6/10/05.(tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00. Further, petitioners are awarded costs in the amount of $411.78. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Notice Not to Seek Review
      NOTICE Not to Seek Review by CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, DENISE M MCKENNA, STEVEN MCKENNA re [18] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 6/06/05.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 DECISION of Special Master
        DECISION Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 notice of filing
          NOTICE OF FILING: Petitioner's Out of Pocket Expenditures by CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, DENISE M MCKENNA, STEVEN MCKENNA. Service: 4/21/05.(tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Order
            ORDER: The caption is hereby amended. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on April 13, 2005. Denise and Steven McKenna appeared pro se and Mr. David Terzian represented respondent. (kb1, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 notice of filing
                Petitioner's proof of Administrator of Estate by CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, DENISE MCKENNA. Service: 3/28/05.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of Change of Address by CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, DENISE MCKENNA. Service: 3/23/05.(jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Scheduling Order
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondents Report Due by 4/8/2005. Status Conference reset for 4/13/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Respondent's Report
                      Respondent's Report filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 3/14/05. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Description not available
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/13/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on March 7, 2005. Ms. Denise McKenna appeared pro se and Mr. David Terzian represented respondent. (kb1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Description not available
                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/7/2005 03:45 PM (EST) before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                              NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 1/28/05.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Order
                                ORDER: Petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact my law clerk by 1/26/05, to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings. Special Master E. LaVon French no longer assigned to case Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Description not available
                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/5/2004 01:00 PM before Special Master E. LaVon French. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Order
                                        ORDER The initial status conference in this case shall be held on or before January 20, 2004. Therefore, Petitioner shall confer with Respondent then contact the court by, January 9, 2004, to schedule the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master E. LaVon French. (jmm, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Levon Terzian for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/02/03.(jmm, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                            Case Assigned to Special Master E. LaVon French. (jmm, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Petition
                                              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059056) , filed by CAMRYN J. MCKENNA, DENISE MCKENNA.Respondents Report Due by 1/29/2004.(jmm, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?