REAVES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02714-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARK REAVES, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Colt +1 202 305 7576 +1 202 307 0972 james.colt@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/24/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/5/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this action. No costs. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Response to Motion
      RESPONSE to [14] MOTION to Lift Stay filed by USA. Reply due by 2/8/2005. Service: 01/28/05.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER directing defendant file response to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed on or before 1/28/05. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (eph, )
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION to Lift Stay by MARK REAVES.Service: 10/13/2004. Response due by 11/1/2004 (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Response to Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
            RESPONSE TO [11] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by MARK REAVES. (Request for Stay) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/2/04.(jat, )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Description not available
              REPLY BRIEF in Support of [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/16/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pltf is hereby ordered to show cause as to why Pltf's Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute his claim in accordance with RCFC 41(b). Pltf shall file a Show Cause Response to this Order by 9/7/2004. Pltf's response shall not exceed ten pages. Dft may submit a Reply to Pltf's Response only by leave of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                  ORDER: On 3/11/2004, Pltf filed an unopposed motion for an enlargement of time to respond to Dft's motion to dismiss. Pltf did not attach a certificate of service. The Clerk is directed to accept Pltf's motion for an enlargement of time for filing this date by leave of the Court. Pltf is ordered to serve the motion on dft and file proof of service by filing a Certificate of Service. [9] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. Response due by 3/31/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004, Terminated: 3/18/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), until 3/31/2004, by MARK REAVES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                      ORDER: [6] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pltf's Complaint to and including 1/30/2004 is GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC.Answer Due by 1/30/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 1/30/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004, Terminated: 2/2/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 1/30/2004 by USA.Service: 1/23/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Colt for USA. Service: 1/9/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. Service: 12/16/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Amended Complaint
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT. [COPY TO DOJ] (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  Case Assigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059216), filed by MARK REAVES.Answer Due by 1/23/2004.(lg1, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?