STARK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02772-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BOB STARK, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Gustafson David.D.Gustafson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/3/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 2/23/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5100'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC voluntarily dismissing [21] Notice of Appeal filed by BOB STARK. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005, Terminated: 4/22/2005 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 05-5100 for [21] Notice of Appeal filed by BOB STARK. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by BOB STARK. Filed application to proceed in froma pauperis. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
        ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Request for Judgment Rendered on the Issue of Liability Alone received 2/28/2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the first amended complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM ORDER and OPINION granting [14] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Strike filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the August 4, 2004 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
              SURREPLY in Support of 1st Amended Complaint by BOB STARK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (Copy to Defendant) (jat, )
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Description not available
                REPLY in Support of [14] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), and MOTION to Strike, filed by USA. Service: 9/13/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to [14] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike filed by BOB STARK. Reply due by 9/17/2004. Service: 9/2/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004, Terminated: 2/18/2005 Terminated:
                    MOTION to Strike the "First Cause of Action" and MOTION to Strike in Part and Dismiss in Part the "Second Cause of Action," by USA.Service: 8/16/2004. Response due by 9/16/2004. Response due by 9/16/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Second Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA , filed by BOB STARK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (Copy to Defendant) Related document: [1] Complaint filed by BOB STARK.(jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Notice of Change of AddressCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Change of Address by BOB STARK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (Copy to Defendant) (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Unpublished OpinionCourt Filing
                          UNPUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER: [3] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is granted, however, and the claims set forth in the Complaint in Sections IV, V, VI, VII for the years 1993-1995 and 1998-2001, VIII, IX, and X are dismissed. On or before 8/2/2004, however, pltf may amend the complaint to establish the tax refund claims set forth in Section V for the years 1996-1997 and 2002-present, at which time the court will reconsider whether to dismiss these remaining claims as well. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Letter
                            Letter from Bob Stark. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Description not available
                              RESPONSE to Pltf's Reply to [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 4/5/2004.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                REPLY to [7] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by BOB STARK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 4/16/2004. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Terminated:
                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Brief in Support Thereof by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/2/2004. Response due by 4/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                    ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 3/2/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004, Terminated: 2/2/2004 Terminated:
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 3/2/2004 filed by USA.Service: 1/28/04. (dls)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Douglas Gustafson for USA. Service: 1/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003
                                          Re-served Tax Division of DOJ on 12/15/03, Deadline to file answer extended to 2/13/04. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BOB STARK (copy to defendant).Service: 12/5/03. Response due by 12/22/2003 (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Case Assigned to Judge Susan G. Braden. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) , filed by BOB STARK.Answer Due by 2/2/2004.(lg1, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?