BATTLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02659-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo THERESA G. BATTLE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Duane Austin +1 202 616 0321 +1 202 305 7644 michael.austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 3/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A), that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER directing Clerk is directed to dismiss this matter pursuant to RCFC 41(a)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Terminated:
      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of This Court Over Constitutional Issues Raised in the Complaint by THERESA G. BATTLE.Service: 3/3/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Response to Motion
        MOTION to Deny [8] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 3/19/2004 filed by THERESA G. BATTLE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/27/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [8] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft shall file by Friday, 3/19/2004 an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER: An unscheduled, unrecorded teleconference was conducted this date with parties to discuss procedural possibilities in this matter. No directeive from the court was ordered during the teleconference. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004
              Minute Entry--An unscheduled, unrecorded teleconference was conducted this date to discuss procedural options in this matter. (smm)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 3/19/2004 by USA.Service: 2/23/2004. Response due by 3/11/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                  ORDER: [6] Pltf's Motion to deny the enlargement of time is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004, Terminated: 1/29/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION to Deny Enlargement of Time by THERESA G. BATTLE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 1/15/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [4] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer Due by 2/27/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004, Terminated: 1/13/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 2/27/2004 by USA.Service: 1/9/2004. Response due by 1/26/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Duane Austin for USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Case Assigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059136), filed by THERESA G. BATTLE.Answer Due by 1/11/2004.(jat, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?