XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02754-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

XO Communications, Inc. XO Communications, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/7/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
103-cv-02754-TCW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, LEAD
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE: Status Report due by 7/7/2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
        LREF
        Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER STAYING CASESigned by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
            LREF
            Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-9) held on September 17, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
              STIPULATION re USA Choice Internet, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Comcation Decision)(Stewart, G.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007
                  ORDER STAYING CASE. The parties' joint motion for a stay of 66 days is GRANTED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on September 7, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/3/2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-16) held on December 14, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER denying [23] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying [36] Defendant's Cross Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report consistent with this Order on or before January 4, 2007 Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF on Internal Revenue Service's Taxation of Internet Access and Related Internet Communications, In Support of the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Affidavit Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4)(Stewart, G.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Court Filing
                                    ORDER: the parties are requested to submit supplemental briefs consistent with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/10/2006. (dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 54 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Court Filing
                                          ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 53 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                            NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams no longer assigned to the case. (hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 52 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                              ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                SEE NO. 06-40T FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; and directing parties to complete Discovery by 9/8/2006; and file a Joint Status Report by 9/29/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [23] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., filed by USA. Service: 1/11/2006.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Supplemental Brief
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF on the Burden of Proof Required for [23] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. Service: 1/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 30, 2005 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Supplemental Brief due by 1/11/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/14/2005. (vp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 11/30/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/21/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 10/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [43] Motion Adjourn Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005, Terminated: 9/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION to Adjourn Evidentiary Hearing, filed by USA. Service: 9/19/2005. Response due by 10/6/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Memorandum
                                                                        Supplemental Authorities in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re: [40] Scheduling Order, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. Service: 8/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          AMENDED STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference re-set for 9/21/2005 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Supplemental Authorities in further support of cross-motions for summary judgment due by 8/31/2005. Status Conference set for 9/14/2005 at 3:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Hearing set for 10/4/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Service: 5/13/05.(dls )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [23] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., filed by USA. Service: 3/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                  RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. Service: 3/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                    CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [23] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., filed by USA. Service: 3/30/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 6/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [32] Motion to Continue, granting [32] Motion Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/26/2005 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                          RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 4/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Response
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005, Terminated: 5/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for a Partial Continuation of the Suspension of Proceedings, MOTION to Lift the Suspension as to the Dial Access Service Issue, filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [30] Motion to Continue the Stay. Status Report due by 3/30/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005, Terminated: 3/17/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue the Stay of Proceedings filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., USA.Service: 3/15/2005. Response due by 4/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28] Motion to Continue Suspension of the Proceedings. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/14/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue the Suspension of the Proceedings by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., USA.Service: 2/11/2005. Response due by 2/28/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [26] Joint Motion for a Continuation of the Suspension of Proceedings. Status Report due by 2/14/2005 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (eph, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Suspend Proceedings until 2/14/05. by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC., USA.Service: 1/11/05. (eph, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [24] Joint Motion for Suspension of Proceedings until 1/14/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for Suspension of Proceedings by USA, XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. Response due by 12/17/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004, Terminated: 1/10/2007 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 11/1/2004. Response due by 12/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time. Pltf's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, or a Motion for Summary Judgment and Any Motions in Limine are now due on 11/5/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004, Terminated: 10/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to file Memorandum of Contententions of Fact and Law by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC..Service: 10/22/04. Response due by 11/12/2004 (vro, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. Service: 10/14/2004.(dw1)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 10/15/2004.. Motion(s) due by 10/21/2004. Status Report due by 10/19/2004,Plaintiff's Memorandum due by 10/21/2004, Defendant's responsive memorandum due by 11/20/2004 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time [Complete Discovery: 10/15/2004; Joint Status Report: 10/19/2004; Pltf's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law: 10/21/2004; Dft's Responsive Memorandum: 11/20/2004], by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. Service: 9/28/2004. Response due by 10/15/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Alan Pearce, Ph.D. filed by USA. Service: 9/21/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [15] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time.Dft shall file its designation of experts and Experts' Reports by 9/21/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004, Terminated: 8/31/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/21/2004 to file Dft's Designation of Experts and Experts' Reports by USA.Service: 8/25/2004. Response due by 9/13/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: [12] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time Until 7/8/2004 to File the Designation of Experts is GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004, Terminated: 7/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/25/2004 to file the Designation of Experts by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 7/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/26/2004 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall file its designation of experts and experts' reports - 6/25/2004. Dft shall file its designation of experts and experts' reports - 8/31/2004. The parties shall complete Discovery on or before 9/30/2004. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report - 10/6/2004. Pltf shall file a Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law in accordance with Appendix A, or a motion for summary judgment and any motions in limine - 10/13/2004. Dft shall file its responsive memorandum in accordance with Appendix A, or a cross motion for summary judgment and an opposition to Pltf's motion and any motions in limine - 11/12/2004. Pltf may file an opposition to Dft's cross motion for summary judgment - 11/24/2004. The parties shall identify and file a copy of any exhibits as to which an objection remains outstanding - 11/24/2004. A telephonic Pretrial Conference will be initiated by the Court - 12/3/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial or an expert presentation in support of any motions filed will commence on 12/14/2004 - 12/15/2004 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Scheduling Conference held on 05/26/2004. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/28/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/26/2004 02:30 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. The Court will initiate the teleconference. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 3/30/2004. JPSR due by 5/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: [4] Dft's Motion for Leave to File an Enlargement of Time Out of Time, and [5] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. These motions are GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC.Answer Due by 3/30/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File response [1] Complaint until 3/30/2004 by USA.Service: 02/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Enlargement of Time (Out of Time) to Respond to Complaint by USA.Service: 02/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 12/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Case Assigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059248), filed by XO COMMUNICATIONS, INC..Answer Due by 1/30/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?