SAUNDERS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-02799-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KRISTOPHER SAUNDERS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/9/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 3/1/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 2/10/2005 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/01/05 to File Joint Status Report by USA.Service: 02/08/05. Response due by 2/25/2005 (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
        ORDER STAYING CASE and Setting Deadline for Filing of Stipulation or Further Joint Status Report.Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2005 Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Status Report
          Joint STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 01/10/05.(mb2, ) Modified on 1/12/2005 (mb2, ).
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties Stipulation of Dismissal or a Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion for Leave to File Facsimile Signature by all parties. Service: 12/10/2004.(lg1, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Leave to File to file facsimile signature by KRISTOPHER SAUNDERS, USA.Service: 12/10/2004. Response due by 12/27/2004 (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [22] Dft's Motion for Leave to File. Dft's status report, which is incorporated within the motion for leave, is DEEEMED TO HAVE BEEN FILED along with the motion. Proceedings in this matter are STAYED until Friday, 12/10/2004, by which date the parties shall have filed their anticipated stiulation for dismissal, or in the absence of a stipulation for dismissal, a further JSR. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004, Terminated: 11/24/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Leave to File Status Report by USA.Service: 11/19/2004. Response due by 12/6/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting Defendant's oral motion for an extension of time. The parties shall file their anticipated stipulation for dismissal by 11/12/04. If no stipulation for dismissal is filed by that date, the parties shall file a further joint status report by 11/19/04. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                        ORDER STAYING CASE: The parties request this matter be stayed until Thursday, 10/14/2004. The parties' request is GRANTED. Proceedings in this matter are STAYED until Thursday, 10/14/2004. The parties shall file by Thursday, 10/21/2004 a further Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 9/14/2004.(dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                            ORDER: [17] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED-IN-PART. To the extent that the dft seeks more time to answer, the motion is granted, however the parties shall file a joint status report by Tuesday, 9/14/2004. The deadline for the filing of an answer shall be determined upon consideration of the parties' 9/14/2004 status report. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/7/2004 by USA.Service: 8/4/04. Response due by 8/23/2004 (vro, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 8/6/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004, Terminated: 8/2/2004 Terminated:
                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 8/6/2004 by USA.Service: 7/23/2004. Response due by 8/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 7/23/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/23/2004 by USA.Service: 6/24/04. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 7/9/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 6/15/2004 Terminated:
                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 7/9/2004 by USA.Service: 6/9/2004. Response due by 6/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [9] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Dft shall file an Answer by Wednesday, 6/9/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 5/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 6/9/2004 by USA.Service: 5/3/2004. Response due by 5/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 4/8/04.(jat, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [6] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer Due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004, Terminated: 3/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint until 5/10/2004 by USA.Service: 3/3/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004
                                                        ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 3/10/2004. (signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004, Terminated: 2/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 3/10/2004 filed by USA.Service: 2/2/04. (dls)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Myung-Jin Kim for USA. Service: 12/23/03.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Case Assigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059311), filed by KRISTOPHER SAUNDERS.Answer Due by 2/9/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?