SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02655-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/27/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 58 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 57 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
      RETURNED RECEIPT from Denise D. Canty,received this day. (bre,)
        LREF
        Blank 56 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [55] Pltf's Motion for Additional Time in Which to Retain New Counsel. On or before 7/14/2004, pltf shall retain new counsel and have that counsel file a notice of appearance in this matter. Should pltf fail to retain new counsel and have that counsel file a notice of appearance in this matter by 7/14/2004, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 55 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 6/9/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION for Additional Time to Obtain Counsel, by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Service: 6/6/2004. Response due by 6/23/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 54 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Remark
            ORDER(filed June 9, 2004), was sent by certified mail to Denise D. Canty, this day. (bre,)
              LREF
              Blank 53 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Reginald M. Sealey by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 52 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [48] Mr. Sealey's Motion to Withdraw His Appearance as Counsel of Record. Because pltf is a corporation and, pursuant to RCFC 83.1(c)(8), must be represented by an attorney, pltf has until 6/14/2004, to retain new counsel and have that counsel file a notice of appearance in this matter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                  *** Attorney Reginald Morris Sealey terminated. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: If Mr. Sealey's affidavit is not received on or before 5/3/2004, the court will issue an order directing Mr. Sealy to show cause why he should not be held in contempt. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 50 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER:. Mr. Sealey shall file an affidavit re: motion to withdraw by 4/16/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 49 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/8/04.(jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 48 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004, Terminated: 5/6/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel, Reginald M. Sealey, by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Service: 3/29/2004. Response due by 4/15/2004. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 47 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER: On 3/31/2004, the court received a letter from pltf. The Clerk is directed to file the attached letter. [Letter to Judge Allegra from Plaintiff attached.] Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 46 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Decision by Agency
                              DECISION by Departement of Veterans Affairs. Copy to parties and judge. [Notification of Cancellation of Solicitation Received From the Contracting Officer] Service: 3/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT Regarding Proceedings Upon Remand by USA. Service: 3/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 44 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order Remanding to AgencyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REMANDING case to Veterans Health Administration; allowing defendant until March 26, 2004 to terminate the contract, solicitation and request for proposals; and directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 4/9/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. Certified copy forwarded to the Veterans Health Administration. (dls)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 43 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Response to Motion
                                    OPPOSITION to [41] Dft's MOTION to Remand filed by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 3/8/2004. Service: 2/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 42 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for voluntary remand due by 2/23/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, ) Modified on 2/25/2004 (jat, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 41 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Voluntary Remand to the Contracting Officer for the Veterans Health Administration by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 2/12/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 40 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [39] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a Facsimile Signature on the Declarations of David Benson and Kevin McFarlane. The Clerk is hereby directed to file the declarations of David Benson and Kevin McFarlane attached to pltf's motion. On or before 2/17/2004, pltf shall file original copies of the declarations. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 2/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004, Terminated: 2/10/2004 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Leave to File a Facsimile Copy of the Declarations of David Benson and Kevin McFarlane's Signatures on the Attached Declarations to Pltf's Memorandum in Suppport of Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Service: 1/20/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, MOTION for Permanent Injunction and MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 1/17/2004. Response due by 2/12/2004. Response due by 2/12/2004. Response due by 2/12/2004. (jcp, ) Modified on 2/9/2004 to correct response dates from 2/17/2004 to 2/12/2004, per Order of 1/12/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Memorandum
                                                  MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Pltf's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/5/2004.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: On 1/5/2004, the court received pltf's memorandum of points and authorities in support of pltf's motion for judgment on the administrative record, permanent injunction and declaratory judgment. On or before 1/23/2004, pltf shall file its motion for judgment on the administrative record, permanent injunction and declaratory judgment. The Clerk of the court is hereby directed to file pltf's memorandum of support. Dft's time for filing its reply will run, according to Rule 7.1, from 1/12/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Declaration
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING AND DECLARATION of Teresa M. Thomas With an Original Signature Pursuant to the [34] Court's Order Dated 12/23/2003, by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [33] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Facsimile Signature Upon Declaration of Teresa M. Thomas. On or before 1/9/2004, dft shall file Ms. Thomas' declaration with an original signature. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003, Terminated: 12/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Facsimile Copy of Teresa M. Thomas's Signature Upon the Declaration Required by the Court's 12/17/2003 Order by USA.Service: 12/22/03. Response due by 1/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Declaration
                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Original Signature for DECLARATION of Teresa M. Thomas by USA. Service: 12/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Order on Motion to Supplement the Administrative RCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: The court grants, in part, and denies, in part, [17] Pltf's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. On or before 12/21/2003, dft shall file a declaration of Teresa M. Thomas. The amendment to the solicitation at issue attached as Exhibit B to dft's opposition to pltf's motion to supplement the administrative record shall be considered part of the administrative record herein. To allow pltf time to consider the foregoing materials, pltf's motion for judgment on the administrative record shall be filed on or before 1/5/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                OPPOSITION to [17] Pltf's MOTION to Supplement the [10] Administrative Record filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 1/5/2004. Service: 12/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [28] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Facsimile Signature Upon Declaration of Teresa M. Thomas. The Clerk is hereby directed to file dft's opposition to pltf's motion to supplement the administrative record. Dft shall file an original copy of the declaration by 1/9/2004. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 12/21/2003. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 1/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003, Terminated: 12/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Facsimile Signature Upon Declaration of Teresa M. Thomas Attached to Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Motion to Amend the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 12/16/03. Response due by 1/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Status Report
                                                                        STATUS REPORT by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [25] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting [25] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Pltf's Status Report. On or before 12/19/2003, pltf shall file its motion for summary judgment. The Clerk is directed to file ptlf's status report UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003, Terminated: 12/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2003 to file Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment, and MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's Status Report by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Service: 12/8/03. Response due by 12/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 12/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER: On 12/4/2003, dft filed [20] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Dft's Status Report. The motion is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to file dft's status report UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Status Report
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding the Completeness of the Administrative Record by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 12/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 12/4/03. JPSR due by 1/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Status Report by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 12/4/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [10] Administrative Record by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Service: 12/1/03. Response due by 12/18/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 12/4/2003, dft shall file its Answer in this matter. On or before 12/4/2003, dft also shall file a Status Report. On or before 12/9/2003, pltf shall file its motion for judgment on the administrative record, together with a memorandum in support thereof. The court will immediately review pltf's filing of 12/9/2003, and determine when dft's response shall be filed. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, pltf's application for temporary restraining order is DENIED. On or before, 11/25/2003, pltf shall file a Status Report whether it intends to continue to pursue injunctive relief in this matter or instead will seek only monetary relief. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Original Signature for Declaration of Teresa M. Thomas in Connection With Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Application for a TRO by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Protective Order by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Administrative Record
                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by USA. Service: 11/20/03. FILED UNDER SEAL (jat, ) Modified on 11/26/2003 (jat, ).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [6] Motion for Leave to File facsimile signature on the declaration of Teresa M. Thomas.Defendant shall file an original copy of the declaration by 12/1/2003. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 11/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File facsimile signature on Declaration of Teresa M. Thomas by USA.Service: 11/20/03. Response due by 12/8/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 14, 2003 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. in Support of [1] Pltf's Motion for TRO, Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Judgment. Service: 11/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before Tuesday, 11/18/2003, at 9:00 am, pltf shall file its memorandum in support of its application for a TRO, together with any supporting documents. On or before Thursday, 11/20/2003, at 4:00 pm, dft shall file its response to pltf's memorandum in support of its application for a TRO, together with any supporting documents. On Friday, 11/21/2003, the court will rule on the ptlf's application for a TRO. On or before Monday, 11/24/2003, the parties shall file a recommended protective order. On or before Monday, 11/24/2003, dft shall file the administrative record. The filings due from the pltf on 11/18/2003, and from the dft on 11/20/2003, shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/19/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:A Telephonic Status Conference will be held in this case on Friday, 11/14/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Case Assigned to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Declaratory Judgment) against USA (VA) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059131), filed by SOFTWARE TESTING SOLUTIONS, INC. Answer Due by 1/11/2004.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?