HIDALGO et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-02787-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADAM CADE HIDALGO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo STEPHANIE HIDALGO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Sara Renzi +1 202 616 4133 linda.renzi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 3/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [43] Judgment on Attorney Fees,. Service: 11/09/06.(tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney fees and costs in the amount of $18,040.31, in addition to the march 21, 2006 judgment of compensation. A check for $18,040.31 shall be paid to petitioner and petitioner's counsel jointly. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
      DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Terminated:
        MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Service: 9/15/06.Response due by 10/2/2006. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Scheduling Order
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file any motion for attorney fees and costs by 9/28/06. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
            Petitioner's Election to Accept [39] Judgment. Service: 3/24/2006.(mij, )
              LREF
              Blank 39 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
              JUDGMENT entered,pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Notice Not to Seek Review
                JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [37] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 DECISION of Special Master
                  DECISION Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Respondent's Report
                    Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/03/06. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Description not available
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/3/2006 09:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. If at all possible, Respondent should file an expert report prior to the upcoming status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Expert Report
                        EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Kinsbourne (Ex. no. 12) filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Service: 11/23/05.(tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 33 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Scheduling Order
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The supplemental expert is held in abeyance until 12/16/2005. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/15/05 to to file the Expert Report , filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Service: 11/15/05. Response due by 12/2/2005. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 31 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                              ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Scheduling Order
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 11/15/2005. Status Conference set for 11/17/2005 at 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 29 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Order
                                  ORDER re [28] Response to Order to Show Cause filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO,, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                    RESPONSE TO [26] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO.Service: 9/10/2005. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sara Renzi for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/02/05.(tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Order to Show Cause
                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report or give good cause as to why this case should not be dismissed due by 9/12/05. If not filed, in accordance with Vaccine Rule 21 THIS CASE WILL BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Scheduling Order
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the Supplemental Report due by 7/12/2005. Provided the Supplemental Report is filed, Respondent's Rule 4(b) Report will be due 9/12/05. Status Conference set for 9/14/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on June 28, 2005. (tlj, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Scheduling Order
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 6/28/2005 11:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Petitioner's due date for the supplemental expert report is reset to 6/24/05. Petitioner is reminded to forward autopsy slides to Respondent's expert. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the supplemental expert and transfer the autopsy slides by 5/19/05. Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for 5/19/05 at 10:00 am (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on April 11, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT and NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS: Exhibit #11- Expert Report of Dr. John Shane by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Service: 3/25/05 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the Expert Report due by 4/6/2005. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/11/2005 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 notice of filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING: Request for an extension of time to file an expert report and Exhibits 10 (Records from Forensic Pathologists) by STEPHANIE HIDALGO, ADAM CADE HIDALGO. Service: 2/03/05 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Description not available
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/4/2005 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO. Service: 12/03/04 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file an Expert Report due by 12/3/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/6/2004 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on October 7, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 notice of filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibits 8-9] by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO. Service: 9/17/04.(tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Description not available
                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/7/2004 9:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION to Issue Subpoena by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO.Service: 8/31/04. Response due by 9/24/2004 (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on September 07, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                          ORDER: Petitioner's counsel is hereby authorized to sign and serve a subpoena for all medical records. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner shall file the affidavits, autopsy slides and any additional records by 9/7/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/7/2004 09:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on August 9, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                ORDER granting [9] Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Description not available
                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 8/9/2004 01:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004, Terminated: 8/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION to Issue Subpoena by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO.Service: 7/30/04 by hand. Response due by 8/13/2004 (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING: [Exhibit #7 Bossier City Fire Department] by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO. Service: 7/16/04 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner shall file the outstanding records, affidavits and autopsy slides by 7/29/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2004 10:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on June 29, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Description not available
                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rule 4(a)Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/29/2004 01:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Medical Records
                                                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #1-6] filed by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO. Service: 2/13/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 2/27/2004 Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Levon Terzian for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/16/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Petition
                                                                                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 059298) , filed by ADAM CADE HIDALGO, STEPHANIE HIDALGO.Respondents Report Due by 3/4/2004.(jat, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 8/20/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?