JUAREZ et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-02499-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo IGNACIO JUAREZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Joseph O'Donnell +1 925 935 1707 +1 925 934 6092 oandslaw@aol.com
No Logo MAYELA JUAREZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Joseph O'Donnell +1 925 935 1707 +1 925 934 6092 oandslaw@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Wernett McInerny +1 202 353 3919 julia.mcinerny@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/3/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 5/12/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [52] Judgment. Service: 5/26/06.(tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 53 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $12,980.99, in addition to the judgment of compensation entered this date. This award shall be in the form of a check made jointly payable to petitioner and Mr. James O'Donnell. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuan to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $18,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Notice Not to Seek Review
        NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ re [48] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 3/28/06.(tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Notice Not to Seek Review
          NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by PETITIONER re [46] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 3/28/06.(tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Notice Not to Seek Review
            NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [46] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 3/29/06.(tjk, ) Modified on 4/3/2006 (tjk, ).
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 DECISION of Special Master
              DECISIONSigned by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (mij, )
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Stipulation
                STIPULATION, filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
                  DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/21/06.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 2/09/06. Response due by 2/27/2006. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 15-Week Stipulation Order
                        15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 3/8/2006. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order
                          ORDER The prehearing status conference set for 12/01/05 at 2:00 p.m. (EST) and the hearing set for 12/09/05 at 12:00 p.m. (EST) are hereby cancelled. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Witness List
                            Witness List, filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 11/17/05.(tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Prehearing Submissions
                              PREHEARING EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/16/05.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Prehearing Submissions
                                PREHEARING MEMORANDUM by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/16/05.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 10/1/2005 Prehearing Order
                                  PREHEARING ORDER: Prehearing Submissions due by 11/18/2005. Hearing set for 12/9/2005 12:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Prehearing Status Conference set for 12/1/2005 03:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Description not available
                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/30/2005 at 12:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 notice of filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit E, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/13/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Medical Literature
                                        MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #22-23] filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 9/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Medical Records
                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #D], filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Description not available
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 9/14/2005 03:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Scheduling Order
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: No later than 9/06/05, respondent shall file a Supplemental Expert Report from Dr. Snyder, responding to petitioner's exhibits 19 and 22. As soon as possible, petitioner shall file the medical literature to which Dr. Scheller referred in petitioner's exhibit 22. A Status Conference is set for 9/12/2005 03:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on July 13, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 7/8/2005. Status Conference set for 7/13/2005 03:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on May 25, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 notice of filing
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit(s) [#20- 8/11/04 Neurology report] and [#21- 5/04/05 Letter from Petitioner] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 5/04/05.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 notice of filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING: Exhibit #18 [Medical records of Maria Juarez] and Exhibit #19 [Second supplemental report of Dr. Schweller] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 5/03/05.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: No later than 5/20/05, petitioner shall file medical records for Maria and the latest neurologist report. If available, petitioner shall file a second supplemental medical expert report from Dr. Schweller. A Status conference shall be held 5/25/05 at 3:00 pm (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Expert Report
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT of Russell D. Synder, M.D. (Ex. no. C) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/22/05.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Expert Report
                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Schweller (Ex. no. 16) and medical literature in support of the report (Ex. no. 17) filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 3/15/05.(tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall provide supplemental medical expert reports due by 3/22/2005. Status Conference set for 4/5/2005 03:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Medical Records
                                                                  MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #15] filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 2/01/05.(tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Expert Report
                                                                    EXPERT REPORT of Russell D. Snyder M.D. (Ex. no. A) and Curriculum vitae of Russell D. Snyder (Ex. no. B) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/31/05.(tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 notice of filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit #14- Affidavit of Mayela Juarez] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 1/25/05.(tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Description not available
                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 2/10/2005 03:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 notice of filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING: [Exhibits #12 and #13 - immunization records] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 1/18/05.(tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a Medical Expert Report due by 1/31/2005. Status Conference set for 2/10/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on December 15,2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING: Exhibit #10 [Report of Thomas Schweller, MD] and [Exhibit #11 CV of Thomas Schweller M.D.] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 11/23/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file Dr. Schweller's CV and Supplemental Expert Report due by 12/10/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/15/2004 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on October 26, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 Description not available
                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/26/2004 02:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING: [Exhibit #9] by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 10/12/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Description not available
                                                                                          ORDER: Prior to the next Status Conference, petitioner shall file a medical expert report. Status Conference set for 10/26/2004 03:30 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on September 29, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner shall file a Medical Expert Report due by 9/20/2004. Status Conference set for 9/29/2004 03:30 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on August 4, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/4/2004 03:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Prior to the next status conference petitioner shall file a medical expert report and accompanying CV. As soon as possible, petitioner shall file any and all records relating to the LPCH Pediatric Epilepsy Clinic. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on June 28, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners' Expert Report due by 6/23/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/28/2004 03:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on May 17, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Medical Records
                                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #8] filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. (tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner's Expert Report and CV due by 5/7/2004; petitioner shall file the missing medical records requested by respondent as soon as possible; Status Conference set for 5/17/2004 02:30 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                              Respondent's Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 3/02/04. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/28/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/10/2004 02:30 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/8/2004 02:30 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 1/5/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 7 (billing records) by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ. Service: 11/13/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Wernett McInerny for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/17/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                        Case Reassigned to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz no longer assigned to the case. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                          Case Assigned to Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Petition
                                                                                                                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059019) , filed by IGNACIO JUAREZ, MAYELA JUAREZ.Respondents Report Due by 3/2/2004.(jmm, )
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?