ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02663-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 7:41 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
and Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by 8TH FLOOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 480

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah Michael Luongo +1 202 514 8582 +1 202 307 2503 jeremiah.luongo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Lefante Donahue +1 202 353 9498 +1 202 514 8624 lisa.donahue@usdoj.gov
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 111 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [110] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
    LREF
    Legal Document 110 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 109 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [105] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(ck)
        LREF
        Legal Document 108 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
        RESPONSE to PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS by Defendant the United States, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
          **SEALED**RESPONSE to PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS By Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Fagg, Arnold)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
            **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership Of and Right to Pursue Claims, Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC From Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Fagg, Arnold)
              LREF
              Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
              Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by USA.Response due by 9/2/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                LREF
                Blank 104 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [103] Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 103 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008, Terminated: 8/7/2008 Motion to Seal
                  MOTION to Seal Reply Brief to be filed on August 14, 2008, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 8/25/2008.(Fagg, Arnold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 101 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership Of and Right to Pursue Claims, Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC From Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 100 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership Of and Right to Pursue Claims, Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC From Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, part 1 of 2, # (2) Exhibit A, part 2 of 2, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Fagg, Arnold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER DENYING JOINDER with No. 02-898C. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Edward Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Court Filing
                            Amended Discovery Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                              RESPONSE to Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation Motion For Modification of Schedule, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Court Filing
                                Pretrial Order on Damages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 94 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                  Discovery Scheduling Order: Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 93 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for January 24, 2007 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 90 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Court Filing
                                          ORDER NOTICE granting re: [88] Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(d)(4). Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk terminated. Entered by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying [55] and [57] Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment, granting [62] Plaintiffs' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1 )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                              Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brad Fagg in place of Alex D. Tomaszczuk, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [83] Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [83] MOTION to Unseal Document [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees filed by USA,, [55] MOTION fo, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006
                                                      RESPONSE to [83] MOTION to Unseal Document [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees filed by USA,, [55] MOTION fo, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 10/2/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                        MOTION to Unseal Document [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees filed by USA,, [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding the invalid assignment of plaintiff's standard contract and pre-existing claims from the partial breach of that contract filed by USA,, filed by USA. Response due by 9/18/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA Regarding The Government's Pending Motions (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [52] Motion to Consolidate this case with VT Yankee (02-898). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [62] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA,, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1991 ACR excerpt)# (2) Exhibit B (Rives declaration))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 7/26/2006. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                  ORDER granting [79] Motion for Enlargement. Plaintiff's Reply in support of its June 8, 2006 cross-motion for summary judgment is due July 26, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 7/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/26/06 to File Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC. .(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Text For Docket Entries 55 and 56, filed by USA.Response due by 7/31/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                        ORDER granting [75] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                          RESPONSE to [64] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, [62] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply To Plaintif's Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint And, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, And Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by 12 pages, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [71] Defendant's Motion to File Out of Time its Reply in Support of [52] Defendant's Motion to Consolidate, and GRANTING [72] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time until July 6, 2006 to File Defendant's Reply in support of [57] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Response to [62] Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 6, 2006 to File Response or Reply to [62] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply To Motion To Consolidate Out of Time filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [52] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 02-898 with this case, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment, On The Assignment Issue, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Tomaszczuk, Alexander)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [58] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact On The Assignment Issue, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Tomaszczuk, Alexander)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                              ORDER granting [66] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, and granting [67] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Proposed Findings of Fact. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/9/2006 to File Response to Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment On Assignment And Proposed Findings Of Fact, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 6/26/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 6/26/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [52] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 02-898 with this case, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 6/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1-30-04 Chief Judge Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006
                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [62] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA, In Support Of Their Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [58] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact On The One-Time Fee Motion, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [57] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA,, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 7/10/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate. Plaintiffs' response now due June 8, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006, Terminated: 5/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/8/2006 to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC. .(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [57] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding the invalid assignment of plaintiff's standard contract and pre-existing claims from the partial breach of that contract filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 7/14/2006 to correct docket text pursuant to [78] motion. (dls ).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding the invalid assignment of plaintiff's standard contract and pre-existing claims from the partial breach of that contract, filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 7/14/2006 to correct docket text pursuant to [78] motion. (dls).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [51] Motion to File Under Seal and [53] Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendent's motion for summary judgment due by 5/4/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 02-898 with this case, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal For Leave To File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 6/19/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                                                                                                                  Defendant's April 25, 2006 Motion for an Enlargement of Time until May 3, 2006 to file its Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. All subsequent related filing dates are adjusted accordingly.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendent's Motion for summary judgment due by 5/3/2006. Defendent's Reply in support of summary judgment due by 6/29/2006. Plaintiff's Response and motion for cross-summary judgment due by 6/8/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/3/2006 to File Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Liability, filed by USA. Response due by 5/12/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [42] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file their reply in Support of their Cross-Motion for SummaryJudgment due by 6/12/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendent's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, due by 6/22/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to defendent's motion for summary judgment due by 6/1/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: . Defendent's Motion for summary judgment due by 4/26/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [43] Motion for Enlargement of Time, and granting [44] Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. Response due by 4/6/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/17/2006 to File Responses to Document Requests and Motion for Leave to File Revised Schedule, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. Response due by 4/3/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 3/22/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order E-mail Preservation Order, and Order Governing Review of RIS Database, filed by USA. Response due by 3/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 3/20/2006. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion due by 5/1/2006. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 5/22/2006. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/12/06. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: . Plaintiff shall file its Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/12/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: . Defendent's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/20/2006. Defendent shall file its Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/22/2006. Plaintiff's Response to Defendents Motion for Summary Judment due by 5/1/2006. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER taking under advisement [39] Motion to Continue. A status hearing is scheduled for February 6, 2006 at 3:00 pm. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. Response due by 2/3/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER reassigning case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler pursuant to Rule 40.1(b). Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [36] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. Reply due by 1/17/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, filed by USA. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - stay continued until the end of 2005 or 30 days after the Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - This case will continue in suspension until either July 1, 2005 or 30 days after a decision is issued in Indiana Michigan. This case will not be consolidated with any other case for the time being. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - Status report due 1/18/05 rather than 1/15/05 stated in previous Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Counsel are reminded that status report is due on January 15. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Suspension of this case expires on December 31. The parties will file a joint status report no later than January 15.Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER STAYING CASE until December 31, 2004 Status Report due by 1/15/2005 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 24, 2004 ORDER by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - Counsel should advise the court if they wish to suspend case. Otherwise, we expect to proceed. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - We ask that the parties notify the court when they have agreed upon modifications to the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's June 9, 2004 Order by all plaintiffs. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - We ask that the parties file a status report concerning the posture of this case. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [17] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr.. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - The court will host a pre-discovery conference on April 30, 2004 with Judge Diane Sypolt as presiding judge, to explore the motion for stay and the discovery needed in the new SNF cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting defendant's request to apply Judge Sypolt's Protective Order in the coordinated discovery proceedings to the Vermont Yankee and Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Protective Order)(swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [8] Order Lifting Stay and seeking views on pretrial schedule filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to the [8] Court's January 15, 2004 Order filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC. (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 2/9/2004 to create docket entry relationship to the Order of 1/15/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RETURNING Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's January 15, 2004 Order received February 2, 2004. Plaintiffs filed hard copy instead of electronic filing. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Order dated January 15 due by 2/17/2004 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004, Terminated: 2/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 2/17/04, to Court's 1/15/04 order by USA. Response due by 2/19/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the Court's January 15 Order is due February 2, 2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadline: Response to January 15, 2004 order due by 2/2/2004. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004, Terminated: 1/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 2, 2004 to file response to the Court's January 15, 2004 Order by USA. Response due by 2/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER LIFTING STAY. Counsel should notify the court no later than January 23 whether they wish to enter a pretrial schedule. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 1/12/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 1/22/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Data Quality Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Data Quality Correction re: [1] Complaint. (Attachment to Complaint - Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Robert H. Hodges. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059139), filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC.Answer Due by 1/11/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 207 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?